1
|
|
1
SEALED COMPLAINT as to George Kenneth Orton, Jr (1). (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until the defendant has been arrested/appeared.) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00100-BT]
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
MOTION for Detention and Continuance filed by USA as to George Kenneth Orton, Jr. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00100-BT]
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
ORDER OF TEMPORARY COMMITMENT as to George Kenneth Orton Jr. (1) Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 2/7/2024 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1620, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 2/2/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00100-BT]
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford: Initial Appearance as to George Kenneth Orton, Jr held on 2/2/2024. Date of Arrest: 1/31/2024. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Marissa Aulbaugh; Defense - Kara Carreras. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :04. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00100-BT]
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
(Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by George Kenneth Orton, Jr (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00100-BT]
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Kara Letisha Carreras for George Kenneth Orton, Jr appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 2/2/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00100-BT]
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
ELECTRONIC ORDER As to George Kenneth Orton, Jr: by this order -- issued to the prosecution and defense counsel -- the court confirms the disclosure obligation of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and the possible consequences of violating such order under applicable law.
This written order is entered pursuant to Rule 5(f)(1) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, and is in addition to the oral order entered by the court on the first scheduled court date when both the prosecutor and defense counsel were present. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 2/2/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00100-BT]
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Detention and Preliminary Hearings filed by George Kenneth Orton, Jr with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Carreras, Kara) [3:24-mj-00100-BT]
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Before the Court is Defendants9 Motion to Continue as to George Kenneth Orton Jr. (1). Finding good cause, the motion is GRANTED, The Detention and Preliminary Hearings are reset to 2/14/2024 01:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1620, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 2/6/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00100-BT]
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kara Letisha Carreras on behalf of Wm. Reagan Wynn appearing for George Kenneth Orton, Jr (If sealed documents that you are authorized to see were previously filed by U.S. Pretrial Services or U.S. Probation, you will require assistance to gain access to them and any related filings. Please call the clerk at 214.753.2240 during business hours to request access.) (Carreras, Kara) [3:24-mj-00100-BT]
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kara Letisha Carreras (Clerk to Set Designation as: Retained) appearing for George Kenneth Orton, Jr (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (If sealed documents that you are authorized to see were previously filed by U.S. Pretrial Services or U.S. Probation, you will require assistance to gain access to them and any related filings. Please call the clerk at 214.753.2240 during business hours to request access.) (Carreras, Kara) [3:24-mj-00100-BT]
Related: [-]
|
19
|
|
19
Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 2/2/2024 as to George Kenneth Orton, Jr. (mcrd)
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver: Detention Hearing as to George Kenneth Orton, Jr held on 2/14/2024. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Marissa Albaugh; Defense - Reagan Wynn/Kara Carreras. (Exhibits admitted - returned to party) Time in Court - 1:20. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Webb.) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00100-BT]
Related: [-]
|
16
|
|
16
INDICTMENT with Forfeiture Notice as to George Kenneth Orton, Jr (1) count(s) 1-2. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (kcr) Modified event text on 2/28/2024 (kcr).
Related: [-]
|