Texas Southern District Court
Judge:Gray H Miller
Case #: 4:14-cv-03331
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2014
Terminated:Dec 10, 2015
Last checked: Tuesday May 19, 2015 8:08 AM CDT
Conflict Check Party
Arch Capital Group Ltd.
Conflict Check Party
Arch Insurance Group Inc.
Defendant
Arch Insurance Company
Represented By
Brett A Wallingford
Zelle Hofmann Voelbel & Mason LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
The Grace Presbyterian Church of Houston
Represented By
Thomas K Brown
The Brown Law Firm, Lllp
contact info
Ronald Martin Weber, Jr
Crowley Norman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/11/2023 9:22 PM CDT
Thursday, November 20, 2014
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-14082738) filed by The Grace Presbyterian Church of Houston.(Brown, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Arch Insurance Company, filed.(Brown, Thomas)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Martin Weber, Jr. on behalf of The Grace Presbyterian Church of Houston, filed. (Weber, Ronald)
Related: [-]