PS Construction Services Corporation
Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | A Benjamin Goldgar |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-02784 |
Case Filed: | Feb 28, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 04, 2024 |
Debtor
PS Construction Services Corporation
22134 W Concorde Ct.
Lake Zurich, IL 60047 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Ilene F Goldstein, ESQ
Law Firm of Ilene F. Goldstein 2070 Greenbay Road Pmb 201 60035
Highland Park, IL 60035 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604 |
Docket last updated: 02/29/2024 12:02 AM CST |
Wednesday, February 28, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7a)
Wed 02/28 12:09 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual Fee Amount $338, Filed by David Freydin on behalf of PS Construction Services Corporation (Freydin, David) |
|
Att: 1 Signature Pages | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 02/28 12:13 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-02784 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47579669. Fee Amount $ 338.00 (Freydin, David) (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Asset Corporation)
Wed 02/28 1:11 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/4/2024 at 01:00 PM via Zoom - Goldstein: Meeting ID 785 560 8106, Passcode 7719456502, Phone 1-872-201-2938. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account) |