Original Case: 6:11-cv-00201

Federal Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:15-cvpri-01064
Typecivil private
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2014
Terminated:Oct 16, 2015
Last checked: Saturday Jan 09, 2016 4:07 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION
Represented By
Marvin Craig Tyler
Wilson, Sonsini, Goodrich & Rosati, PC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICA
Represented By
Marvin Craig Tyler
Wilson, Sonsini, Goodrich & Rosati, PC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CHI MEI OPTOELECTRONICS USA INC.
Represented By
Ming-Tao Yang
Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP
contact info
Edward Robert Yoches
Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD.
Represented By
Christopher Benson
Christopher Benson, Attorney at Law
contact info
Eric B. Hall
Fulbright & Jaworski LLP
contact info
Daniel Leventhal
Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
HANNSTAR DISPLAY CORPORATION
Represented By
Ming-Tao Yang
Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP
contact info
Edward Robert Yoches
Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
HANNSPREE NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Represented By
Ming-Tao Yang
Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP
contact info
Edward Robert Yoches
Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CHI MEI INNOLUX CORPORATION
Represented By
Ming-Tao Yang
Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP
contact info
Edward Robert Yoches
Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
EIDOS DISPLAY, LLC
Represented By
Gaspare Joseph Bono
Dentons US LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
EIDOS III, LLC
Represented By
Gaspare Joseph Bono
Dentons US LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/09/2016 3:14 AM EST
Thursday, November 20, 2014
1 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 11/12/2014. [199079] Fee/IFP due on 12/04/2014. Entry of Appearance due 12/04/2014. Certificate of Interest is due on 12/04/2014. Docketing Statement due 12/04/2014. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 01/20/2015.
Related: [-]