California Central District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00101
Case Filed:Feb 15, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 27, 2024 11:28 PM PST
Defendant
Temur Akhmedov (2)
Represented By
J. Alejandro Barrientos
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
Defendant
Bakhtiyar Kamardinov (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kelsey A. Stimson
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Sarah Elizabeth Spielberger
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/28/2024 12:22 AM PST
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT filed as to Defendant Bakhtiyar Kamardinov in violation of 18:1029(a)(4). Approved by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver as to Bakhtiyar Kamardinov (1). (jb) [2:24-mj-00726-DUTY]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Bakhtiyar Kamardinov (jb) [2:24-mj-00726-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
4 4 INDICTMENT filed as to Bakhtiyar Kamardinov (1) count(s) 1-8, 9, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, Temur Akhmedov (2) count(s) 1-8, 10, 12, 13. Offense occurred in LA. (mhe)
Related: [-]
5 5 CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA Sarah E Spielberg as to Defendant Bakhtiyar Kamardinov; defendants Year of Birth: 1986 USMS# REG 65657-007 (mhe)
Related: [-]
6 6 CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA Sarah E Spielberg as to Defendant Temur Akhmedov; defendants Year of Birth: 1990 (mhe)
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Temur Akhmedov (mhe)
Related: [-]
9 9 SEALED EX PARTE APPLICATION to Seal Case Filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Bakhtiyar Kamardinov, Temur Akhmedov. (mhe)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs ORDER by Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin: granting9 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Seal Case as to Bakhtiyar Kamardinov (1), Temur Akhmedov (2) (mhe)
Related: [-]