Iowa Southern District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-00018
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 28, 2024 1:28 AM CST
Defendant
Sharmarke Omar Mohamed (1)
Represented By
Andrew James Graeve
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Mallory E. Weiser
United States Attorney'S Office - Dsm
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/28/2024 2:22 AM CST
Monday, January 22, 2024
Judge update in case as to Sharmarke Omar Mohamed. Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly added. (kmp) [4:24-mj-00021-WPK]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT by USA, signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams as to Sharmarke Omar Mohamed (1). (kmp) [4:24-mj-00021-WPK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
Arrest of Sharmarke Omar Mohamed. (pll) [4:24-mj-00021-WPK]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to Sharmarke Omar Mohamed. (pll) [4:24-mj-00021-WPK]
Related: [-]
3 3 TEXT ORDER as to Sharmarke Omar Mohamed. Initial Appearance set for 1/24/2024 at 01:30 PM in Des Moines - Room 455 - 4th Floor South before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 1/24/2024. (pll)[4:24-mj-00021-WPK]
Related: [-]
4 4 Warrant of Arrest Returned Executed on 01/26/2024 in case as to Sharmarke Omar Mohamed. (mah) Modified on 1/29/2024, to correct arrest execution from 1/22/204 to 1/26/2024 (vr). [4:24-mj-00021-WPK]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Initial Appearance as to Defendant Sharmarke Omar Mohamed held on 1/24/2024. Attorney Andrew James Graeve for defendant. (Court Reporter Kelli Mulcahy.) (pll)[4:24-mj-00021-WPK]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL as to Sharmarke Omar Mohamed. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 1/24/2024. (pll) [4:24-mj-00021-WPK]
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit as to Sharmarke Omar Mohamed. (pll) [4:24-mj-00021-WPK]
Related: [-]
8 8 RULE 5 ORDER as to Sharmarke Omar Mohamed. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 1/24/2024. (pll) [4:24-mj-00021-WPK]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORAL MOTION for Detention by USA as to Sharmarke Omar Mohamed. (pll) [4:24-mj-00021-WPK]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL, granting 9 Motion for Detention as to Sharmarke Omar Mohamed (1). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 1/24/2024. (pll) [4:24-mj-00021-WPK]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
11 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: FPD Andrew James Graeve appearing for Sharmarke Omar Mohamed (Graeve, Andrew) [4:24-mj-00021-WPK]
Related: [-]
12 12 Pretrial Services Report as to Sharmarke Omar Mohamed. (Davidson, Priscilla) [4:24-mj-00021-WPK]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
Judge update in case as to Sharmarke Omar Mohamed. Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger and Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. (kmp)
Related: [-]