New Chicago Community Development Corporation
Tennessee Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jennie D Latta |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-20932 |
Case Filed: | Mar 01, 2024 |
Debtor
New Chicago Community Development Corporation
1036 Firestone Ave
Memphis, TN 38107-1134 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee One Memphis Place 200 Jefferson Avenue, Suite 400
Memphis, TN 38103 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 12:03 PM CDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report ( UST Form 11-MOR )
Thu 04/25 5:04 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 3/31/2024 Filed by Ted I. Jones on behalf of Debtor New Chicago Community Development Corporation. (Jones, Ted) |
|
court
Notice Of Continuance
Thu 04/25 3:00 PM
Notice Of Continuance related document(s)9 Order and Notice of Deadlines and Date Set for 11 U.S.C. Section 1188(a) Status Conference. Status hearing to be held on 05/09/2024 at 10:15 AM Room 645, Memphis, TN. (dch) Auto-docketed(CPA) |
||
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Amended/Corrected Voluntary Petition
Tue 04/02 5:32 PM
Amended/Corrected Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition as to NOT a single asset real estate case Filed by Ted I. Jones on behalf of Debtor New Chicago Community Development Corporation. (Jones, Ted) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
trustee
UST Report Of Meeting Of Creditors Held
Mon 04/01 11:40 AM
The United States Trustee reports that the Meeting of Creditors required under 11 U.S.C. Section 341 has been held and conducted as scheduled. (Walker, Jamaal) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202)
Mon 04/01 11:31 AM
Amended Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Filed by Ted I. Jones on behalf of Debtor New Chicago Community Development Corporation. (Jones, Ted) |
|
utility
Satisfy Missing Document(s) Deadline
Mon 04/01 11:35 AM
All Completion/Missing Documents have been filed and all related deadlines have been satisfied. (ams) |
||
utility
Corrective Entry
Mon 04/01 11:37 AM
NOTICE OF CORRECTIVE ENTRY : |
||
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202)
Fri 03/29 2:42 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor , Equity Security Holders , Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Schedule D: Non-Individual Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Non-Individual. , Schedule G: Non-Individual Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H: Non-Individual Codebtors , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual , Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Filed by Ted I. Jones on behalf of Debtor New Chicago Community Development Corporation. (Jones, Ted) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Amended/Corrected Voluntary Petition
Fri 03/29 2:25 PM
Amended/Corrected Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition as to Filed by Ted I. Jones on behalf of Debtor New Chicago Community Development Corporation. (Jones, Ted) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Extend Time
Fri 03/29 1:40 PM
Motion to Extend Time To Complete Petition And Schedules Filed by Ted I. Jones on behalf of New Chicago Community Development Corporation (Jones, Ted) |
|
Saturday, March 23, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing
Sat 03/23 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 03/23/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
order
Extend Deadline to File Schedules
Thu 03/21 11:16 AM
Order Granting Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Attorney Fee Disclosure Statement, List of Equity Security Holders, Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Statement of Financial Affairs and Debtor Declaration, Summary of Assets and Liabilities , Declaration Re: Corporation or Partnership (Form 202), Incomplete Filings Due by 3/29/2024. (ams) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extend Deadline to File Schedules/Statements
Tue 03/19 2:43 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules/Statements or Provide Required Information Filed by Ted I. Jones on behalf of New Chicago Community Development Corporation (Jones, Ted) |
|
Friday, March 08, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing
Fri 03/08 11:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 03/08/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, March 07, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Meeting Of Creditors
Thu 03/07 11:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 03/07/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing
Wed 03/06 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 03/06/2024. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
trustee
UST Notice Of Initial Debtor Interview
Wed 03/06 12:05 PM
As required by 28 U.S.C. Section 586(a), the United States Trustee provides notice that the Initial Debtor Interview will be held on **RESETTING** Thursday, March 7, 2024, telelphonically at 3:30 p.m. (LeSueur, Darlene) |
|
9 | 9
3
pgs
order
Order And Notice Of Deadlines and Date Set for Status Conf (initial order on Ch 11 SubchV)
Wed 03/06 11:11 AM
Order and Notice of Deadlines and Date Set for 11 U.S.C. Section 1188(a) Status Conference. Status hearing to be held on 4/25/2024 at 10:15 AM Room 645, Memphis, TN . Pre Status Conference Report Due By 4/11/2024. (ams) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
trustee
UST Notice Of Initial Debtor Interview
Tue 03/05 3:54 PM
As required by 28 U.S.C. Section 586(a), the United States Trustee provides notice that the Initial Debtor Interview will be held on Thursday, March 7, 2024, telelphonically at 10:00 a.m. (LeSueur, Darlene) |
|
7 | 7
court
Meeting Of Creditors Chapter 11
Tue 03/05 7:56 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/1/2024 at 10:00 AM via by telephone or videoconference. Proof of Claims due by 6/10/2024. Government Proof of Claims due by 8/28/2024. (ams) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice - GENERIC
Tue 03/05 6:45 AM
Notice of 11 U.S.C. § 341 Meeting of Creditors Telephonic Conference Filed by Jamaal M. Walker on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Walker, Jamaal) |
|
trustee
U.S. Trustee Notice Setting Meeting Of Creditors
Tue 03/05 6:40 AM
Notice By The U.S. Trustee Setting The Meeting Of Creditors. Section 341 Meeting has been set on 4/1/2024 at 10:00 AM at telephonically. (Walker, Jamaal) |
||
crditcrd
AutoDocket Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt
Tue 03/05 7:57 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-20932 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A40967317, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice Of Appearance And Request For Notice (For Attorney Filers ONLY)
Mon 03/04 5:03 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by James E. Bailey III. on behalf of James E. Bailey III. (Bailey, James) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
trustee
Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee
Mon 03/04 3:51 PM
Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee . James E. Bailey, III added to the case. (Walker, