New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: J Brendan Day
Case #: 3:24-cv-01193
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Feb 29, 2024
Terminated:Aug 08, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 5:14 AM EDT
Defendant
HENRY J. AUSTIN HEALTH CENTER INC.
Represented By
CLAUDIA A. COSTA
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ELONA DEPREZ
Represented By
GRAHAM FAVILLE BAIRD
Law Offices Eric A. Shore, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, December 02, 2024
16 16 order Stipulation and Order Mon 12/02 3:23 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 12/2/2024. (mlh)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Mon 12/02 10:12 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by ELONA DEPREZ. (BAIRD, GRAHAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Thu 08/08 9:59 AM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 10/7/2024. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/8/2024. (jab)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
minutes Settlement Conference Tue 09/03 1:47 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day: Settlement Conference held on 8/7/2024. (cry)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 07/15 5:20 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by All Defendants.(COSTA, CLAUDIA)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
12 12 order 1 - Terminate Hearings Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 07/01 1:06 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Settlement Conference set for 7/31/2024 is rescheduled to 8/7/2024 at 10:00 a.m. in Trenton - Courtroom 7E. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 7/1/2024. (cry)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 06/24 1:38 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against HENRY J. AUSTIN HEALTH CENTER INC., filed by ELONA DEPREZ.(BAIRD, GRAHAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
10 10 order Scheduling Order Tue 06/11 10:51 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 7/31/2024 at 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day. Amended Pleadings due by 6/24/2024; Fact Discovery due by 12/13/2024; Dispositive Motions due by 5/23/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 6/11/2024. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
minutes Scheduling Conference Mon 06/10 12:28 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day: Scheduling Conference held on 6/10/2024. (cry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
9 9 misc Status Report Tue 06/04 2:03 PM
STATUS REPORT Report of R.26f Meeting by ELONA DEPREZ. (BAIRD, GRAHAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
8 8 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Mon 05/13 3:13 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/10/2024 at 12:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 5/13/2024. (jdg)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/10 5:07 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by HENRY J. AUSTIN HEALTH CENTER INC..(COSTA, CLAUDIA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
6 6 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Tue 04/16 11:03 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Henry J. Austin Health Center Inc... (COSTA, CLAUDIA)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Incorrect Event Selected Tue 04/16 10:53 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Application for Extension of Time5 filed by CLAUDIA COSTA on 4/15/24 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. The Clerk's Office has terminated the Motion. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE APPLICATION USING *APPLICATION FOR CLERK ORDER TO EXT ANSWER/PROPOSED ORDER*. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (amv)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 04/16 3:38 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The6 Application for a Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer submitted by HENRY J. AUSTIN HEALTH CENTER INC. on 4/16/2024 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/6/2024. (kht)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 04/15 11:44 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by HENRY J. AUSTIN HEALTH CENTER INC.. (COSTA, CLAUDIA)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/15 11:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by CLAUDIA A. COSTA on behalf of HENRY J. AUSTIN HEALTH CENTER INC. (COSTA, CLAUDIA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/03 5:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ELONA DEPREZ. HENRY J. AUSTIN HEALTH CENTER INC. served on 4/1/2024, answer due 4/22/2024. (BAIRD, GRAHAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 02/29 2:26 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to HENRY J. AUSTIN HEALTH CENTER INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kht)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/29 10:06 AM
COMPLAINT against HENRY J. AUSTIN HEALTH CENTER INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15130331) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ELONA DEPREZ.(BAIRD, GRAHAM)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 02/29 2:24 PM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day added. (kht)
Related: [-]