Connecticut District Court
Judge:Michael P Shea
Referred: S Dave Vatti
Case #: 3:24-cv-00264
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2024
Terminated:Jul 03, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 25, 2024 4:57 AM EDT
Defendant
Matthew Kalthoff
Represented By
Blake Thomas Sullivan
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Benjamin A. Abrams
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
V. Senatore
Defendant
Jane Kupson Grossman
Represented By
Blake Thomas Sullivan
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Benjamin A. Abrams
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
A. Vakos
Defendant
State of Connecticut Judicial Branch
Represented By
Blake Thomas Sullivan
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Benjamin A. Abrams
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
State of Connecticut ADA Program
Represented By
Blake Thomas Sullivan
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Benjamin A. Abrams
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Luz Santana
Defendant
Orange Police Department
Represented By
Vincent M. Marino
Marino, Zabel & Schellenberg, PLLC
contact info
Owen T. Weaver
Marino, Zabel & Schellenberg, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
O'Keefe
Defendant
Milford Police Department
Defendant
Matthew Lodice
Defendant
Colin Lacey
Defendant
Robert Kochiss
Defendant
Scott Jones
Represented By
Blake Thomas Sullivan
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Benjamin A. Abrams
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Michael Hillis
Defendant
Auden Grogins
Represented By
Blake Thomas Sullivan
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Benjamin A. Abrams
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
John Does
Defendant
Jane Does
Defendant
Derby GA5 Superior Court
Represented By
Blake Thomas Sullivan
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Benjamin A. Abrams
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Laura DeLeo
Represented By
Blake Thomas Sullivan
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Benjamin A. Abrams
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Kurt Correia
Represented By
Vincent M. Marino
Marino, Zabel & Schellenberg, PLLC
contact info
Owen T. Weaver
Marino, Zabel & Schellenberg, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Barbara Belluci
Defendant
Anderson
Represented By
Vincent M. Marino
Marino, Zabel & Schellenberg, PLLC
contact info
Owen T. Weaver
Marino, Zabel & Schellenberg, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Theodora F. Antar
Individually and as next friend and legal guardian of her minor childre A.L. and J.V. 856 Shagbark Drive
Orange, CT 06477


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, April 07, 2025
56 56 order Order on Motion to Transfer / Disqualify / Recuse Judge Mon 04/07 9:36 PM
ORDER: The motion to disqualify the undersigned (ECF No. 50) is DENIED as moot and, in any event, for the reasons I stated in denying nearly identical motions in this and other related cases. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 4/7/2025. (Bender, S)
Related: [-]