California Central District Court
Judge:John A Kronstadt
Referred: Margo A Rocconi
Case #: 2:24-cv-01628
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause42:405 Fair Housing Act
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2024
Terminated:Jul 22, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 1:20 AM PDT
Creditor
Daniel Michael Clauss
Case, Ibrahim & Clauss, LLP 15615 Alton Parkway, Suite 450
Irvine, CA 92618
Defendant
Kuo Chen Hsu
Plaintiff
Ashraf El Gendy
Represented By
Joshua-Eleazar Esmeralda Matic
Matic Law Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Riham Moussa
Represented By
Joshua-Eleazar Esmeralda Matic
Matic Law Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, July 22, 2024
14 14 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Mon 07/22 4:05 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Attorney Ashraf El Gendy, Riham Moussa. Dismissal is without prejudice.. (Matic, Joshua-Eleazar)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
13 13 misc Response Fri 07/19 11:49 AM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Ashraf El Gendy, Riham Moussato Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,,,12 (Matic, Joshua-Eleazar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, July 12, 2024
12 12 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 07/12 1:44 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION AS TO KUO CHEN HSU, ET AL. by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than July 19, 2024, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. In the absence of showing good cause, an action shall be dismissed if the summons and complaint have not been served within 90 days after the filing of the complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). In light of the filing date of February 28, 2024, proof(s) of service were due by May 28, 2024. An action may also be dismissed prior to such time if the Plaintiff fails diligently to prosecute the action. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of an appropriate response. No oral argument will be heard unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Plaintiff is advised that the Court will consider the filing of a responsive pleading to the complaint and/or proof(s) of service, which indicates proper service in full compliance with the federal rules, on or before the date upon which the response is due, as a satisfactory response to the Order to Show Cause. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Lien Wed 05/01 6:04 PM
NOTICE OF LIEN filed by Judgment Creditor Daniel Michael Clauss. (Clauss, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 03/18 9:39 AM
STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
9 9 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Thu 03/14 3:43 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-01628 JAK(MARx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/01 11:55 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Kuo Chen Hsu. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 03/01 11:49 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 03/01 11:48 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 03/01 11:48 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (sh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 02/29 6:44 AM
Certificate AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by ATTY El Gendy, Riham Moussa, (Matic, Joshua-Eleazar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
3 3 notice Summons Request Wed 02/28 10:54 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by ATTY El Gendy, Riham Moussa. (Matic, Joshua-Eleazar)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 02/28 10:48 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movants El Gendy, Riham Moussa. (Matic, Joshua-Eleazar)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 02/28 10:44 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36995835 - Fee: $405, filed by LEAD Riham Moussa, El Gendy. (Attorney Joshua-Eleazar Esmeralda Matic added to party El Gendy(pty:bkmov), Attorney Joshua-Eleazar Esmeralda Matic added to party Riham Moussa(pty:bkmov))(Matic, Joshua-Eleazar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit