Texas Western District Court
Judge:Ronald C Griffin
Referred: Ronald C Griffin
Case #: 7:24-cv-00061
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 29, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 4:55 AM CDT
Defendant
David Laborde
Represented By
Aaron Dorfner
Cotton Bledsoe Tighe & Dawson PC
contact info
Defendant
MD Joyce Alase
Plaintiff
Michelle A Pelkey
Represented By
Leigh McMillan Williams
Leigh M. Williams Law Office, PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Unknown Sheriff Deputy #1
Terminated: 06/20/2024
Defendant
Unknown Sheriff Deputy #2
Terminated: 06/20/2024
Defendant
City of Midland
Terminated: 06/20/2024
a Municipal Corporation City Manager 300 N. Loraine
Midland, TX 79701
Represented By
Aaron Dorfner
Cotton Bledsoe Tighe & Dawson PC
contact info
Defendant
Midland County
Terminated: 06/20/2024
a Municipal Corporation Commissioners Court 500 N. Lorraine St. Suite 1100
Midland, TX 79701
Represented By
Richard Layne Rouse
Shafer, Davis, O'Leary & Stoker
contact info

GPO Feb 24 2025
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 36 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Joyce Alase. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (jb3)
GPO Mar 25 2025
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 39 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge David Counts. (jb3)

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
48 48 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Discovery Tue 04/22 1:48 PM
ORDER GRANTING47 Motion for Discovery. Parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within 30 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (jb3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
47 47 motion Discovery Thu 04/17 12:02 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Discovery for Order Limiting Discovery and Notice of Assertion of Qualified Immunity by David Laborde. (Dorfner, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
notice Deficiency Notice Thu 04/03 11:14 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 41 Second MOTION for Discovery Order Limiting Discovery and Notice of Assertion of QI Certificate of Conference required. Please correct and re-file. This motion will not be forwarded to the assigned judge for consideration and will be terminated. (jb3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
46 46 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 03/26 3:56 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ronald C. Griffin for all proceedings. Judge David Counts no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Counts. (jb3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
45 45 2 pgs order Order Adopting/Rejecting Report and Recommendations Tue 03/25 3:51 PM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for39 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge David Counts. (jb3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
44 44 notice Notice Tue 03/18 11:07 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of DIN 42 Objection MJ Report & Recommendation by Michelle A Pelkey re39 Report and Recommendations (Williams, Leigh)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
43 43 misc Response Fri 03/14 10:20 PM
RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Objections to the Report and Recommendation of Judge to42 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Joyce Alase. (Rigler, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 08, 2025
42 42 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Sat 03/08 6:46 PM
OBJECTION to39 Report and Recommendations Requesting Leave to Amend attaching Proposed Amended Complaint by Michelle A Pelkey..(Williams, Leigh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
41 41 motion Discovery Tue 03/04 5:04 PM
Second MOTION for Discovery Order Limiting Discovery and Notice of Assertion of QI by David Laborde.. Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Dorfner, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
40 40 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 03/04 4:42 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron Dorfner on behalf of David Laborde (Dorfner, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
39 39 misc Report and Recommendations Mon 02/24 4:34 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re36 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Joyce Alase. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (jb3)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
38 38 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 10/04 2:21 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Joyce Alase, re36 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Joyce Alase (Rigler, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
37 37 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 09/30 4:52 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Michelle A Pelkey, re36 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Joyce Alase (Williams, Leigh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
36 36 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 09/11 2:40 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Joyce Alase.(Rigler, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
35 35 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/03 11:02 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle A Pelkey. Joyce Alase served on 8/21/2024, answer due 9/11/2024.(Williams, Leigh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons
Thursday, June 27, 2024
34 34 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 06/27 2:56 PM
ANSWER to33 Amended Complaint With Affirmative and Other Defenses by David Laborde.(Dorfner, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
33 33 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 06/20 3:50 PM
THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Michelle A Pelkey.(jb3)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Amend Complaint Thu 06/20 11:29 AM
Text Order GRANTING32 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to file Third Amended Complaint. It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to File Third Amended Complaint is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to docket the Third Amended Complaint attached to the instant motion. In light of the filing of the Third Amended Complaint, the Clerk is directed to terminate Defendants Unknown Sheriff's Deputy 1, Unknown Sheriff's Deputy 2, City of Midland, and Midland County. The Clerk is also directed to amend Defendant David Laborde so show Defendant Laborde being sued in his personal capacity only. Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 06/20 11:30 AM
Text Order MOOTING30 Motion to Dismiss. A Third Amended Complaint was filed rendering the instant motion, MOOT. Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2024
32 32 motion Amend Complaint Wed 06/19 11:42 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend Complaint by Michelle A Pelkey.. Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Williams, Leigh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Third Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 06, 2024
31 31 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 06/06 9:51 AM
Original ANSWER to27 Amended Complaint With Affirmative and Other Defenses by David Laborde.(Dorfner, Aaron)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 06/06 9:15 AM
Text Order MOOTING24 Motion to Dismiss. The instant Motion is rendered MOOT by the filing of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. It is so ORDERED. Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (af3)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 06/06 9:16 AM
Text Order MOOTING16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The instant Motion is rendered MOOT by the filing of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. It is so ORDERED. Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (af3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
30 30 motion Dismiss Wed 06/05 12:00 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Midland County. (Rouse, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
29 29 service Summons Issued Wed 05/29 4:36 PM
