California Central District Court
Judge:Otis D Wright, II
Referred: John D Early
Case #: 5:24-cv-00424
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 15, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
30 30 order For Order Fri 05/16 11:05 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge John D. Early: INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER ON THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) (aro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
29 29 order R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations Thu 05/15 9:29 AM
ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge Otis D. Wright, II.24 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. the Report (Dkt. 24) is approved and accepted. The case shall proceed solely on the SAC's: (a) Fourteenth Amendment claims against the County and Dep. Myers, Cpl. Lundy, Dep. Bernart, Sgt. Murphy, Sgt. Ibrahim, Sgt. Tanger, Dr. Cudal, Nurse Sadie, and Dep. Harter; and (b) American with Disabilities Act claim against the County, and not as to any other claim or defendant. [See Order for further details.] (san)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
28 28 order Amend/Correct Wed 03/12 4:11 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge John D. Early: Order re Plaintiff's Notices of Errata/Motions to Amend26 27 . Plaintiff's Requests (Dkt. 26 and 27) are DENIED, but the Court notes Plaintiff's intention to amend the SAC to assert an individual capacity Fourteenth Amendment claim against Deputy Harter if the District Judge approves the Report. IT IS SO ORDERED. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS). (aro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
27 27 motion Amend/Correct Thu 03/06 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Errata/REQUEST to Amend the SAC filed by Plaintiff Scott Joseph Faulkner. (hr)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Amend/Correct Thu 03/06 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Errata/REQUEST to Amend the SAC filed by Plaintiff Scott Joseph Faulkner. (hr)
Related: [-]
25 25 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendation Thu 03/06 2:34 PM
OBJECTION to Report and Recommendation24 filed by Plaintiff Scott Joseph Faulkner.(hr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
24 24 reportrecommend Report and Recommendation (Issued) Tue 02/18 1:58 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED that the District Court issue an order: (1) approving and accepting this Report and Recommendation; (2) dismissing without further leave to amend all claims against Sheriff Bianco, Cpt. Flakes, Lt. Uriarte, Lt. Rodriguez, Sgt. Coleman, Sgt. Johnson 1, Sgt. Johnson 2, Sgt. Wambaugh, Dep. Lopez, Dep. Chandler, Dep. Leyva, Dep. McKinney, Dep. Fisher, Dep. Vazquez, Dep. Zeller, Dep. Piceno, Dep. Leal 1, Cpl. Woody, Dep. Leal 2, Dep. Camacho, Sgt. Dominguez, Dep. Leavitt, Dep. Comstock, Dep. Overton, Dep. Nanez, Dep. Mitchell, Dep. Hernandez, Dep. Lucas, Dep. Gomez, N.P. Enobakhare, Nurse Robert, Nurse Tracy, Nurse Brent; Dep. Dotson, Dep. McCandless, and Dep. Espanol; (3) granting Plaintiff leave to file a Notice of Errata/Request to Amend the SAC by which Plaintiff may request leave to name Dep. Harter in an individual capacity to the SAC's Fourteenth Amendment claim only and no other change, with such Notice to be filed within 21 days of the date the District Judge signs an order accepting this Report; upon filing of a timely, compliant Notice, the Court will direct that the SAC be so amended; failure to file such a compliant Notice within the time permitted will result in Dep. Harter being dismissed without leave to amend; and (4) directing that the case shall otherwise proceed solely on the SAC's: (a) Fourteenth Amendment claims against the County and Dep. Myers, Cpl. Lundy, Dep. Bernart, Sgt. Murphy, Sgt. Ibrahim, Sgt. Tanger, Dr. Cudal, Nurse Sadie, and, if Plaintiff complies with paragraph (3), above, Dep. Harter, as provided above; and (b) ADA claim against the County. Re Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)1 . (aro)
Related: [-]
23 23 reportrecommend Notice of Report and Recommendation Tue 02/18 1:51 PM
NOTICE OF FILING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. Objections to R&R due by 3/10/2025. (aro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
22 22 misc Letter Thu 01/16 10:14 AM
LETTER from Plaintiff Scott Joseph Faulkner (hr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
21 21 attorney Change of Address Fri 10/25 9:42 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address to Smith Correctional Facility, 1627 S. Hargrave St., Banning, CA 92220. Filed by Plaintiff Scott Joseph Faulkner. (hr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
20 20 othcmp Amended Complaint Fri 09/20 12:12 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Unknown Bernart, Chad Blanco, Unknown Camacho, Unknown Chandler, Unknown Coleman, Unknown Comstock, County of Riverside, Cecilia Cudal, Unknown Dominguez, Unknown Dotson, Roselin Enobaknave, Unknown Espanol, Unknown Ferguson, Unknown Fisher, Shannon Flakes, Unknown Gomez, Unknown Harter, Unknown Hernandez, Christopher Ibrahim, Unknown Johnson(individual (1)), Unknown Johnson(Individual (2)), Unknown Leal(individual), Unknown Leavitt, Unknown Leyva, Unknown Lopez, Unknown Lucas, Unknown Lundy, Unknown McCandless, Unknown McKinney, Unknown Meyers, Unknown Mitchell, Unknown Murphy, Unknown Nanez, Unknown Overton, Unknown Plceno, Unknown Rodriguez, Unknown Tanger, Brent Unknown, Robert Unknown, Sadie Unknown, Tracy Unknown, Unknown Uriarte, Unknown Vasquez, Unknown Wambaugh, Unknown Woody, Unknown Zeller; Party Thomas Hylund (individual), John Doe (individual), Michael Mesisca (M.D., individual), Thomas Minahan (M.D., individual), Unknown Prtyan (individual), Unknown Sediqi (individual), Unknown Gerrard (individual) and David Holm (individual) terminated, amending First Amended Complaint6 , filed by Plaintiff Scott Joseph Faulkner(hr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Part 2,
Att: 2 Part 3,
Att: 3 Part 4,
Att: 4 Part 5,
Att: 5 Part 6,
Att: 6 Part 7,
Att: 7 Part 8,
Att: 8 Part 9,
Att: 9 Part 10,
Att: 10 Part 11,
Att: 11 Part 12,
Att: 12 Part 13,
Att: 13 Part 14,
Att: 14 Part 15
19 19 order Amend/Correct Thu 09/19 5:03 PM
MINUTE (In Chambers) Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Amend (Dkt. 18) and Directing the Second Amended Complaint Is the Operative Pleading by Magistrate Judge John D. Early: granting18 MOTION to Amend Complaint. As such, the SAC shall be the operative pleading in the case, subject to screening by the Court under 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2), 1915A. The Clerk's Office is directed to file the SAC as a separate docket entry entitled "Second Amended Complaint". (hr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
18 18 motion Amend/Correct Thu 09/19 10:17 AM
MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Plaintiff Scott Joseph Faulkner. (hr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Part 2,
Att: 2 Part 3,
Att: 3 Part 4
Friday, August 23, 2024
17 17 order Amend/Correct Fri 08/23 2:46 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge John D. Early, Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Amend (Dkt. 15) Without Prejudice. For the foregoing reasons, the Motion (Dkt. 15) is DENIED without prejudice to Plaintiff filing a timely second amended complaint that complies with the Order and the foregoing. In the interests of justice, the Court sua sponte extends the deadline for Plaintiff to select one of the options provided in the Order and file the document required by that option from August 28, 2024 (see Dkt. 14) to September 11, 2024. All other provisions of the Order remain in effect and further extensions are unlikely to be granted.15 (mba)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
16 16 respm Supplement (Motion related) Fri 08/16 9:46 AM
SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Amend Complaint15 , filed by Plaintiff Scott Joseph Faulkner. (mba)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
15 15 motion Amend/Correct Tue 08/13 11:07 AM
MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Plaintiff Scott Joseph Faulkner. (hr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Lodged Proposed Second Amended Complaint
Friday, August 02, 2024
14 14 order Enlargement of Time to File Fri 08/02 1:43 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge John D. Early, Order Granting Plaintiff's Second Extension Request (Dkt. 13). The Request (Dkt. 13) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall have until August 28, 2024, to comply with the Order. All other provisions of the Order remain in effect.13 (mba)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
13 13 motion Enlargement of Time to File Document Thu 08/01 5:41 PM
MOTION for Enlargement of Time filed by Plaintiff Scott Joseph Faulkner. (hr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
12 12 order Amend/Correct Tue 07/09 4:04 PM
MINUTE (In Chambers) Order Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiff's Motion to Amend by Magistrate Judge John D. Early: denying9 MOTION to Amend Complaint. (see document for details) (hr)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Enlargement of Time to File Tue 07/09 12:08 PM
