Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Julie S Sneed
Referred: Robert M Norway
Case #: 6:24-cv-00411
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2024
Terminated:Jul 30, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 4:39 AM EDT
Defendant
Orion180 Insurance Services, LLC
Represented By
Jacob Abrams
Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Owens Insurance Agency, Inc.
Represented By
Raiza Giselle Leal
Carr Allison
contact info
Raiza Leal
Carr Allison
contact info
Jennifer Anderson Hoffman
Carr Allison
contact info
Rebecca Blunden
Copeland, Cook, Taylor & Bush P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
33 33 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 07/30 12:22 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LAB)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
32 32 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 07/29 3:20 PM
ORDER. This action is dismissed without prejudice. Any pending motions are denied as moot. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending deadlines and thereafter close this case. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 7/29/2024. (SC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
31 31 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 07/25 11:37 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice (Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i)) by Owens Insurance Agency, Inc. (Blunden, Rebecca) Modified text on 7/25/2024 (KME)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
30 30 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 07/15 4:30 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 29 Defendant's Third Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Defendant may respond to the Amended Complaint by July 29, 2024. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on July 15, 2024. (DAD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
29 29 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Thu 07/11 5:14 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re17 Amended Complaint by Orion180 Insurance Services, LLC. (Abrams, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
28 28 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 06/28 9:18 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 27 Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant may respond to the amended complaint by July 15, 2024. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on June 28, 2024. (DAD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
27 27 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Wed 06/26 9:40 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re17 Amended Complaint by Orion180 Insurance Services, LLC. (Abrams, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
26 26 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/30 4:15 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Orion180 Insurance Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Orion180 Group, Inc for Orion180 Insurance Services, LLC.. (Abrams, Jacob)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 05/30 3:24 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 22 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the Amended Complaint by July 1, 2024. Defendant's 20 motion is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on May 30, 2024. (DAD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of a Related Action Wed 05/29 3:12 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Orion180 Insurance Services, LLC. Related case(s): No (Abrams, Jacob)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 05/29 3:09 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jacob Abrams on behalf of Orion180 Insurance Services, LLC. Lead Counsel: Jacob Abrams. (Abrams, Jacob)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Wed 05/29 3:04 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re17 Amended Complaint by Orion180 Insurance Services, LLC. (Abrams, Jacob)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 05/29 9:20 AM
NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Tue 05/28 5:11 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re17 Amended Complaint by Orion180 Insurance Services, LLC.(Abrams, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order to comply with electronic filing Wed 04/03 9:33 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER for Raiza Leal to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 4/3/2024. (GNB)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
17 17 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/25 7:49 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief against Orion180 Insurance Services, LLC filed by Owens Insurance Agency, Inc..(Blunden, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-MGA Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-Sept 1, 2023 Termination Notice,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3- Sept 1, 2023 Notice to Subagents
Monday, March 18, 2024
16 16 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/18 11:50 AM
Case Reassigned to District Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 6:24-cv-411-JSS-RMN. Judge Wendy W. Berger no longer assigned to the case. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
misc Pay Fee Wed 03/13 10:22 AM
FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21864936 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney Rebecca Blunden. (Hoffman, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
15 15 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/12 1:44 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice provided counsel shall register for and use the Court's electronic filing system. Counsel can register for a CM/ECF login password through the website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under "CM/ECF." Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 3/12/2024. (JBS)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/12 10:59 AM
Amended MOTION for Rebecca Blunden to appear pro hac vice by Owens Insurance Agency, Inc.(Hoffman, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Friday, March 08, 2024
13 13 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/08 8:14 AM
ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion fails to comply with Local Rule 2.01(c)'s requirement that the movant list each case in state or federal court in Florida in which the lawyer has initially appeared in the last thirty-six months. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 3/8/2024. (JBS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/07 10:17 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Owens Insurance Agency, Inc..(Hoffman, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/07 9:50 AM
MOTION for Rebecca Blunden to appear pro hac vice by Owens Insurance Agency, Inc..(Hoffman, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
10 10 order Order Thu 03/07 9:10 AM
ENDORSED ORDER discharging 8 the March 5, 2024 Order to Show Cause. The Court finds that Plaintiff has adequately alleged Defendant's citizenship at this stage of the proceedings. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/7/2024. (MDJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
9 9 misc Response to order to show cause Wed 03/06 4:45 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re8 Order to show cause filed by Owens Insurance Agency, Inc..(Hoffman, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order to show cause Tue 03/05 12:44 PM
ORDER to Show Cause as to Owens Insurance Agency, Inc.: it is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall show cause on or before March 8, 2024, as to why this case should not be dismissed for want of subject-matter jurisdiction. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/5/2024. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order to comply with electronic filing Fri 03/01 11:42 AM
ORDER for Rebecca Blunden and Raiza Leal to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing on or before 3/15/2024. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/1/2024. (RMF)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 03/01 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order Fri 03/01 11:38 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued Standing Orders, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/1/2024. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
4 4 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 02/29 11:04 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:24-cv-411-WWB-RMN. (TNP)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 02/29 11:02 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Rebecca Blunden Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TNP)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 02/29 11:01 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Raiza Leal of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TNP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/28 4:16 PM
COMPLAINT against Orion180 Insurance Services, LLC (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21816556) filed by Owens Insurance Agency, Inc..(Hoffman, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet