Kraftex Floor Corporation
Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | A Benjamin Goldgar |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-03038 |
Case Filed: | Mar 01, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Kraftex Floor Corporation
609 Edgewood
Wood Dale, IL 60191 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604 |
Docket last updated: 58 minutes ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
58 | 58
order
Use Cash Collateral
Fri 04/26 2:13 PM
Interim Order Granting Motion To Use Cash Collateral . Hearing scheduled for 5/6/2024 at 10:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 642, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Goldgar. Signed on 4/26/2024. (Cabrales, Claudia) |
|
57 | 57
misc
Proposed Order
Fri 04/26 10:18 AM
Proposed Order - Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral Filed by Ben L Schneider on behalf of Kraftex Floor Corporation . (Schneider, Ben) |
|
Att: 1 Amended Budget | ||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
56 | 56
order
Continue/Reschedule
Tue 04/23 10:20 AM
Order Granting Motion to Continue/Reschedule . Status hearing to be held on 5/6/2024 at 10:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 642, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Goldgar. Signed on 4/22/2024. (Cabrales, Claudia) |
|
55 | 55
misc
Monthly Operating Report for Small Business (Form 425C)
Mon 04/22 4:50 PM
Monthly Operating Report for Small Business (Form 425C) for the Filing Period Ending 03/31/2024 Filed by Ben L Schneider on behalf of Kraftex Floor Corporation. (Schneider, Ben) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A and B | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Bank Statement 4438 | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Bank Statement 4420 | ||
54 | 54
court
Hearing Continued (Other)
Mon 04/22 3:09 PM
Status Hearing Continued . Status hearing to be held on 5/6/2024 at 10:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 642, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Goldgar. (Castellano, Nancy) |
|
53 | 53
court
Hearing Stricken (Other)
Mon 04/22 3:07 PM
Case Status Hearing Scheduled for 4/29/24, is Stricken . (Castellano, Nancy) |
|
52 | 52
utility
U - Draft Order
Mon 04/22 2:06 PM
Draft Order . due by 04/29/2024 (Castellano, Nancy) |
|
51 | 51
misc
Small Business Subchapter V Status Report (Code 1188)
Mon 04/22 9:34 AM
Small Business Subchapter V Status Report (Code 1188) Filed by Ben L Schneider on behalf of Kraftex Floor Corporation . (Schneider, Ben) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
50 | 50
crditcrd
none
Fri 04/19 12:49 PM
Receipt of Schedules([LINK 24-03038 ) [misc,schaj] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47796969. Fee Amount $ 34.00 (Schneider, Ben) (U.S. Treasury) |
|
49 | 49
misc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors (Form 104/204)
Fri 04/19 12:49 PM
Amended Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Case Non Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders, Amended Schedules A / B,E / F,G,with Declaration Fee Amount $34 Filed by Ben L Schneider on behalf of Kraftex Floor Corporation. (Schneider, Ben) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration |