Florida Middle District Court
Case #: 6:24-cr-00043
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 28, 2024 2:39 AM EST
Defendant
Quentes Durrelle Simpson (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Megan Testerman
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/27/2024 11:24 PM EST
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
1 1 4 pgs INDICTMENT returned in open court as to Quentes Durrelle Simpson (1) count(s) 1-2, 3. (EAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Restricted Unredacted Indictment
4 4 2 pgs MOTION to Seal Indictment and related Documents by USA as to Quentes Durrelle Simpson. (EAM)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs ORDER granting 4 Motion to Seal Indictment and related Documents as to Quentes Durrelle Simpson (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 2/14/2024. (EAM)
Related: [-]