New Jersey District Court
Judge:Brian R Martinotti
Referred: Leda D Wettre
Case #: 2:24-cv-01155
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 5:08 AM EDT
Defendant
LUIS FERREIRA
Represented By
ANTHONY M. RAINONE
Brach Eichler LLC
contact info
ERIC MAGNELLI
Brach Eichler LLC
contact info
Defendant
NEWARK FIRE SPRINKLER CORP.
Represented By
ANTHONY M. RAINONE
Brach Eichler LLC
contact info
ERIC MAGNELLI
Brach Eichler LLC
contact info
Notice Only
nefldw
Plaintiff
MANUEL TENEMAZA
Represented By
ANDREW GLENN
Jaffe Glenn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
MARIO REY
Represented By
ANDREW GLENN
Jaffe Glenn Law Group, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
35 35 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 04/29 8:35 AM
LETTER ORDER withdrawing32 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 4/25/2025. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
34 34 misc Letter Thu 04/24 7:20 PM
Letter from Andrew I Glenn. (GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
33 33 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/21 2:04 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by LUIS FERREIRA, NEWARK FIRE SPRINKLER CORP., TRI-COUNTY CONTRACTORS, LLC re32 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (MAGNELLI, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Eric Magnelli, Esq.,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit H,
Att: 10 Exhibit I,
Att: 11 Exhibit J,
Att: 12 Exhibit K,
Att: 13 Exhibit L,
Att: 14 Exhibit M,
Att: 15 Exhibit N,
Att: 16 Exhibit O,
Att: 17 Exhibit P,
Att: 18 Exhibit Q
Monday, April 14, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/14 9:20 AM
Set Deadlines as to32 MOTION to Amend/Correct. Motion set for 5/5/2025 before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (adc, )
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Mon 04/14 9:35 AM
32 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff's Amended Complaint REFERRED to Leda D. Wettre. (lr, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
32 32 motion Amend/Correct Fri 04/11 8:04 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs.(GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
31 31 1 pgs order Order Wed 03/19 10:22 PM
LETTER ORDER: Plaintiffs shall file their Motion to Amend on or before April 11, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 3/19/2025. (ld)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
30 30 misc Letter Tue 03/18 2:06 PM
Letter from Andrew I Glenn. (GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
29 29 order Scheduling Order Wed 03/12 3:59 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 3/11/2025. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
28 28 misc Letter Fri 03/07 12:04 PM
Letter from Andrew I Glenn. (GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
27 27 order Scheduling Order Tue 02/25 9:58 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 2/24/2025. (adc, )
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Tue 02/25 9:50 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Status Conference held on 2/24/2025. (LM, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
26 26 misc Letter Fri 02/21 1:57 PM
Letter from Andrew I Glenn. (GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
25 25 misc Letter Wed 02/12 12:52 PM
Letter from Eric Magnelli, Esq. re 22 Text Order,,. (MAGNELLI, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
24 24 misc Letter Fri 02/07 10:46 PM
Letter from Andrew I Glenn. (GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Letter Fri 02/07 11:16 AM
Letter from Andrew I Glenn. (GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
22 22 order Text Order Mon 02/03 10:34 AM
TEXT ORDER - The Court is in receipt of the parties' January 31, 2025 letter regarding conditional certification of a collective action (ECF21 ). Plaintiffs are directed to file a position letter regarding the proposed date range for the collective they seek to certify no later than February 7, 2025. Defendant shall file a responding position letter no later than February 14, 2025. The telephone conference set for February 24, 2025 at 4:00 p.m. before the undersigned will proceed as scheduled. Dial-in information for the conference is (973) 437-5535, access code 621 640 830#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 2/3/2025. (rn)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
21 21 misc Letter Fri 01/31 2:04 PM
Letter from Andrew I Glenn. (GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
20 20 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 01/15 12:22 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by NEWARK FIRE SPRINKLER CORP., LUIS FERREIRA, TRI-COUNTY CONTRACTORS, LLC.(MAGNELLI, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
19 19 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 12/26 3:26 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against LUIS FERREIRA, NEWARK FIRE SPRINKLER CORP., TRI-COUNTY CONTRACTORS, LLC, filed by MANUEL TENEMAZA, MARIO REY.(JAFFE, JODI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
18 18 order Scheduling Order Thu 12/12 4:45 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 12/12/2024. (sm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
17 17 misc Letter Wed 12/11 5:56 PM
Letter from Andrew I Glenn. (GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
minutes Status Conference Thu 11/14 5:17 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Status Conference held on 11/14/2024. (LM, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
16 16 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 09/23 3:11 PM
TEXT ORDER: A telephone conference is set for November 14, 2024 at 4:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Dial-in information for the conference is 973-437-5535, access code 683667704#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/23/24. (LM, )
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Mon 09/23 3:17 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Status Conference held on 9/23/2024. (LM, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
15 15 misc Letter Wed 09/18 4:54 PM
Letter from Andrew I Glenn. (GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs order Order Wed 09/18 4:31 PM
LETTER ORDER granting request to submit status letter on 9/18/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/18/2024. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
13 13 misc Letter Mon 09/16 6:06 PM
Letter from Andrew I Glenn. (GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Wed 07/24 4:57 PM
NOTICE by MANUEL TENEMAZA of Filing Consent to Join(JAFFE, JODI)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Wed 07/24 1:21 PM
NOTICE by MARIO REY of Filing Consent to Join(GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent to Join
Thursday, July 18, 2024
10 10 order Scheduling Order Thu 07/18 3:38 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 7/18/2024. (lag, )
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 07/18 1:42 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/18/2024. (LM, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
9 9 discov Joint Discovery Plan Mon 07/15 6:59 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by MANUEL TENEMAZA.(GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
8 8 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 05/21 11:15 AM
LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 7/18/2024 at 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/21/24. (LM, )
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
7 7 1 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Mon 05/20 4:56 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by NEWARK FIRE SPRINKLER CORP.. (MAGNELLI, ERIC)
Related: [-]
6 6 9 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/20 4:54 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by LUIS FERREIRA, NEWARK FIRE SPRINKLER CORP..(MAGNELLI, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/01 12:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY M. RAINONE on behalf of LUIS FERREIRA, NEWARK FIRE SPRINKLER CORP. (RAINONE, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/01 12:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY M. RAINONE on behalf of LUIS FERREIRA, NEWARK FIRE SPRINKLER CORP. (RAINONE, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 03/21 10:54 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MANUEL TENEMAZA. LUIS FERREIRA waiver sent on 3/20/2024, answer due 5/20/2024; NEWARK FIRE SPRINKLER CORP. waiver sent on 3/20/2024, answer due 5/20/2024. (JAFFE, JODI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
2 2 2 pgs service Summons Issued Thu 02/29 3:09 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to LUIS FERREIRA and NEWARK FIRE SPRINKLER CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 02/28 1:01 PM
COMPLAINT against LUIS FERREIRA, NEWARK FIRE SPRINKLER CORP. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15126586) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MANUEL TENEMAZA.(GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 2 pgs Summons,
Att: 3 2 pgs Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 02/28 2:57 PM
Case assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)
Related: [-]