California Northern District Court
Judge:Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Case #: 3:24-cv-01215
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2024
Terminated:Nov 26, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 1:22 AM PDT
Defendant
Motive Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Paul Andrew Rosenthal
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath
contact info
Justin O Kay
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Victor James Sandoval
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Bond
Represented By
Anthony I. Paronich
Paronich Law, P.C.
contact info
Dana J Oliver, I
Oliver Law Center, Inc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
35 35 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 11/26 3:21 PM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting 34 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice. (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
34 34 2 pgs motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 11/26 6:01 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Joseph Bond (Paronich, Anthony) Modified on 11/26/2024 (ecg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
33 33 order Order Tue 10/01 9:37 AM
ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 32 parties' stipulation to extend the case management schedule: Fact Discovery Cutoff: December 11, 2024 Expert Witness Disclosure: December 26, 2024 Deadline for Rebuttal Reports: February 6, 2025 Expert Discovery Cutoff: April 3, 2025 Deadline for Class Certification Motion: May 1, 2025 Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on October 1, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amolc2, COURTSTAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 10/01 10:59 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings.(ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
32 32 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 09/24 12:42 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Case Management and Pretrial Scheduling Order filed by Motive Technologies, Inc.. (Rosenthal, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 08/27 1:33 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal filed by Victor James Sandoval, no longer appearing on behalf of Motive Technologies, Inc. in this case (Sandoval, Victor)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
30 30 utility Case Referred to Private ADR Mon 07/29 3:26 PM
CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation selecting Private ADR Mon 07/29 3:26 PM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting 28 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR Mon 07/29 1:06 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Joseph Bond filed by Joseph Bond. (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
27 27 13 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 07/26 9:33 AM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting 26 Stipulated Protective Order. (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
26 26 13 pgs motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 07/25 4:41 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Motive Technologies, Inc..(Rosenthal, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Paul Rosenthal ISO Proposed Stipulated Protective Order
25 25 order Order on Stipulation Thu 07/25 8:41 AM
ORDER DENYING 24 stipulated protective order, subject to resubmission in compliance with the Court's Civil Standing Order. See "Protective Orders/ESI Orders" at pages 7-8. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on July 25, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amolc2, COURTSTAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
24 24 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 07/24 3:07 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Protective Order filed by Motive Technologies, Inc.. (Rosenthal, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
23 23 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Case Referred to Private ADR ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 06/27 2:13 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/27/2024. Case REFERRED to Private ADR. Parties to file joint notice RE mediator selection and mediation schedule due by 7/27/2024. Pretrial schedule as follows: Amended Pleadings / Add Parties due by 8/1/2024. Close of Fact Discovery due by 10/15/2024. Expert Witness Disclosure due by 10/29/2024. Rebuttal Reports due by 12/10/2024. Close of Expert Discovery due by 2/4/2025. Class Certification Motion due by 3/4/2025. Total Time in Court: 8 minutes. Court Reporter: Recorded via Zoom. Plaintiff Attorney: Anthony Paronich. Defendant Attorney: Justin Kay and Paul Rosenthal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/27/2024)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Private ADR Thu 06/27 2:22 PM
CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (cmf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
22 22 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Thu 06/20 4:18 PM
Clerk's Notice Modifying Case Management Conference Time. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2024 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/martinez-olguin-araceli-amo/] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at amocrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than June 25, 2024 at 12:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
21 21 misc Case Management Statement Fri 05/17 9:31 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Joseph Bond. (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/15 8:29 AM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Justin O Kay. (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/15 7:24 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19415669.) filed by Motive Technologies, Inc.. (Kay, Justin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
18 18 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Thu 05/09 4:32 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Rosenthal, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
17 17 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Wed 05/08 5:01 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
16 16 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Fri 05/03 8:35 AM
CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/martinez-olguin-araceli-amo/] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. The names of counsel directly addressing to the Court for each party should be sent to the CRD at AMOCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than June 25, 2024 by 12:00 P.M. PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Related [+] (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jlg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] (s)15
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Fri 05/03 8:23 AM
ORDER GRANTING 14 Joint Administrative Motion To Appear Virtually At The Initial Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on May 3, 2024. (jlg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
14 14 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Thu 05/02 2:15 PM
Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION APPEAR VIRTUALLY AT THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, filed by Joseph Bond. Responses due by 5/6/2024.(Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
13 13 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 04/24 4:27 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Motive Technologies, Inc. (Rosenthal, Paul)
Related: [-]
12 12 8 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/24 4:21 PM
ANSWER to Complaint for Injunction and Damages by Motive Technologies, Inc.. (Rosenthal, Paul)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/24 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Victor James Sandoval (Sandoval, Victor)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/24 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Andrew Rosenthal (Rosenthal, Paul)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/18 8:50 AM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting 3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Anthony Paronich. (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
8 8 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Fri 03/15 12:53 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint,7 Summons Returned Executed Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Joseph Bond. (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/04 11:13 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Bond. Motive Technologies, Inc. served on 3/4/2024, answer due 3/25/2024. (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 02/29 3:22 PM
Summons Issued as to Motive Technologies, Inc.. (sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 02/29 3:12 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/20/2024 at 12:00 PM PST. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. (sec, COURT STAFF) Modified on 2/29/2024 (sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 02/29 7:56 AM
Case assigned to Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 02/29 3:56 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. (sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
3 3 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/28 11:58 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19171086.) filed by Joseph Bond. (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Wed 02/28 5:20 PM
Proposed Summons. (Oliver, Dana)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 02/28 5:11 PM
COMPLAINT against Motive Technologies, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19170654.). Filed by Joseph Bond.(Oliver, Dana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet