Texas Southern District Court
Judge:Kenneth M Hoyt
Case #: 4:24-cv-00739
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 29, 2024
Case in other court:Texas Western, 7:24-cv-00043
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 3:57 AM CDT
Defendant
Margaret "Meg" Poissant
Defendant
Cornelia A. Hartman
Defendant
Mark Heidaker
Defendant
Richard F Hightower
Defendant
Houston Police Department
Defendant
Judge Tonya DeShea Jones
Defendant
Sean Patrick Kennedy
Defendant
Jennifer Layne Lawrence
Defendant
Ana Maria Martinez
Defendant
Sgt. Jailer M Meyer
Defendant
ADA Garrett Gill Moore
Defendant
Veronica Nelson
Defendant
North Fort Bend Water Authority
Defendant
Kim Ogg
Defendant
AT&T Services Inc
Defendant
Property Acquisition Services, Inc.
Defendant
Property Acquisition Services, LLC
Defendant
Officer M A. Reyes
Defendant
Randall Earl Roll
Defendant
Deputy Chad Schoenvogel
Harris County Costable Precinct 5 1723 Katy Freeway
Houston, TX 77094
Defendant
Barbara J. Stalder
Defendant
Officer J.D. Tallant
Defendant
ADA Edekel Tecle
Defendant
Officer J. Teran
Houston Police Department 1200 Travis St.
Houston, TX 77002
Defendant
Jarrod T. Walker
Defendant
Officer Z. Wang
Houston Police Department 7277 Regency Square
Houston, TX 77036
Defendant
Hannah Olivia Yarbrough-Smith
Defendant
Harris County
Defendant
AT&T Corporation
Defendant
Damiola Akinfolarin
Defendant
Michael Andrews
Defendant
Deputy Carmelo Aponte
Defendant
Judge Damiane Dianne Curvey Banieh
Defendant
Officer J.J. Barbar
Defendant
Elizabeth D. Barron
Defendant
Officer FNU Blenton
Defendant
Steve Bonjonia
Defendant
CWS Galleria, 5250 L.P.
Defendant
CenterPoint Energy Houston Electric LLC
Defendant
CenterPoint Houston Electric, LLC
Defendant
Centerpoint Energy Inc
Defendant
City Of Houston
Defendant
Comcast Corporation
Defendant
Comcast Holdings Corporation
Defendant
Comcast of Houston LLC
Defendant
Judge Natalia "Nata" Cornelio
Defendant
Julie Countiss
Defendant
Officer D.R. Daniel, III
Defendant
John Patrick Denholmn II
Defendant
Patrick Drake
#632226 Ellis Unit
Huntsville, TX 77343
Defendant
Eva G. Flores
Defendant
Harris County District Attorney's Office
Plaintiff
Mr. Ernest Adimora-Nweke
Adimora Law Firm 3050 Post Oak Boulevard Suite 510
Houston, TX 77056


Docket last updated: 02/29/2024 1:40 PM CST
Monday, February 05, 2024
Case assigned to Judge David Counts and Judge Ronald C. Griffin. Judge David Counts, Judge Ronald C. Griffin no longer assigned to the case. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE.. Referral Judge: Ronald C. Griffin. (kg)
Related: [-]
1 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ernest Adimora-Nweke.. Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (kg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 9 pgs Complaint,
Att: 2 Parties - Complaint Supplement,
Att: 3 Jurisdiction and Venue - Complaint Supplement,
Att: 4 28:1651 Writ - Complaint Attachment
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
2 2 Case Opening Letter by Ernest Adimora-Nweke. (kg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
3 3 MOTION FOR SERVICE OF ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Ernest Adimora-Nweke. (jb3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
4 4 Exhibit List by Ernest Adimora-Nweke.. (jb3) Exhibit 1 - NOT AVAILABLE ELECTRONICALLY. KEPT IN CLERK'S EXHIBIT ROOM #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 3 cont.) (jb3). (jb3). (jb3).
Related: [-]
Att: 4 (2/15/2024) Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 (2/15/2024) Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 (2/15/2024) Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 (2/15/2024) Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 (2/15/2024) Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 (2/15/2024) Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 (2/15/2024) Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 (2/15/2024) Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 (2/15/2024) Exhibit 12
Att: 13 (2/15/2024) Exhibit 11,
Att: 14 (2/15/2024) Exhibit 13,
Att: 15 (2/15/2024) Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 (2/15/2024) Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 (2/15/2024) Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 (2/15/2024) Exhibit 18,
Att: 19 (2/15/2024) Exhibit 19,
Att: 20 (2/15/2024) Exhibit 20,
Att: 21 (2/15/2024) Exhibit 21,
Att: 22 (2/15/2024) Exhibit 22,
Att: 23 (2/15/2024) Exhibit 23,
Att: 24 (2/15/2024) Exhibit 24,
Att: 25 (2/15/2024) Exhibit 25,
Att: 26 (2/15/2024) Exhibit 26,
Att: 27 (2/15/2024) Exhibit 27,
Att: 28 (2/15/2024) Exhibit 28,
Att: 29 (2/15/2024) Exhibit 29,
Att: 30 (2/15/2024) Exhibit 30,
Att: 31 (2/15/2024) Exhibit 31
Monday, February 26, 2024
6 6 ORDER SUA SPONTE TRANSFERRING CAUSE TO TXSD - HOUSTON. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (slt) Modified to add receiving division on 2/27/2024 (slt).
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
7 7 Case transferred in from Texas Western. Case Number 7:24-cv-00043; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
Related: [-]