California Central District Court
Judge:Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr
Referred: A Joel Richlin
Case #: 2:24-cv-01508
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2024
Terminated:Jul 02, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 21, 2024 2:26 AM PDT
Defendant
Rightpath Servicing
Represented By
Andrea M Hicks
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Nationstar
Defendant
Rushmoore Servicing
Plaintiff
Gwendolyn B. Moore
Beneficiary And Executor Individually and on behalf of All others similarly Situated 700 East 52nd Place
Los Angeles, CA 90011
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Nationstar Mortgage
Terminated: 05/03/2024
Represented By
Andrea M Hicks
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Rushmore Loan Management
Terminated: 05/03/2024
Represented By
Andrea M Hicks
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Myrelean Moore
Terminated: 05/03/2024


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
32 32 judgmentCV Judgment Tue 07/02 3:59 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: For the reasons stated in the separate order of dismissal entered this day31 , Plaintiff Gwendolyn B. Moore's claims are dismissed without prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (gk)
Related: [-]
31 31 7 pgs order Order Tue 07/02 3:56 PM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS24 by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Plaintiff's securities fraud claim is dismissed without prejudice for lack of standing. Because amendment would be futile, the dismissal is without leave to amend. Having dismissed the only federal claim, the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claims and dismisses them without prejudice to refiling in state court. (gk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
30 30 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 06/27 9:00 AM
Plaintiff's motion to dismiss is currently scheduled to be heard on June 28, 2024. Because the Court finds this matter suitable for determination without oral argument, the Court vacates the June 28 hearing. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. The Court also vacates the June 28 mandatory scheduling conference. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lfa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
29 29 respm Reply (Motion related) Tue 06/18 10:53 AM
REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 24 filed by Defendants Nationstar Mortgage, Rightpath Servicing, Rushmore Loan Management. (Hicks, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
28 28 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 06/14 8:58 AM
The Court continues the mandatory scheduling conference from June 21, 2024, to June 28, 2024, at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 6C (the same time as the hearing on Defendants' motion to dismiss).THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
27 27 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 06/13 3:07 PM
ANSWER to Motion to Dismiss24 filed by Plaintiff Gwendolyn B. Moore. (gk)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
26 26 respm Declaration (Motion related) Fri 05/24 3:21 PM
DECLARATION of Andrea M. Hicks In Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 24 filed by Defendants Nationstar Mortgage, Rightpath Servicing, Rushmore Loan Management. (Hicks, Andrea)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc For Judicial Notice Fri 05/24 3:18 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 24 filed by Defendants Nationstar Mortgage, Rightpath Servicing, Rushmore Loan Management.(Hicks, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit DOT,
Att: 2 Exhibit Loan Modification,
Att: 3 Exhibit DOT,
Att: 4 Exhibit Assignment of DOT,
Att: 5 Exhibit Sub of Trustee,
Att: 6 Exhibit Notice of Default,
Att: 7 Exhibit Notice of Trustee's Sale,
Att: 8 Exhibit Grant Deed
24 24 motion Dismiss Case Fri 05/24 3:04 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Nationstar Mortgage, Rightpath Servicing, Rushmore Loan Management. Motion set for hearing on 6/28/2024 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Hicks, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
23 23 othcmp Amended Complaint Tue 05/07 3:35 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Nationstar d/b/a Mr. Cooper, Rightpath Servicing, Rushmoore Servicing; Myrelean Moore, Party Rushmore Loan Management, and Nationstar Mortgage terminated; amending Complaint1 ; with Jury Demand filed by Plaintiff Gwendolyn Moore. (gk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
22 22 order Dismiss Case Wed 04/24 6:42 AM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS [DKT. NO.11 ], GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND, AND CONTINUING MANDATORY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr: See order for details. (jgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
19 19 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Tue 04/16 2:14 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; Declaration ; estimated length of trial 3-4 days, filed by Defendants Nationstar Mortgage, Rightpath Servicing, Rushmore Loan Management.. (Hicks, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
21 21 respm Reply (Motion related) Tue 04/16 3:58 PM
PLAINTIFF'S ANSWER TO THE DEFENSE MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Gwendolyn B. Moore, Myrelean Moore. (rolm)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Tue 04/16 3:00 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiffs Gwendolyn B. Moore, Myrelean Moore, Defendants Nationstar Mortgage, Rightpath Servicing, Rushmore Loan Management.(rolm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
