Heycart Inc
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Theodor Albert |
Case #: | 8:24-bk-10483 |
Case Filed: | Feb 28, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Heycart Inc
2600 Michelson Dr Ste 1430
Irvine, CA 92612-6593 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
91 | 91
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Fri 04/26 9:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/26/2024. (Admin.) |
|
90 | 90
order
Employ (BNC-PDF)
Fri 04/26 3:13 PM
Order Granting Application Of Debtor And Debtor-In-Possession To (1) Employ Danning, Gill, Israel & Krasnoff LLP As Its General Bankruptcy Counsel And (2) Approve First And Final Application For Compensation And Reimbursement Of Expenses - DG Is Allowed, On A Final Basis, Fees Of $24,504.50 And Expenses Of $383.56 For Costs Incurred During The Limited Period. (BNC-PDF) - Please See Order For Further Ruling - Signed on 4/26/2024. (GD) |
|
89 | 89
notice
Notice
Fri 04/26 1:08 PM
Notice of Submission of Updated Budget Regarding Order Authoring Use of Cash Collateral Through February 8, 2025, and Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor Heycart Inc . (Shechtman, Zev) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
88 | 88
misc
Declaration That No Party Requested a Hearing on Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)(3))
Fri 04/26 10:23 AM
Declaration That No Party Requested a Hearing on Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)(3)) Filed by Debtor Heycart Inc . (Shechtman, Zev) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
87 | 87
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Thu 04/25 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/25/2024. (Admin.) |
|
86 | 86
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Thu 04/25 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/25/2024. (Admin.) |
|
85 | 85
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR)
Thu 04/25 12:17 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Debtor Heycart Inc. (Shechtman, Zev) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Receipts and Disbursements | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Balance Sheet | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Statement of Operations | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Accounts Receivable | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Accounts Payable | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Bank Statements | ||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
84 | 84
order
Use Cash Collateral (BNC-PDF)
Wed 04/24 3:47 PM
Order Authorizing Use Of Cash Collateral Through February 8, 2025 And Granting Related Relief (BNC-PDF) - Please See Order For Further Ruling - Signed on 4/24/2024 (GD) |
|
83 | 83
court
Hearing Held (Motion)
Wed 04/24 1:14 PM
Hearing Held - Motion is granted. Movant to submit order. (GD) |
|
82 | 82
court
Hearing Held (Motion)
Wed 04/24 1:14 PM
Hearing Held Final Hearing - Motion is granted. Movant to submit order (GD) |
|
81 | 81
court
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Wed 04/24 12:24 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued The Hearing date is set for 4/24/2024 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - Continued to 4-24-24 at 11:00 a.m. Per Court's Own Motion - Notice Of Later Start Time For Hrg Filed 4-22-24 - See Doc #74(GD) |
|
80 | 80
court
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Wed 04/24 12:22 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued Re:22 Final Hearing On Debtor's Emergency Motion For Entry Of Order (1) Authorizing Use Of Cash Collateral On An Interim Basis Pending A Final Hearing (2) Scheduling A Final Hearing On The Debtor's Request For Authority To Use Cash Collateral Through February 8 2025, (3) Prohibiting The Freeze of Any Debtor Accounts; And (4) Granting Related Relief The Hearing date is set for 4/24/2024 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - Continued To 4-24-24 at 11:00 a.m. Per Court's Own Motion - Notice of Change Of Hearing Time Filed 4-22-24 - See Doc #75 (GD) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
79 | 79
order
Non-resident attorney to appear in a specific case per Local Bankruptcy rule (BNC-PDF)
Tue 04/23 12:54 PM
ORDER on application of non-resident Brian T. Peterson attorney to appear in a specific case per Local Bankruptcy rule (BNC-PDF) Signed on 4/23/2024 (GD) |
|
78 | 78
order
Non-resident attorney to appear in a specific case per Local Bankruptcy rule (BNC-PDF)
Tue 04/23 12:52 PM
ORDER on application of non-resident attorney Paige Topper to appear in a specific case per Local Bankruptcy rule (BNC-PDF) Signed on 4/23/2024 (GD) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
77 | 77
misc
Notice of Lodgment
Mon 04/22 5:07 PM
Notice of lodgment Filed by Creditor Amazon Capital Services, Inc. . (Sargent, Brandy) |
|
76 | 76
motion
Non-resident attorney to appear in a specific case per Local Bankruptcy rule (motion)
Mon 04/22 5:00 PM
Application of non-resident attorney to appear in a specific case per Local Bankruptcy rule for Brian Peterson Filed by Creditor Amazon Capital Services, Inc. (Sargent, Brandy) |
|
75 | 75
notice
Notice
Mon 04/22 3:50 PM
Notice of Change of Hearing Time Regarding Debtor's Emergency Motion for Entry of Order (1) Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral on an Interim Basis Pending a Final Hearing, (2) Scheduling a Final Hearing on the Debtor's Request for Authority to Use Cash Collateral Through February 8, 2025, (3) Prohibiting the Freeze of Any Debtor Accounts, and (4) Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor Heycart Inc . (Shechtman, Zev) |
|
74 | 74
notice
Notice
Mon 04/22 3:16 PM
Notice Notice Of Later Start Time For Hearing On Application Of Debtor And Debtor-In-Possession To (1) Employ Danning, Gill, Israel & Krasnoff, LLP, As Its General Bankruptcy Counsel, And (2) Approve First And Final Application For Compensation And Reimbursement Of Expenses with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor Heycart Inc . (D'Alba, Michael) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
73 | 73
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Fri 04/19 9:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/19/2024. (Admin.) |
|
72 | 72
motion
Non-resident attorney to appear in a specific case per Local Bankruptcy rule (motion)
Fri 04/19 3:00 PM
Application of non-resident attorney to appear in a specific case per Local Bankruptcy rule 2090-1(b) (Paige Topper) Filed by Debtor Heycart Inc (Shechtman, Zev) |
|
71 | 71
motion
Non-resident attorney to appear in a specific case per Local Bankruptcy rule (motion)
Fri 04/19 1:15 PM
Application of non-resident attorney Brian T. Peterson to appear in a specific case per Local Bankruptcy rule Filed by Creditor Amazon Capital Services, Inc. - NEED HOLOGRAPHIC SIGNATURE (GD) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Fee Paid | ||
70 | 70
answer
Reply
Fri 04/19 1:14 PM
Reply to Filed by Debtor Heycart Inc (Shechtman, Zev) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Zev Shechtman and Order Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral Through February 8, 2025, and Granting Related Relief | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service of Document | ||
69 | 69
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR)
Fri 04/19 1:04 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Debtor Heycart Inc. (Shechtman, Zev) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Cash Receipts and Disbursements | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Balance Sheet | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Statement of Operations | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Accounts Receiveable | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Accounts Payable | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Bank Statements |