New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Ann M Donnelly
Referred: Sanket J Bulsara
Case #: 1:24-cv-01527
Nature of Suit870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Case Filed:Feb 29, 2024
Terminated:Aug 27, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 4:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Shawn Angela Byles
Represented By
Elizabeth Mara Aboulafia
Cullen And Dykman LLP
contact info
Bonnie Pollack
Cullen And Dykman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Daniel M. Caves
Doj-Tax
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment Tue 08/27 4:57 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT. The United States' claims for a personal-liability judgment for unpaid tax liabilities for tax years 2012 and 2014 are dismissed with prejudice (but without prejudice to its claims against property of the defendant's bankruptcy estate). The United States shall have judgment that Shawn Angela Byles's federal income tax liabilities for tax years 2015, 2016, and 2017 are excepted from her bankruptcy discharge (except for any late payment penalties) and that she is indebted to the United States for said liabilities in the total amount of $255,236.37, plus interest accruing from and after August 1, 2024, pursuant to 26 U.S.C. §§ 6601, 6621, and 6622, and 28 U.S.C. § 1961(c). The CLERK shall enter judgment accordingly. (The collection of this judgment is subject to an installment agreement and may not be collected otherwise absent a default.) Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 8/27/2024. (DG)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
16 16 motion Approve Consent Judgment Mon 08/26 4:02 PM
Consent MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by United States of America. (Caves, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Judgment
Thursday, August 08, 2024
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Status Report Order Thu 08/08 5:16 PM
ORDER: The Motion to Adjourn Conference15 is granted. The telephonic-initial conference scheduled for 8/09/2024 is adjourned sine die. The parties are directed to file a consent judgment by 9/23/2024 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/8/2024. (EM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
15 15 motion Adjourn Conference Tue 08/06 3:01 PM
Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference by United States of America. (Caves, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
14 14 order Scheduling Order Thu 06/13 12:22 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic initial conference will be held at 11:00 A.M. on 8/09/2024 before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. The parties are to join the conference by dialing 1-646-828-7666 , Meeting ID: 161-2168-2308 , and Passcode: 542698 . The parties shall dial in five (5) minutes before the conference. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Rule 26(f) Report and electronically file same with the Court no later than 8/05/2024 . Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the Rule 26(f) Report, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other of the date and time of this telephonic initial conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 6/13/2024. (EM)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 06/07 3:31 PM
ORDER: The Motion to Stay12 is granted. The case is hereby stayed until 7/8/2024 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 6/7/2024. (AL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
12 12 motion Stay Thu 06/06 4:24 PM
Consent MOTION to Stay Case Deadlines During Settlement Discussions by United States of America. (Caves, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
11 11 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 06/04 1:25 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Caves, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/29 1:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Mara Aboulafia on behalf of Shawn Angela Byles (aty to be noticed) (Aboulafia, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
9 9 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Discovery Wed 05/22 12:10 PM
ORDER: The motion for discovery8 is granted and the proposed stipulation is so-ordered. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 5/22/2024. (AL)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
8 8 motion Discovery Mon 05/20 3:13 PM
Letter MOTION for Discovery by United States of America. (Caves, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order with Stipulations
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/20 2:24 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Shawn Angela Byles. (Pollack, Bonnie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
order Order to Answer Wed 05/01 12:59 PM
ORDER: In light of the parties' stipulation6 , Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 5/31/2024 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 5/1/2024. (AL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
6 6 misc Stipulation Tue 04/30 7:09 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time to Answer and Notice of Withdrawal of Jury Demand by United States of America (Caves, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/10 3:24 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Shawn Angela Byles served on 4/10/2024, answer due 5/1/2024. (Caves, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 02/29 2:55 PM
Summons Issued as to Shawn Angela Byles. (CV)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Thu 02/29 2:55 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CV)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Thu 02/29 2:54 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (CV)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/29 2:02 PM
COMPLAINT against Shawn Angela Byles Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by United States of America. (Caves, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet