Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Thomas P Barber
Referred: Natalie Hirt Adams
Case #: 8:24-cv-00517
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2024
Terminated:Jan 16, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Aug 25, 2024 5:06 AM EDT
Defendant
Amy Martel
Represented By
April Lynn Boyer
K & L Gates, LLP
contact info
Jonathan B. Morton
K & L Gates, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Trisa Wetzel
Represented By
April Lynn Boyer
K & L Gates, LLP
contact info
Jonathan B. Morton
K & L Gates, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Engage Fi
Represented By
April Lynn Boyer
K & L Gates, LLP
contact info
Jonathan B. Morton
K & L Gates, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Cornerstone Advisors of Arizona, LLC
Represented By
Nermana Grinnan
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Michael Edward Bonner
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Pavneet Singh Uppal
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Nicole Burton Holtzapple
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Andrew Froman
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Kris Leonhardt
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jeffrey S. Brines
Terminated: 04/09/2024
Defendant
Joel Morehouse
Terminated: 04/09/2024


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
86 86 order Order Directing Compliance Mon 05/12 8:09 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: On the basis of the "Second Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Submit Stipulated Form of Final Order or Judgment" (Doc. 85 ), the parties' time to submit a stipulated form of final order or judgment, or request an extension of time, should they so choose, or for any party to move to reopen the action, upon good cause being shown is extended to and including 30 days from the date of this Order. After that 30-day period, however, without further order, this dismissal shall be deemed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 5/12/2025. (EKB)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
85 85 misc Stipulation Fri 05/09 4:10 PM
STIPULATION To Extend Time To Submit Stipulated Form of Final Order or Judgment by Cornerstone Advisors of Arizona, LLC. (Leonhardt, Kris)
Related: [-]