Delaware District Court
Judge:Jon P Mccalla
Case #: 1:24-cv-00266
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 4:36 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Catalyst Orthoscience Inc.
Represented By
James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
contact info
John F. Bennett
contact info
Paul M. Ulrich
contact info
Paul J. Linden
contact info
Ava M. Abner
contact info
Michelle Streifthau-Livizos
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Shoulder Innovations, Inc.
Represented By
Nathan Roger Hoeschen
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info
Karen Elizabeth Keller
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info
Andrew S. McElligott
contact info
Lindsey Michelle Gellar
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info
Jon Gurka
contact info
Ryan Fitzgerald
contact info
Emily DiBenedetto
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Catalyst Orthoscience Inc.
Represented By
James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
contact info
John F. Bennett
contact info
Paul M. Ulrich
contact info
Paul J. Linden
contact info
Ava M. Abner
contact info
Michelle Streifthau-Livizos
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Shoulder Innovations, Inc.
Represented By
Nathan Roger Hoeschen
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info
Karen Elizabeth Keller
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info
Andrew S. McElligott
contact info
Lindsey Michelle Gellar
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info
Jon Gurka
contact info
Ryan Fitzgerald
contact info
Emily DiBenedetto
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info
Defendant
Catalyst Orthoscience Inc.
Represented By
James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
contact info
John F. Bennett
contact info
Paul M. Ulrich
contact info
Paul J. Linden
contact info
Ava M. Abner
contact info
Michelle Streifthau-Livizos
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Shoulder Innovations, Inc.
Represented By
Nathan Roger Hoeschen
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info
Karen Elizabeth Keller
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info
Andrew S. McElligott
contact info
Lindsey Michelle Gellar
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info
Jon Gurka
contact info
Ryan Fitzgerald
contact info
Emily DiBenedetto
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
142 142 notice Notice - Other Thu 05/01 3:36 PM
NOTICE of PGR Event by Shoulder Innovations, Inc. (Keller, Karen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
141 141 discov Notice of Service Thu 04/24 9:06 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Shoulder Innovations' Final Infringement Contentions filed by Shoulder Innovations, Inc..(Keller, Karen)
Related: [-]