Raw Story Media, Inc. et al v. OpenAI Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:25-md-03143
Lead case: 1:25-md-03143
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Sidney H Stein |
Referred: | Ona T Wang |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01514 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:1201 Digital Millennium Copyright Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 28, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 4:40 AM EDT |
Defendant
OAI Corporation, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OpenAI GP LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OpenAI Global LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OpenAI Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OpenAI Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OpenAI LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OpenAI OpCo LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AlterNet Media, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raw Story Media, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, May 09, 2025 | ||
147 | 147
![]() ORDER: The Court will hold an In-Person Discovery Status Conference for all actions under 25-md-3143 on May 27, 2025, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. The parties to each case or consolidated case are directed to file a joint dispute chart by May 20, 2025. For any parties new to this Court, joint dispute charts should identify: (1) the relevant dispute, (2) each party's position in no more than two short paragraphs,1 (3) the relevant ECF numbers for such dispute (including oppositions and replies), and (4) hyperlinks2 to relevant ECF filings cited. As the Court has noted before, (see, e.g., Case No. 23-cv-8292, ECF 321), the parties should NOT include any "issues" for which the parties have not fully engaged in the meet and confer process; any such disputes will be denied outright. The parties are encouraged to refer to previous joint dispute charts filed in Case Nos. 23-cv-8292 and 23-cv-11195 for formatting. (See, e.g., 23-cv-8292, ECF No. 397; 23-cv-11195, ECF No. 518). The Court will issue a separate order regarding the News Plaintiffs' supplemental letter re: potential spoliation of output log data. SO ORDERED. ( Discovery Hearing set for 5/27/2025 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 5/9/2025) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW et al. (jjc) |
|
Wednesday, May 07, 2025 | ||
146 | 146
![]() ORDER denying (18) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference in case 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW. OpenAIs request for an adjournment of the initial case management conference scheduled for May 22 at 10:00 a.m. [Doc. No. 18] is denied. Mr. Van Nest may appear by MS Teams as long as OpenAI has an attorney in the courtroom with authority to speak on behalf of OpenAI. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/7/2025) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW et al. (jca) |
|
Tuesday, May 06, 2025 | ||
145 | 145
![]() LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for May 22, 2025 by OpenAI addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Robert A. Van Nest, Herman Yue, and Joseph C. Gratz dated May 6, 2025. Document filed by OpenAI Inc., OpenAI OpCo LLC, OAI Corporation LLC, OAI Corporation, LLC, OpenAI GP LLC, OpenAI GP, LLC, OpenAI Global LLC, OpenAI Global, L.L.C., OpenAI Holdings LLC, OpenAI Holdings, LLC, OpenAI LLC, OpenAI LP, OpenAI OpCo LLC(a Delaware limited liability corporation), OpenAI OpCo, L.L.C., OpenAI Startup Fund GP I LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund GP I LLC(a Delaware limited liability company), OpenAI Startup Fund I LP, OpenAI Startup Fund I LP(a Delaware limited partnership), OpenAI Startup Fund Management LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund Management LLC(a Delaware limited liability company), OpenAI, Inc., OpenAI, Inc. Copyright Infringement Litigation, OpenAI, LLC, OpenAI GP LLC, OpenAI Inc., OpenAI LP(a Delaware limited partnership).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW et al..(Van Nest, Robert) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
144 | 144
![]() MOTION for Brian M. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by OAI Corporation, LLC, OpenAI GP, LLC, OpenAI Global LLC, OpenAI Holdings, LLC, OpenAI, LLC, OpenAI Inc., OpenAI LP, OpenAI OpCo LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund GP I LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund I LP, OpenAI Startup Fund Mangement, LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW et al..(Kramer, Brian) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
misc
Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 05/06 9:53 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. (16 in 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW) MOTION for Brian M. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-31034919. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Affidavit must be stamped and notarized;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW et al.(rju) |
||
misc
Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
Tue 05/06 3:29 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (535 in 1:23-cv-11195-SHS-OTW, 160 in 1:24-cv-01515-SHS-OTW, 45 in 1:25-cv-03291-SHS-OTW, 413 in 1:23-cv-08292-SHS-OTW, 17 in 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW, 77 in 1:25-cv-03297-SHS-OTW, 144 in 1:24-cv-01514-SHS-OTW) MOTION for Brian M. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW et al.(rju) |
||
Monday, May 05, 2025 | ||
143 | 143
![]() FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Brian M. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-31034919. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by OpenAI GP, LLC, OpenAI Global LLC, OpenAI Holdings, LLC, OpenAI, Inc., OpenAI GP LLC, OpenAI Inc., OpenAI LP, OpenAI OpCo LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund GP I LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund I LP, OpenAI Startup Fund Mangement, LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW et al..(Kramer, Brian) Modified on 5/6/2025 (rju). |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
142 | 142
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Drew Alan Hillier on behalf of OAI Corporation, LLC, OpenAI GP, LLC, OpenAI Global LLC, OpenAI Holdings, LLC, OpenAI, Inc., OpenAI, LLC, OpenAI LP, OpenAI OpCo LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund GP I LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund I LP, OpenAI Startup Fund Mangement, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW et al..(Hillier, Drew) |