California Southern District Court
Judge:Cynthia Bashant
Referred: Jill L Burkhardt
Case #: 3:24-cv-00397
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331ss Fed. Question: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 1:24 AM PDT
Defendant
TheSy, LLC
Represented By
Dean Theodore Janis
Janis Law Group, Apc
contact info
Eric Heyer
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
James Christopher Fraser
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
Defendant
Aroma Avenue Vape Shop
Represented By
Scott E Schutzman
Law Offices Of Scott Schutzman
contact info
Defendant
Cigarettes N More
Represented By
Scott E Schutzman
Law Offices Of Scott Schutzman
contact info
Defendant
Cloudhaven Vapors, Inc.
Represented By
Scott E Schutzman
Law Offices Of Scott Schutzman
contact info
Defendant
Empire Imports LLC
Represented By
Eric Heyer
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
Arash V. Sadat
Mills Sadat Dowlat LLP
contact info
Defendant
Guangdong Qisitech Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Imiracle (HK) Limited
Defendant
SV3 LLC
Represented By
Dean Theodore Janis
Janis Law Group, Apc
contact info
Eric Heyer
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
James Christopher Fraser
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
Defendant
Shenzhen Han Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Shenzhen Weiboli Technology Co. Ltd.
Defendant
Shenzhen iMiracle Technology Co., Ltd.
Represented By
Dean Theodore Janis
Janis Law Group, Apc
contact info
Eric Heyer
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
Defendant
Vapeonly Technology Co. Ltd.
Defendant
Z Vapor Room
Represented By
Scott E Schutzman
Law Offices Of Scott Schutzman
contact info
Plaintiff
NJOY, LLC
Represented By
Lauren S. Wulfe
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
David Edward Kouba
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Kristina Iliopoulos
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
David J Noonan
Noonan Lance Boyer & Banach LLP
contact info
Paul W. Rodney
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer
contact info
John Massaro
Arnold & Porter
contact info

GPO Apr 09 2024
Order Denying Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for Leave to Serve Defendant Under Rule 4(F)(3) (ECF No. 24).Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 04/09/2024. (mjw)
GPO Jul 24 2024
ORDER Denying Ex Parte Motion to Stay Discovery Without Prejudice [ECF No. 64]. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 07/24/2024. (mjw)
GPO Nov 13 2024
ORDER: (1) Denying Plaintiffs Ex Parte Request to File Notice of Supplemental Authority (ECF No. 68); (2) Requiring Brick-and-mortar Defendants Reply to Plaintiffs Motion to Seal (ECF No. 102); and (3) Granting Plaintiffs Application for Leave to File Surreply (ECF No. 104). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 11/13/2024. (mjw)
GPO May 02 2025
ORDER (1) Terminating As Moot Motion to Dismiss by Guangdong Qisitech Co., Ltd. (ECF No. 143); and (2) Granting Motion to Serve Defendant Shenzhen Han Technology Co., Ltd. by Email (ECF No. 179). Signed by Chief District Judge Cynthia Bashant on 05/02/2025. (mjw)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
191 191 motion Leave to File Document Mon 05/12 5:38 PM
MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by NJOY, LLC.(Kouba, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - FAC,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Redline
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
190 190 misc Withdrawal of Document Wed 05/07 10:41 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by NJOY, LLC re186 Notice (Other), filed by NJOY, LLC . (Iliopoulos, Kristina) (mjw)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
189 189 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/05 3:30 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by NJOY, LLC. Shenzhen Han Technology Co., Ltd. served. (Iliopoulos, Kristina) (mjw)
Related: [-]
188 188 order Order on Motion to Continue Mon 05/05 9:22 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Good cause appearing,185 Joint MOTION to Continue Discovery Dispute Deadline is GRANTED. Accordingly, the deadline to lodge a Joint Discovery Statement in connection with the Online Retailer Defendants' 3/27/2025 response to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production is continued to 6/11/2025. (no document attached) (cxe)
Related: [-]