West Virginia Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas S Kleeh
Referred: Michael John Aloi
Case #: 1:24-cv-00025
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 29, 2024
Terminated:Apr 23, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 4:56 AM EDT
Defendant
Alight State College
348 Blue Course Drive
State College, PA 16803
Defendant
Mount Nittany Medical Center
1800 East Park Ave.
State College, PA 16803
Plaintiff
Nicholas Bigley
327 Willey St. APT 101
Morgantown, WV 26505

GPO Apr 23 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OF TRANSFER as to Nicholas Bigley. Accordingly, Plaintiffs motions to transfer this case [ECF Nos. 34, 35] are hereby GRANTED and thus hereby ORDERED that proper venue for the instant matter is the Middle District of Pennsylvania and that the matter shall be transferred to that District. Furthermore, Plaintiffs motions [ECF Nos. 13, 16] are hereby DENIED as moot. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to TRANSFER this matter, pursuant to 28 U.S.C.§ 1406(a), to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 4/23/2024. (copy to pro se plaintiff CM RRR) (hrc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2024: # (1) Certified Mail Return Receipt) (hrc).


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.