California Southern District Court
Judge:Todd W Robinson
Referred: Jill L Burkhardt
Case #: 3:24-cv-00398
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 29, 2024
Terminated:Feb 06, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 1:23 AM PDT
Defendant
Dr. John Shustitsky
Defendant
Dr. Adrienne Sullivan
Defendant
The Chicago School of Professional Psychology
Plaintiff
Al Asali
11232 Vista Sorrento Parkway Apt. M 103
San Diego, CA 92130

GPO Apr 02 2024
ORDER (1) denying without prejudice Plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel, and (2) Granting Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to respond to Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 4/2/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, February 06, 2025
21 21 order Judgment - Clerk Thu 02/06 1:32 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Court grants Moving Defendant The Chicago School of Professional Psychologys unopposed Motion and dismisses without prejudice Plaintiffs Complaint in its entirety under Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(5) and dismisses with prejudice Plaintiffs sole cause of action under Title IV of the HEA against Defendants TCSPP, Dr. Shustitzky, and Dr. Sullivan.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt)
Related: [-]
20 20 8 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 02/06 1:27 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 2/6/2025. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
19 19 order Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies Wed 10/16 10:39 AM
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt Rejecting re18 MOTION to Produce, from Plaintiff Al Asali. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d)(1): A party may not seek discovery from any sources before the parties have conferred as required by Rule 26(f).. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 10/15/2024.(sjt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Rejected Document
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
18 18 motion Produce Tue 10/08 1:46 PM
MOTION to Produce Documents and Tangible Things by Al Asali. (sjt)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/07 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth L. Nguyen on behalf of The Chicago School of Professional Psychology (Nguyen, Elizabeth)Attorney Elizabeth L. Nguyen added to party The Chicago School of Professional Psychology(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 10/02 1:00 PM
ORDER granting nunc pro tunc15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [12 MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 10/17/2024 Replies due by 11/7/2024. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 10/2/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 09/26 4:45 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by Al Asali. (sjt)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
14 14 service Certificate of Service Fri 08/30 2:40 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Chicago School of Professional Psychology Proof of service (Lynch, Alison)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
13 13 order Order Setting Briefing Schedule Thu 08/29 4:43 PM
MINUTE ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. Presently before the Court is Defendant The Chicago School of Professional Psychology's12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 12 , which is noticed for a hearing on November 7, 2024, at 1:30 p.m. Plaintiff Al Asali SHALL FILE his opposition to Defendant's Motion on or before September 26, 2024, and Defendant MAY FILE its optional reply, if any, on or before October 17, 2024. Upon the closing of the briefing, the Court will take Defendant's Motion under submission on the papers without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). As noted in Section III.A.2 of Judge Robinson's Standing Order for Civil Cases, "[a]n opposing party's failure timely to file an opposition to any motion may be construed as consent to the granting of the motion pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(f)(3)(c)." (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (no document attached) (sxd)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Dismiss Thu 08/29 3:50 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 12; Memorandum of Points and Authorities by The Chicago School of Professional Psychology.(Lynch, Alison)Attorney Alison L. Lynch added to party The Chicago School of Professional Psychology(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Amy Tomlinson ISO Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 2 Declaration of Alison L. Lynch ISO Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A-Declaration of Alison L. Lynch,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit B-Declaration of Alison L. Lynch
Thursday, August 08, 2024
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 08/09 11:16 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Al Asali. The Chicago School of Professional Psychology served. (sjt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order Wed 07/10 12:49 PM
ORDER Granting Plaintiff a Thirty-Day Extension of Time Within Which to Effect Service of Process on Defendants. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 7/10/2025.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
9 9 respm Response - Other Tue 07/02 2:49 PM
RESPONSE re8 Order to Show Cause filed by Al Asali.(sjt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Supplement
Friday, June 14, 2024
8 8 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 06/14 4:48 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should not be Dismissed for Failure to Timely Effect Service of Process. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 6/14/2024.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
7 7 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Tue 04/23 12:29 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Al Asali re3 Order to Show Cause. (dim)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
6 6 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/02 10:25 AM
ORDER (1) denying without prejudice Plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel, and (2) Granting Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to respond to Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 4/2/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 03/22 4:16 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to3 Order to Show Cause by Al Asali. (sjt)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Appoint Counsel Fri 03/22 4:14 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Al Asali. (sjt)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
3 3 4 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 03/04 3:16 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why action should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 3/4/2024.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 02/29 1:20 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (rxc) (jmo)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 02/29 1:17 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Shustitsky, Adrienne Sullivan, The Chicago School of Professional Psychology ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 151722.), filed by Al Asali. The new case number is 3:24-cv-398-TWR-JLB. Judge Todd W. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Al Asali)(rxc) (jmo). (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/29/2024) (rxc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Receipt