New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael E Farbiarz
Referred: Stacey D Adams
Case #: 2:24-cv-01146
Nature of Suit196 Contract - Franchise
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2024
Terminated:Oct 10, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 5:06 AM EDT
Defendant
CHRISTINE SUSANNE KLEIN
Represented By
ANDREW LOUIS SMITH
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker
contact info
Defendant
RK MOTELS, LLC
Represented By
ANDREW LOUIS SMITH
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker
contact info
Defendant
MOHAN LAL SEPLA
Represented By
ANDREW LOUIS SMITH
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker
contact info
Plaintiff
TRAVELODGE HOTELS, INC.
Represented By
BRYAN PAUL COUCH
Connell Foley LLP
contact info
ERIK J. DETTLOFF
Connell Foley LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, December 02, 2024
22 22 2 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Mon 12/02 4:31 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael E. Farbiarz on 12/2/2024. (qa, )
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Stipulation Mon 12/02 1:02 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL by TRAVELODGE HOTELS, INC.. (COUCH, BRYAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/25 3:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ALYSSA MARIE JASUALE on behalf of TRAVELODGE HOTELS, INC. (JASUALE, ALYSSA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Thu 10/10 3:53 PM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 12/9/2024. Signed by Judge Michael E. Farbiarz on 10/9/2024. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
minutes Settlement Conference Thu 10/24 1:06 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams: Settlement Conference held on 10/9/2024. (smf)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
18 18 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 10/04 4:48 PM
TEXT ORDER: The court is in receipt of Defendant's letter dated October 1, 2024 requesting a time change for the October 8, 2024 settlement conference due to a medical appointment. Unfortunately, the Court does not have availability on the morning of October 8, 2024. However, the Court has availability the following day. Accordingly, the settlement conference currently scheduled for October 8, 2024 is hereby rescheduled for October 9, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. IN PERSON at the Frank R. Lautenberg Post Office and U.S. Courthouse, 2 Federal Square, Courtroom 9, Newark, NJ 07102. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 10/4/2024. (ps)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
17 17 misc Letter Tue 10/01 11:35 AM
Letter from Andrew Smith re 16 Terminate Hearings,,, Order,,, Set Hearings,,. (SMITH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
16 16 order 1 - Terminate Hearings Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 09/17 5:40 PM
TEXT ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the settlement conference currently scheduled for September 25, 2024 is hereby rescheduled to October 8, 2024 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Adams IN PERSON at the Frank R. Lautenberg Post Office and U.S. Courthouse, 2 Federal Square, Courtroom 9, Newark, NJ 07102. (Settlement Conference set for 10/8/2024 at 01:30 PM in Newark - PO Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 9/17/2024. (smf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
15 15 notice Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to Case Wed 08/14 2:50 PM
Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney ERIK J. DETTLOFF terminated. (DETTLOFF, ERIK)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
14 14 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 07/26 4:06 PM
TEXT ORDER: The parties shall appear for a settlement conference before Magistrate Judge Stacey Adams on September 25, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. IN PERSON at the Frank R. Lautenberg Post Office and U.S. Courthouse, 2 Federal Square, Courtroom 9, Newark, NJ 07102. Trial counsel as well as parties/persons with full settlement authority must attend the settlement conference. Each party shall submit, by email to SDA_orders@njd.uscourts.gov , a confidential settlement memorandum of no more than ten double spaced pages no later than five business days before the conference. Voluminous exhibits to settlement letters (exceeding 20 pages) will not be reviewed by the Court unless submitted in hard copy that is received by Chambers no later than five business days in advance of the settlement conference. Discovery is stayed until after the settlement conference. If the settlement conference is unsuccessful then the Court will enter the pretrial scheduling order at that time. (Settlement Conference set for 9/25/2024 at 10:00 AM in Newark - PO Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 7/26/2024. (smf)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Fri 07/26 4:03 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/26/2024. (smf)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
13 13 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 07/19 9:59 AM
TEXT ORDER: This matter was recently reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams. The initial scheduling conference scheduled for 07/26/24 at 3:30 p.m. shall proceed as scheduled before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams except it is converted into a video conference. Microsoft Teams login credentials will be provided. The parties shall file a proposed joint discovery plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form joint discovery plan can be found[LINK:here] . (Initial Conference set for 7/26/2024 at 03:00 PM in Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 7/19/2024. (smf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 07/09 3:54 PM
Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams. Magistrate Judge James B. Clark no longer assigned to the case. (and)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 07/08 12:39 PM
LETTER ORDER Adjourning the Initial Conference to 7/26/2024 at 11:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 7/8/2024. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
11 11 discov Joint Discovery Plan Thu 06/27 10:44 AM
Joint Discovery Plan by TRAVELODGE HOTELS, INC..(COUCH, BRYAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
10 10 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Mon 05/06 10:30 AM
LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 7/10/2024 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/6/2024. (seb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/02 4:44 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by CHRISTINE SUSANNE KLEIN, RK MOTELS, LLC, MOHAN LAL SEPLA.(SMITH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 04/29 4:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRAVELODGE HOTELS, INC.. CHRISTINE SUSANNE KLEIN served on 4/5/2024, answer due 4/26/2024. (COUCH, BRYAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/04 4:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW LOUIS SMITH on behalf of CHRISTINE SUSANNE KLEIN, RK MOTELS, LLC, MOHAN LAL SEPLA (SMITH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
6 6 misc Stipulation Mon 04/01 4:16 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint For an Extension of Time to Answer by CHRISTINE SUSANNE KLEIN, RK MOTELS, LLC, MOHAN LAL SEPLA. (SMITH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/01 5:18 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Magistrate Judge E. S. Kiel no longer assigned to the case. (JB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 02/28 11:40 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHRISTINE SUSANNE KLEIN, RK MOTELS, LLC, MOHAN LAL SEPLA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/28 10:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ERIK J. DETTLOFF on behalf of TRAVELODGE HOTELS, INC. (DETTLOFF, ERIK)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Wed 02/28 10:40 AM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by TRAVELODGE HOTELS, INC.. (COUCH, BRYAN)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Wed 02/28 10:39 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRAVELODGE HOTELS, INC. identifying WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (COUCH, BRYAN)
Related: [-]
1 1 95 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 02/28 10:34 AM
COMPLAINT against CHRISTINE SUSANNE KLEIN, RK MOTELS, LLC, MOHAN LAL SEPLA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15125394), filed by TRAVELODGE HOTELS, INC..(COUCH, BRYAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 02/28 11:19 AM
Case assigned to Judge Michael E. Farbiarz and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (jr)
Related: [-]