Maryland District Court
Case #: 8:23-cr-00006
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 28, 2024 2:53 AM EST
Defendant
Olusegun Samson Adejorin (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jessica Caroline Collins
U.S. Attorney'S Office For The District Of Maryland
contact info
Coreen Mao
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/09/2024 6:14 PM EDT
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
1 1 11 pgs SEALED INDICTMENT as to Olusegun Samson Adejorin (1) count(s) 1-5, 6-7, 8. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 Motion & Order to Seal as to Olusegun Samson Adejorin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 1/11/2023. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]