The Humboldt Company
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Theodor Albert |
Case #: | 8:24-bk-10520 |
Case Filed: | Feb 29, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
The Humboldt Company
1 League # 60620
Irvine, CA 92602-7027 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701 |
Docket last updated: 60 minutes ago |
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Wed 04/03 9:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 04/03/2024. (Admin.) |
|
27 | 27
court
Hearing Held (Other)
Wed 04/03 12:24 PM
Hearing Held Re:1 Order Show Cause Why Case Should Not Be Dismissed Because Debtor Is An Entity That Must Be Represented By Counsel Re: Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual - Off Calendar (GD) |
|
26 | 26
court
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Wed 04/03 12:22 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued Status Conference Status hearing to be held on 5/1/2024 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - Continued to May 1, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. (GD) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Notice to creditors (BNC-PDF)
Mon 04/01 2:37 PM
Notice to creditors Re: Notice of Motion And Motion By United States Trustee To Dismiss Or Convert Case Pursuant To 11 USC § 1112(b); Memorandum of Points And Authorities; Declaration Of Marilyn Sorensen In Support Thereof (BNC-PDF) (GD) |
|
24 | 24
court
Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Mon 04/01 2:30 PM
Hearing Set The Hearing date is set for 5/1/2024 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (GD) |
|
23 | 23
motion
U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert (motion)
Mon 04/01 1:45 PM
U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert Case Pursuant To 11 U.S.C.§ 1112(b); Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declaration Of Marilyn Sorensen In Support Thereof Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA). (Misken, Kenneth) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Status Report for Chapter 11 Status Conference
Tue 03/26 11:59 PM
Status Report for Chapter 11 Status Conference Filed by Debtor The Humboldt Company. (Tran, Krystina) |
|
21 | 21
answer
Reply
Tue 03/26 11:56 PM
Reply to Filed by Debtor The Humboldt Company (Tran, Krystina) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Substitution of attorney
Tue 03/26 11:42 PM
Substitution of attorney with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor The Humboldt Company. (Tran, Krystina) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9: List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insi
Tue 03/26 2:46 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) , Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders (Form 104 or 204) , List of Equity Security Holders , Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1) , Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) , Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Schedule D Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D) , Schedule E/F Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F) , Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Schedule H Non-Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) , Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) , Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) , Statement of Corporate Ownership filed., Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions , Statement of Operations for Small Business Filed by Debtor The Humboldt Company . (Tran, Krystina) |
|
Saturday, March 16, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Sat 03/16 9:52 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/16/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
order
Extend Deadline to File Schedules and/or Plan (Case Opening Documents - All Chapters) (BNC-PDF)
Thu 03/14 11:00 AM
Order Granting Debtor's Motion To Extend Time To File Case Opening Documents (with supporting declaration) [FRCP 1007(c), LBR 1007-1(b)] (BNC-PDF) IT IS ORDERED as follows: 1. The deadline for Debtor to file case opening documents is March 28, 2024. Signed on 3/14/2024. (GD) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Notice of Lodgment
Wed 03/13 10:44 PM
Notice of lodgment of Proposed Order with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor The Humboldt Company . (Tran, Krystina) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Motion For Order Without a Hearing (LBR 9013-1(p) or (q))
Wed 03/13 10:42 PM
Notice of Motion For Order Without a Hearing (LBR 9013-1(p) or (q)) with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor The Humboldt Company . (Tran, Krystina) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Extend Deadline to File Schedules and/or Plan (Case Opening Documents - All Chapters) (motion)
Wed 03/13 9:51 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information, and/or Plan (Case Opening Documents) with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor The Humboldt Company (Tran, Krystina) |
|
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Wed 03/13 9:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/13/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
court
Hearing Set (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Mon 03/11 1:41 PM
Hearing Set Order To Show Cause Why Case Should Not Be Dismissed Because Debtor Is An Entity That Must Be Represented By Counsel Show Cause hearing to be held on 4/3/2024 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (GD) |
|
11 | 11
order
OSC to appear and show cause (BNC-PDF)
Mon 03/11 1:37 PM
Order To Show Cause Why Case Should Not Be Dismissed Because Debtor Is An Entity That Must Be Represented By Counsel - Hearing Set April 3, 2024 at 10:00 a.m., Rm 5B Via Zoom/Gov (BNC-PDF) - Signed on 3/11/2024 (GD) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Wed 03/06 9:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/06/2024. (Admin.) |
|
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Wed 03/06 9:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/06/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1)
Mon 03/04 2:06 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/9/2024 at 02:30 PM at UST-SA2, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-919-3126, PARTICIPANT CODE:3803126. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 6/10/2024. (TL) |
|
7 | 7
court
Hearing Set (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Mon 03/04 1:13 PM
Hearing Set Status Conference Status hearing to be held on 4/3/2024 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (GD) |
|
6 | 6
order
X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF)
Mon 03/04 1:12 PM
Order Setting Scheduling And Case Management Conference - Hearing Scheduled For April 03, 2024 at 10:00 A.M., Rm 5B Via Zoom/Gov (BNC-PDF) Signed on 3/4/2024 (GD) |
|
Saturday, March 02, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Sat 03/02 9:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/02/2024. (Admin.) |
|
4 | 4
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Sat 03/02 9:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/02/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, February 29, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
court
X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired)
Thu 02/29 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1,738.00 by TS. Receipt Number 81000304. (admin) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 02/29 2:57 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by The Humboldt Company List of Equity Security Holders due 3/14/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 3/14/2024. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 3/14/2024. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 3/14/2024. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 3/14/2024. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 3/14/2024. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 3/14/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 3/14/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 3/14/2024. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 3/14/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 3/14/2024. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 3/14/2024. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 3/14/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 3/14/2024. (TS) |
|
Att: 1 Representative of Debtor - ID |