Summons Issued as to Joyce Alase. (jb3)
Related: [-]
28 28 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 05/29 3:20 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Michelle A Pelkey. JOYCE ALASE, M.D. (Williams, Leigh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
27 27 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 05/22 11:22 AM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Michelle A Pelkey.(slt)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Amend Complaint Wed 05/22 9:11 AM
Text Order GRANTING26 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to docket Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint attached to the instant motion. It is so ORDERED. Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
26 26 motion Amend Complaint Tue 05/21 12:33 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend Complaint by Michelle A Pelkey.. Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Williams, Leigh)
Related: [-]
notice Deficiency Notice Tue 05/21 10:03 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 25 Amended Complaint. Order granting Leave by the Court is required. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15 only allows for a party to amend its pleading once as of course, otherwisea party may amend its pleading only with the opposing party's written consent or the court's leave. Please file a Motion for Leave to file an amended complaint. Please attach the proposed order to the motion. (jb3)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
25 25 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 05/20 11:07 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT , Second, against Joyce Alase amending, filed by Michelle A Pelkey.(Williams, Leigh)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
24 24 motion Dismiss Fri 05/17 4:08 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Midland County. (Rouse, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 05/14 5:31 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Layne Rouse on behalf of Midland County. Attorney Richard Layne Rouse added to party Midland County(pty:dft) (Rouse, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
22 22 misc Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Fri 05/03 10:12 AM
CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Michelle A Pelkey. (Williams, Leigh)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 05/03 9:07 AM
Text Order GRANTING21 Defendant Midland County's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. It is ORDERED Midland County shall have up to, and including, May 17, 2024, to file its response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. It is so ORDERED. Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Fri 05/03 10:39 AM
RESET Deadlines: Midland County answer due 5/17/2024 . (jb3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
21 21 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 05/02 6:32 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Midland County.. Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Rouse, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
20 20 misc Advisory to the Court Thu 05/02 1:23 PM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by City of Midland, David Laborde Consent . (Dorfner, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order Wed 05/01 4:36 PM
ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by Judge David Counts. (jb3)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
18 18 notice Notice Mon 04/29 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Assertion of Qualified Immunity and Motion for Order Limiting Discovery by David Laborde (Dorfner, Aaron)
Related: [-]
17 17 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 04/29 1:46 PM
Defendant Officer David Laborde's ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint With Affirmative and Other Defenses by David Laborde.(Dorfner, Aaron)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 04/29 1:43 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by City of Midland, David Laborde. (Dorfner, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
15 15 service Summons Issued Tue 04/02 1:32 PM
Summons Issued as to Midland County. (jb3)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Issued Tue 04/02 1:30 PM
Summons Issued as to City of Midland. (jb3)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/02 12:10 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Michelle A Pelkey. County of Midland (Williams, Leigh)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/02 12:09 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Michelle A Pelkey. City of Midland (Williams, Leigh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 03/27 5:53 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Michelle A Pelkey.(Williams, Leigh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
10 10 service Summons Issued Thu 03/14 4:31 PM
Summons Issued as to Unknown Sheriff Deputy #2. (slt)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued Thu 03/14 4:25 PM
Summons Issued as to Unknown Sheriff Deputy #1. (slt)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Thu 03/14 4:20 PM
Summons Issued as to David Laborde. (slt)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 03/14 3:51 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Michelle A Pelkey. Sherriff's Detention Ctr. Emp. #2 (Williams, Leigh) (Main Document 7 replaced with flattened pdf on 3/14/2024) (slt)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
6 6 misc Attachment Mon 03/04 1:54 PM
ATTACHMENT Corrected Complaint to1 Complaint by Michelle A Pelkey. (Williams, Leigh)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Attachment Mon 03/04 1:10 PM
ATTACHMENT Corrected Complaint to1 Complaint by Michelle A Pelkey. (Williams, Leigh)
Related: [-]
notice Deficiency Notice Mon 03/04 1:18 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 5 Attachment Incorrect header. Please include Midland/Odessa Division . Please do not refile the entire document as it will create a duplicate charge. Please file ONLY the document. Use the ATTACHMENT event from the menu and attach the proposed document as the Main Document LINK the proposed document to the original. In the docket text, type Corrected Complaint. (slt)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 03/01 1:59 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Michelle A Pelkey. Unknown Midland County Sheriff's Central Detention Center Employee (Williams, Leigh) (Main Document 4 replaced with flattened pdf on 3/1/2024) (slt)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 03/01 1:57 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Michelle A Pelkey. for David Laborde (Williams, Leigh) (Main Document 3 replaced with flattened pdf on 3/1/2024) (slt)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Attachment Fri 03/01 1:07 PM
ATTACHMENT Civil Cover Sheet to1 Complaint by Michelle A Pelkey. (Williams, Leigh) (Main Document 2 replaced with flattened pdf on 3/1/2024) (slt)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 03/01 9:42 AM
Case assigned to Judge David Counts and Judge Ronald C. Griffin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (slt)
Related: [-]
notice Deficiency Notice Fri 03/01 9:44 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 1 Complaint. Incorrect header. Please include Midland/Odessa Division. Please do not refile the entire document as it will create a duplicate charge. Please file ONLY the document. Use the ATTACHMENT event from the menu and attach the proposed document as the Main Document LINK the proposed document to the original. In the docket text, type Corrected Complaint. Local Rule CV-3(a) requires a Civil Cover Sheet. DO NOT RE-FILE the entire document. Please file ONLY the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the ATTACHMENT event from the menu and attach the Civil Cover Sheet as the Main Document. LINK the Civil Cover Sheet to the original Complaint. In the docket text, type Civil Cover Sheet. (slt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/29 4:28 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18478429), filed by Michelle A Pelkey.(Williams, Leigh)
Related: [-]