Georgia Northern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00047
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2024
Terminated:Feb 09, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 28, 2024 2:34 AM EST
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Kenson Hunte (1)
Terminated: 02/09/2024


Docket last updated: 02/28/2024 3:32 AM EST
Friday, February 09, 2024
1 1 TRANSFER OF JURISDICTION for Supervision of Releasee Kenson Hunte (1). Received certified copies of indictment, judgment and docket sheet from Southern District of Georgia (Brunswick), Case number: 2:21-cr-00044-LGW-BWC.(tht)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Indictment,
Att: 2 Judgment in Criminal Case,
Att: 3 Docket Sheet