California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Barry Russell
Case #: 2:24-bk-11569
Case Filed:Feb 29, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Mar 21, 2025

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Metropolitan Theatres Corporation
8727 W 3rd St
Los Angeles, CA 90048-3843
Represented By
Lance N Jurich
Loeb & Loeb LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 22 minutes ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
427 427 court Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Fri 05/02 9:06 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 6/3/2025 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1668, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Barry Russell (SF)
Related: [-] 418 Application for Compensation filed by Financial Advisor GlassRatner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC
426 426 court Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Fri 05/02 9:05 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 6/3/2025 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1668, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Barry Russell (SF)
Related: [-] 417 Application for Compensation filed by Consultant A&G Realty Partners
425 425 court Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Fri 05/02 9:04 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 6/3/2025 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1668, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Barry Russell (SF)
Related: [-] 416 Application for Compensation filed by Other Professional Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP
424 424 court Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Fri 05/02 9:04 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 6/3/2025 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1668, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Barry Russell (SF)
Related: [-] 415 Application for Compensation filed by Special Counsel Reicker peau
423 423 court Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Fri 05/02 9:02 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 6/3/2025 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1668, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Barry Russell (SF)
Related: [-] 414 Application for Compensation filed by Accountant Rose Snyder & Jacobs
422 422 court Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Fri 05/02 9:01 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 6/3/2025 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1668, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Barry Russell (SF)
Related: [-] 413 Application for Compensation filed by Attorney Loeb & Loeb
421 421 court Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Fri 05/02 9:00 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 6/3/2025 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1668, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Barry Russell (SF)
Related: [-] 412 Application for Compensation filed by Trustee Moriah Douglas Flahaut (TR)
Thursday, May 01, 2025
420 420 misc Declaration Thu 05/01 7:48 PM
Declaration re: David Corwin in Support of Filed by Debtor Metropolitan Theatres Corporation Related [+]. (Jurich, Lance)
Related: [-] 413 Application for Compensation Second Interim and Final for Loeb & Loeb, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 2/29/2024 to 3/31/2025, Fee: $958,029.50, Expenses: $2,710.57.,414 Application for Compensation Second Interim and Final for Rose Snyder & Jacobs, Accountant, Period: 2/29/2024 to 3/31/2025, Fee: $33,950.00, Expenses: $218.40.,415 Application for Compensation Second Interim and Final for Reicker peau, Special Counsel, Period: 2/29/2024 to 3/31/2025, Fee: $5,117.67, Expenses: $912.24.,416 Application for Compensation First and Final for Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP, Other Professional, Period: 2/29/2024 to 3/31/2025, Fee: $13,192.79, Expenses: $379.04.,417 Application for Compensation First and Final for A&G Realty Partners, Consultant, Period: 2/29/2024 to 3/31/2025, Fee: $38,787.00, Expenses: $.,418 Application for Compensation Second Interim and Final for GlassRatner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC, Financial Advisor, Period: 2/29/2024 to 3/31/2025, Fee: $195,724.00, Expenses: $1,336.13.
419 419 notice Notice of Hearing (BK Case) Thu 05/01 7:46 PM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Debtor Metropolitan Theatres Corporation Related [+]. (Jurich, Lance)
Related: [-] 412 Application for Compensation for Moriah Douglas Flahaut (TR), Trustee, Period: 3/4/2024 to 3/31/2025, Fee: $39712, Expenses: $2. Filed by Attorney Moriah Douglas Flahaut (TR) (Flahaut (TR), Moriah),413 Application for Compensation Second Interim and Final for Loeb & Loeb, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 2/29/2024 to 3/31/2025, Fee: $958,029.50, Expenses: $2,710.57. Filed by Attorney Lance N Jurich (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lance N. Jurich),414 Application for Compensation Second Interim and Final for Rose Snyder & Jacobs, Accountant, Period: 2/29/2024 to 3/31/2025, Fee: $33,950.00, Expenses: $218.40. Filed by Accountant Rose Snyder & Jacobs (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tony Rose),415 Application for Compensation Second Interim and Final for Reicker peau, Special Counsel, Period: 2/29/2024 to 3/31/2025, Fee: $5,117.67, Expenses: $912.24. Filed by Special Counsel Reicker peau (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Nimmons),416 Application for Compensation First and Final for Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP, Other Professional, Period: 2/29/2024 to 3/31/2025, Fee: $13,192.79, Expenses: $379.04. Filed by Other Professional Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gregory Vallin),417 Application for Compensation First and Final for A&G Realty Partners, Consultant, Period: 2/29/2024 to 3/31/2025, Fee: $38,787.00, Expenses: $. Filed by Consultant A&G Realty Partners (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Emillio Amendola),418 Application for Compensation Second Interim and Final for GlassRatner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC, Financial Advisor, Period: 2/29/2024 to 3/31/2025, Fee: $195,724.00, Expenses: $1,336.13. Filed by Financial Advisor GlassRatner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Seth Freeman)
418 418 motion Compensation (motion) Thu 05/01 7:44 PM
Application for Compensation Second Interim and Final for GlassRatner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC, Financial Advisor, Period: 2/29/2024 to 3/31/2025, Fee: $195,724.00, Expenses: $1,336.13. Filed by Financial Advisor GlassRatner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC (Jurich, Lance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Seth Freeman
417 417 motion Compensation (motion) Thu 05/01 7:26 PM
Application for Compensation First and Final for A&G Realty Partners, Consultant, Period: 2/29/2024 to 3/31/2025, Fee: $38,787.00, Expenses: $. Filed by Consultant A&G Realty Partners (Jurich, Lance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Emillio Amendola
416 416 motion Compensation (motion) Thu 05/01 7:22 PM
Application for Compensation First and Final for Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP, Other Professional, Period: 2/29/2024 to 3/31/2025, Fee: $13,192.79, Expenses: $379.04. Filed by Other Professional Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP (Jurich, Lance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Gregory Vallin
415 415 motion Compensation (motion) Thu 05/01 7:17 PM
Application for Compensation Second Interim and Final for Reicker peau, Special Counsel, Period: 2/29/2024 to 3/31/2025, Fee: $5,117.67, Expenses: $912.24. Filed by Special Counsel Reicker peau (Jurich, Lance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Kevin Nimmons
414 414 motion Compensation (motion) Thu 05/01 7:04 PM
Application for Compensation Second Interim and Final for Rose Snyder & Jacobs, Accountant, Period: 2/29/2024 to 3/31/2025, Fee: $33,950.00, Expenses: $218.40. Filed by Accountant Rose Snyder & Jacobs (Jurich, Lance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Tony Rose
413 413 motion Compensation (motion) Thu 05/01 6:53 PM
Application for Compensation Second Interim and Final for Loeb & Loeb, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 2/29/2024 to 3/31/2025, Fee: $958,029.50, Expenses: $2,710.57. Filed by Attorney Lance N Jurich (Jurich, Lance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Lance N. Jurich
Monday, April 28, 2025
412 412 motion Compensation (motion) Mon 04/28 5:52 PM
Application for Compensation for Moriah Douglas Flahaut (TR), Trustee, Period: 3/4/2024 to 3/31/2025, Fee: $39712, Expenses: $2. Filed by Attorney Moriah Douglas Flahaut (TR) (Flahaut (TR), Moriah)
Related: [-]