Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John F Murphy
Case #: 2:24-cv-00870
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2024
Terminated:Oct 23, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 4:46 AM EDT
Defendant
CARLOS ACEVEDO
Represented By
JUSTIN A. BRITTON
Marks O'Neill
contact info
Noreen P Kemether
Marks, Oneill, O'Brien, Doherty & Kelly, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
CARGROUP HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By
JUSTIN A. BRITTON
Marks O'Neill
contact info
Noreen P Kemether
Marks, Oneill, O'Brien, Doherty & Kelly, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
ARIEL WENTWORTH
Represented By
CAROLINE MILLER
Derek Smith Law Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
11 11 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 10/23 1:28 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal OF COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE by CARLOS ACEVEDO, CARGROUP HOLDINGS, LLC. (Kemether, Noreen)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
10 10 order Scheduling Order Mon 06/10 11:17 AM
ORDER THAT ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 10/8/24. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 10/22/24; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN F MURPHY ON 6/10/24. 6/10/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
9 9 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Mon 06/10 10:43 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN F MURPHY RULE 16 Conference held on 6/10/24. (JL)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
8 8 discov Discovery Plan Fri 06/07 1:43 PM
Discovery Plan by ARIEL WENTWORTH.(MILLER, CAROLINE)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/29 12:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Noreen P Kemether on behalf of CARLOS ACEVEDO, CARGROUP HOLDINGS, LLC (Kemether, Noreen)
Related: [-]
6 6 8 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Mon 04/29 11:52 AM
ORDER THAT AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE VIA MICROSOFT TEAMS WILL BE HELD ON 6/10/24 AT 10:00 A.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN F MURPHY ON 4/29/24. 4/29/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/25 3:29 PM
ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by CARLOS ACEVEDO, CARGROUP HOLDINGS, LLC.(BRITTON, JUSTIN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 03/14 5:47 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ARIEL WENTWORTH. CARLOS ACEVEDO waiver sent on 2/28/2024, answer due 4/29/2024. (MILLER, CAROLINE)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 03/14 5:46 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ARIEL WENTWORTH. CARGROUP HOLDINGS, LLC waiver sent on 2/28/2024, answer due 4/29/2024. (MILLER, CAROLINE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 02/29 8:09 AM
Summons Issued as to CARLOS ACEVEDO, CARGROUP HOLDINGS, LLC. Forwarded To: E-MAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 2/29/24 (JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Wed 02/28 3:32 PM
COMPLAINT against CARLOS ACEVEDO, CARGROUP HOLDINGS, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17294334.), filed by ARIEL WENTWORTH.(MILLER, CAROLINE) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/28/2024) (sbt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form,
Att: 3 Track Designation Form