New York Southern District Court
Case #: 7:24-cr-00062
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 28, 2024 2:44 AM EST
Defendant
William Reese (1)
Represented By
Elizabeth K. Quinn
Federal Defenders Of New York
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kathryn Wheelock
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/28/2024 3:43 AM EST
Friday, August 25, 2023
Arrest of William Reese. (ap) [7:23-mj-06175-UA]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to William Reese (1). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy) (ap) [7:23-mj-06175-UA]
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy: Detention Hearing as to William Reese held on 8/25/2023. Initial Appearance as to William Reese held on 8/25/2023. AUSA Kathryn Wheelock for the Government. Elizabeth Quinn for the Defendant. BAIL DISPOSITION: DETENTION: RISK OF FLIGHT/DANGER; SEE TRANSCRIPT. The defendant was advised of his rights and the charges against him. Public reading of the complaint waived. Financial affidavit approved. Elizabeth Quinn was appointed to represent the defendant. Detention hearing held. Defendant detained. PRELIMINARY HEARING DATE: 9/20/23 ON DEFENDANT'S CONSENT. Added attorney Elizabeth K. Quinn for William Reese. (Court Reporter Courtflow) (ap) [7:23-mj-06175-UA]
Related: [-]
3 3 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by William Reese. APPROVED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy) (ap) [7:23-mj-06175-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
4 4 ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to William Reese. Time excluded from 9/20/2023 until 10/18/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 9/20/2023) (ap) [7:23-mj-06175-UA]
Related: [-]
5 5 AFFIRMATION of Kathryn Wheelock in Support by USA as to William Reese re:4 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (ap) [7:23-mj-06175-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
6 6 2nd ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to William Reese. Time excluded from 10/18/2023 until 11/15/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik on 10/18/2023) (lnl) [7:23-mj-06175-UA]
Related: [-]
7 7 AFFIRMATION of Kathryn Wheelock in Support by USA as to William Reese re:6 2nd Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (lnl) [7:23-mj-06175-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
8 8 3RD ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to William Reese. Time excluded from 11/15/2023 until 12/13/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 11/15/2023) (ap) [7:23-mj-06175-UA]
Related: [-]
9 9 AFFIRMATION of Kathryn Wheelock in Support by USA as to William Reese re:8 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (ap) [7:23-mj-06175-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
10 10 4TH ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to William Reese. Time excluded from 12/13/2023 until 1/10/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 12/13/2023) (ap) [7:23-mj-06175-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
11 11 AFFIRMATION of Kathryn Wheelock in Support by USA as to William Reese re:10 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (ap) [7:23-mj-06175-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
12 12 5TH ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to William Reese. Time excluded from 1/10/24 until 2/7/24. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik on 1/10/24)(jbo) [7:23-mj-06175-UA]
Related: [-]
13 13 AFFIRMATION of AUSA Kathryn Wheelock in Support by USA as to William Reese re:12 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (jbo) [7:23-mj-06175-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
1 1 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (lnl)
Related: [-]
14 14 SEALED INDICTMENT as to Sealed Defendant 1 (1) count(s) 1. (lnl)
Related: [-]