New York Northern District Court
Judge:Anthony J Brindisi
Referred: Miroslav Lovric
Case #: 3:24-cv-00291
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2024
Terminated:Feb 11, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant
Ben Bishop
Represented By
Jeffrey J. Calabrese
Harter, Secrest & Emery Llp - Rochester Office
contact info
Defendant
Frank Curci
Represented By
Jeffrey J. Calabrese
Harter, Secrest & Emery Llp - Rochester Office
contact info
Defendant
Justin Doolittle
Represented By
Jeffrey J. Calabrese
Harter, Secrest & Emery Llp - Rochester Office
contact info
Defendant
Nate Gabel
Represented By
Jeffrey J. Calabrese
Harter, Secrest & Emery Llp - Rochester Office
contact info
Defendant
Sue Lambert
Represented By
Jeffrey J. Calabrese
Harter, Secrest & Emery Llp - Rochester Office
contact info
Defendant
Mike Miller
Represented By
Jeffrey J. Calabrese
Harter, Secrest & Emery Llp - Rochester Office
contact info
Defendant
Judy Polonski
Represented By
Jeffrey J. Calabrese
Harter, Secrest & Emery Llp - Rochester Office
contact info
Defendant
Nancy Pook
Represented By
Jeffrey J. Calabrese
Harter, Secrest & Emery Llp - Rochester Office
contact info
Defendant
Lisa Price
Represented By
Jeffrey J. Calabrese
Harter, Secrest & Emery Llp - Rochester Office
contact info
Defendant
Price Chopper Corporation
Represented By
Jeffrey J. Calabrese
Harter, Secrest & Emery Llp - Rochester Office
contact info
Defendant
Tim Turner
Represented By
Jeffrey J. Calabrese
Harter, Secrest & Emery Llp - Rochester Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Abdulhaiy Muhammad
Represented By
John D. Cadore
Office Of John D. Cadore
contact info

GPO Feb 11 2025
ztc)DECISION and ORDER: It is ORDERED that 1. Defendants' motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 10) is GRANTED; and 2.Plaintiff's complaint (Dkt. No. 1) is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by U.S. District Judge Anthony J. Brindisi on 2/11/2025. (
GPO Feb 11 2025
JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that 1. Defendants' motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 10) is GRANTED; and 2. Plaintiff's complaint (Dkt. No. 1) is DISMISSED without prejudice. (ztc)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
16 16 order Judgment Tue 02/11 4:58 PM
JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that 1. Defendants' motion to dismiss (Dkt. No.10 ) is GRANTED; and 2. Plaintiff's complaint (Dkt. No.1 ) is DISMISSED without prejudice. (ztc)
Related: [-]
15 15 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 02/11 4:50 PM
DECISION and ORDER: It is ORDERED that 1. Defendants' motion to dismiss (Dkt. No.10 ) is GRANTED; and 2.Plaintiff's complaint (Dkt. No.1 ) is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by U.S. District Judge Anthony J. Brindisi on 2/11/2025. (ztc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
14 14 order Order Reassigning Case Fri 01/17 1:33 PM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge Anthony J. Brindisi for all further proceedings. U.S. District Judge Glenn T Suddaby no longer assigned to case. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 1/17/2025. (ztc)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
13 13 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 07/29 5:46 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re10 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Ben Bishop, Frank Curci, Justin Doolittle, Nate Gabel, Sue Lambert, Mike Miller, Judy Polonski, Nancy Pook, Lisa Price, Price Chopper Corporation, Tim Turner.(Calabrese, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law
Thursday, July 25, 2024
12 12 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 07/25 3:53 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re10 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Abdulhaiy Muhammad. (Cadore, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
11 11 order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 07/02 8:27 AM
TEXT ORDER: In light of the filing of Motion to Dismiss10 , the Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for 7/29/2024 before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric, and the filing of the Civil Case Management Plan and exchange of Mandatory Disclosures, are STAYED without date. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 7/2/2024. (jdc )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
10 10 motion Dismiss Mon 07/01 3:43 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ben Bishop, Frank Curci, Justin Doolittle, Nate Gabel, Sue Lambert, Mike Miller, Judy Polonski, Nancy Pook, Lisa Price, Price Chopper Corporation, Tim Turner. Motion returnable before Judge Hon. Glenn T. Suddaby Response to Motion due by 7/22/2024. Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/29/2024 (Calabrese, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Memorandum of Law
9 9 misc FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 07/01 3:27 PM
FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ben Bishop, Frank Curci, Justin Doolittle, Nate Gabel, Sue Lambert, Mike Miller, Judy Polonski, Nancy Pook, Lisa Price, Price Chopper Corporation, Tim Turner. (Calabrese, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/01 3:23 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey J. Calabrese on behalf of Ben Bishop, Frank Curci, Justin Doolittle, Nate Gabel, Sue Lambert, Mike Miller, Judy Polonski, Nancy Pook, Lisa Price, Price Chopper Corporation, Tim Turner (Calabrese, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
7 7 order Order on Letter Request Tue 04/30 9:25 AM
TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion6 is GRANTED insofar as and to the extent that the Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for 5/28/2024 is RE-SCHEDULED for 7/29/2024 at 12:00 p.m., via Teams teleconference, before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/22/2024. Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 4/30/2024. (amt)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
6 6 motion Letter Request/Motion Mon 04/29 12:56 PM
3:24-CV-291 Letter Motion from John D. Cadore, Esq. for Abdulhaiy Muhammad requesting AJOURNMENT OF INITIAL APPEARANCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY 28, 2024 AT 1:00 PMCourt Date submitted to Judge MAGISTRATE MIROSLLAV LOVRIC . (Cadore, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 03/01 3:19 PM
Summons Issued as to Nancy Pook. (ztc)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons(es) Fri 03/01 2:42 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Abdulhaiy Muhammad is requesting summons(es) be issued as to Abdulhaiy Muhammad (Cadore, John)
Related: [-]
notice Notice - Other Fri 03/01 9:31 AM
TEXT NOTICE: The Initial Conference set for 5/28/2024 at 1:00PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric, will be held via Microsoft Teams Teleconferencing. The Courtroom Deputy will send a teams link to the parties to participate. (jdc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
3 3 misc G.O. 25 Filing Order Thu 02/29 3:38 PM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 5/28/2024 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/21/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (ztc)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 02/29 3:36 PM
Summons Issued as to Defendants Ben Bishop, Frank Curci, Justin Doolittle, Nate Gabel, Sue Lambert, Mike Miller, Judy Polonski, Lisa Price, Price Chopper Corporation, Tim Turner. (ztc)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Thu 02/29 3:41 PM
Clerk redacted the home address listed for Plaintiff on the Complaint pursuant to Local Rule 5.2. The unredacted version of the Complaint filed by Counsel is attached to the entry and is restricted to case participants and public terminals. (ztc)
Related: [-]
misc Text Notice of Filing Deficiency Thu 02/29 3:43 PM
TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY as to Abdulhaiy Muhammad NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Proposed Summons was not included with the Complaint for defendant Nancy Pook. Counsel is directed to file proposed summons on the docket using the REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) event within 3 days of this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 3/5/2024 (ztc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/29 3:35 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Ben Bishop, Frank Curci, Justin Doolittle, Nate Gabel, Sue Lambert, Mike Miller, Judy Polonski, Nancy Pook, Lisa Price, Price Chopper Corporation, and Tim Turner (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6636387) filed by Abdulhaiy Muhammad.(ztc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint-Unredacted,
Att: 2 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet