Georgia Northern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00018
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 28, 2024 2:53 AM EST
Defendant
Lucciano Lopez (3)
Represented By
Michael H. Saul
Office Of Michael H. Saul
contact info
Judy Kim
Law Office Of Judy Kim, PC
contact info
Defendant
Bobby Lamar Mosley, Sr. (4)
Represented By
Sean Jengwei Young
Federal Defender Program, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Dikla Rosh (2)
Represented By
Jay Lester Strongwater
Strongwater & Associates, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Isaac Sved (1)
Represented By
Brandon Alexander Thomas
The Law Office Of Brandon A. Thomas
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Amy M. Palumbo
Doj-Usao
contact info
C. Brock Brockington
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/06/2024 10:15 AM EST
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
1 1 36 pgs INDICTMENT as to Isaac Sved (1) counts 1, 2, 3, 4-5, 6-28, 29, 31, 32-48, Dikla Rosh (2) counts 1, 2, 3, 4-5, 6-28, 29, 30, Lucciano Lopez (3) counts 1, 6-12, Bobby Lamar Mosley, Sr. (4) counts 31, 32-40. (tas)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Seal Indictment by USA as to Isaac Sved, Dikla Rosh, Lucciano Lopez, Bobby Lamar Mosley, Sr. (tas)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER GRANTING2 Motion to Seal Document as to Isaac Sved (1), Dikla Rosh (2), Lucciano Lopez (3), Bobby Lamar Mosley Sr. (4). Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 1/9/2024. (tas)
Related: [-]
4 4 Defendant Information Sheet as to Isaac Sved. (tas)
Related: [-]
5 5 Defendant Information Sheet as to Dikla Rosh. (tas)
Related: [-]
6 6 Defendant Information Sheet as to Lucciano Lopez. (tas)
Related: [-]
7 7 Defendant Information Sheet as to Bobby Lamar Mosley, Sr. (tas)
Related: [-]
8 8 Praecipe filed. Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon as to Isaac Sved. (tas)
Related: [-]
9 9 Praecipe filed. Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon as to Dikla Rosh. (tas)
Related: [-]
10 10 Praecipe filed. Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon as to Lucciano Lopez. (tas)
Related: [-]
11 11 Praecipe filed. Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon as to Bobby Lamar Mosley, Sr. (tas)
Related: [-]