18 18 respm Non-Opposition to Motion Fri 04/12 11:03 AM
NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case / Complaint 11 filed by Defendants Nationstar Mortgage, Rightpath Servicing, Rushmore Loan Management. (Hicks, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
17 17 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 04/10 12:47 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Nationstar Mortgage, Rightpath Servicing, Rushmore Loan Management, (Hicks, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
16 16 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Thu 04/04 7:54 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Gwendolyn B. Moore and Myrelean Moore, re Lis Pendens, date of mailing not indicated. (gk)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 04/04 7:50 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiffs Gwendolyn B. Moore and Myrelean Moore, upon Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC served on 2/28/2024, answer due 3/20/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mr. Cooper for Nationstar Mortgage LLC, by serving Sharon Bruner, legal representation for Mr. Cooper, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure. Declaration of diligence attached. (gk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
14 14 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 03/21 4:11 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court sets an in-person Mandatory Scheduling Conference set for hearing on April 26, 2024 at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND DEADLINE TO FILE A JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT. (jgr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
13 13 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 03/20 6:47 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Nationstar Mortgage, Rightpath Servicing, Rushmore Loan Management, re Request for Judicial Notice12 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case / Complaint 11 (Hicks, Andrea)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc For Judicial Notice Wed 03/20 6:14 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case / Complaint 11 filed by Defendants Nationstar Mortgage, Rightpath Servicing, Rushmore Loan Management. (Hicks, Andrea)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss Case Wed 03/20 6:09 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case / Complaint filed by Defendants Nationstar Mortgage, Rightpath Servicing, Rushmore Loan Management. Motion set for hearing on 4/26/2024 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Attorney Andrea M Hicks added to party Nationstar Mortgage(pty:dft), Attorney Andrea M Hicks added to party Rightpath Servicing(pty:dft), Attorney Andrea M Hicks added to party Rushmore Loan Management(pty:dft)) (Hicks, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Andrea Hicks,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
10 10 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 03/06 9:55 AM
On March 1, 2024, the Court updated its standing orders, including the Civil Standing Order, the Mandatory Scheduling Conference Order, the Motion for Summary Judgment Order, and the Civil Pretrial and Trial Order. The parties are directed to read and, where possible (e.g., on any summary judgment motion for which the parties have not yet exchanged papers), comply with these updated standing orders, which can be found on Judge Blumenfeld's webpage. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
9 9 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Mon 03/04 10:04 AM
(In Chambers) Order STRIKING Filing by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: On February 28, Plaintiffs filed a lis pendens request. Because the request fails to comply with the local rules, the Court strikes it (and will not consider it). The request is in the nature of an ex parte application. Yet Plaintiffs failed to comply with Local Rule 7-19.1, which requires that they make a good faith effort to notify Defendant, advise the Court in a declaration of the steps they took to notify the Defendant, and state whether Defendant opposes the application. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
8 8 1 pgs motion Order Wed 02/28 1:46 PM
REQUEST for Lis Pendens filed by Plaintiff Gwendolyn B. Moore. (gk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Lodged Lis Pendens
7 7 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 02/28 11:20 AM
Civil standing order upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 02/28 11:09 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 02/28 11:08 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 02/28 11:07 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. (sh)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 02/28 11:06 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to Defendant Nationstar Mortgage. (sh)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 02/28 11:05 AM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Gwendolyn B. Moore, (sh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Wed 02/28 11:03 AM
COMPLAINT against Defendant Nationstar Mortgage.Case assigned to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin.(Filing fee $ 405 FEE PAID) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Gwendolyn B. Moore, Myrelean Moore. (sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet