New Hampshire District Court
Judge:Joseph N Laplante
Referred: Talesha L Saint-Marc
Case #: 1:24-cv-00060
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2024
Terminated:May 21, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 4:41 AM EDT
Defendant
Federal Police
Plaintiff
Jason Carter
244 Lake Ave #3
Manchester, NH 03103


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 05/21 1:28 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (jb)
Related: [-]
order Order Tue 05/21 3:41 PM
ENDORSED ORDER reviewing 7 Notice to Withdraw Entire Case. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
8 8 notice Notice - Other Tue 05/21 1:21 PM
DISREGARD DUPLICATE ENTRY - NOTICE to Withdraw Entire Case by Jason Carter.(jb) Modified on 5/21/2024 to add disregard text (jb)
Related: [-]
7 7 respoth Withdrawal of Claim Mon 05/13 2:25 PM
Notice to Withdraw Entire Case by Jason Carter.(jb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
6 6 misc Exhibit Thu 04/18 10:07 AM
Exhibit (USB drive) to5 Amended Complaint by Jason Carter.(jb)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 04/18 10:07 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Federal Police filed by Jason Carter. Certain exhibits maintained conventionally in Clerk's Office. (jb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
4 4 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Sat 03/30 2:38 PM
ORDER granting in part 3 Motion to Speak to Judge. The court allows the plaintiff to file the exhibits as outlined on or before April 26, 2024. Plaintiff is also granted leave to file an Amended Complaint as outlined by April 26, 2024. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Talesha L. Saint-Marc.(jb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
3 3 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 02/28 11:26 AM
MOTION to Speak to Judge filed by Jason Carter.(ed)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs Wed 02/28 11:09 AM
MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs filed by Jason Carter.(ed)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/28 11:02 AM
COMPLAINT against Federal Police filed by Jason Carter.(ed)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons - Waiver
utility Case Assigned Wed 02/28 11:28 AM
Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante and US Magistrate Judge Talesha L. Saint-Marc. The case designation is: 1:24-cv-60-JL-TSM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
Related: [-]
notice Notice - ECF Wed 02/28 11:29 AM
NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] . Compliance Deadline set for 3/29/2024.(ed)
Related: [-]
order Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs Wed 02/28 1:18 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Text of Order: Plaintiff's request to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs is hereby granted, but only for the purpose of waiving the filing fee. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Talesha L. Saint-Marc.(ed)
Related: [-]