MINUTE (In Chambers) Order Granting Plaintiff's Extension Request by Magistrate Judge John D. Early: granting10 MOTION for Enlargement of Time to File. Plaintiff shall have an additional 14 days, that is, until August 7, 2024, to comply with the Order. (hr)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
10 10 motion Enlargement of Time to File Document Mon 07/08 2:40 PM
MOTION for Enlargement of Time filed by Plaintiff Scott Joseph Faulkner. (hr)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Amend/Correct Mon 07/08 2:39 PM
MOTION to Amend Complaint, re: First Amended Complaint6 filed by Plaintiff Scott Joseph Faulkner. (hr)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
8 8 30+ pgs order Order Mon 06/24 4:51 PM
ORDER REGARDING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. As set forth above, it appears that the FAC states Fourteenth Amendment individual capacity claims against Dep. Myers, Dep. Lundy, Dep. Harter, Dep. Bernart. Sgt. Murphy, Sgt. Ibrahim, and Sgt. Tanger, and an official capacity claim against the County, but does not appear to not state any other claim, although the Court cannot say that the deficiencies cannot be cured by amendment. The Court provides Plaintiff with several options as to how to proceed. Within thirty (30) days of this Order, Plaintiff must choose one of the following options and file the document required by that option:(see document for details) (mba)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Blank Civil Rights Complaint,
Att: 2 Blank Notice of Dismissal
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
7 7 notice Clerical Error (G-11) Wed 05/15 12:57 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: You are hereby notified that due to clerical error, document is illegible and has been replaced by a more legible copy. Re: Amended Complaint6 . (mba)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
6 6 othcmp Amended Complaint Tue 05/14 3:15 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, amending Complaint1 , filed by Plaintiff Scott Joseph Faulkner(hr)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
5 5 20 pgs order Order Fri 04/05 3:47 PM
ORDER REGARDING COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. As indicated above, solely for screening purposes, Plaintiff has stated a Fourteenth Amendment claim against Harter in her individual capacity, but the remaining claims appear subject to dismissal. Accordingly, the Court provides Plaintiff with several options as to how to proceed. Within thirty (30) days of this Order, Plaintiff must choose one of the following options and file the document required by that option:(see document for details) (mba)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Blank Civil Rights Complaint,
Att: 2 Blank Notice of Dismissal
Monday, April 01, 2024
4 4 misc Financial Entry Tue 04/02 8:35 AM
FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $405.00 into the registry of the Court from Scott Joseph Faulkner. Receipt number 780. (igu)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form Wed 02/28 1:01 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
2 2 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 02/28 12:59 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights),1 . The following error(s) was/were found: Plaintiff paid $402 owes $3.00 dollars more. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Prisoner Civil Rights) Wed 02/28 12:53 PM
CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Unknown Bernart, Chad Blanco, Unknown Camacho, Unknown Chandler, Unknown Coleman, Unknown Comstock, County of Riverside, Cecilia Cudal, Unknown Dominguez, Unknown Dotson, Roselin Enobaknave, Unknown Espanol, Unknown Ferguson, Unknown Fisher, Shannon Flakes, Unknown Gerrard, Unknown Gomez, Unknown Harter, Unknown Hernandez, David Holm, Thomas Hylund, Christopher Ibrahim, John Doe, Unknown Johnson, Unknown Leal(individual), Unknown Leavitt, Unknown Leyva, Unknown Lopez, Unknown Lucas, Unknown Lundy, Unknown McCandless, Unknown McKinney, Michael Mesisca, Unknown Meyers, Thomas Minahan, Unknown Mitchell, Unknown Murphy, Unknown Nanez, Unknown Overton, Unknown Plceno, Unknown Prtyan, Crystal Rodriguez, Unknown Sediqi, Unknown Tanger, Robert Unknown, Sadie Unknown, Tracy Unknown, Unknown Uriarte, Unknown Vasquez, Unknown Wambaugh, Unknown Woody, Unknown Zeller pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge Otis D. Wright, II and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early., filed by plaintiff Scott Joseph Faulkner. (ghap)
Related: [-]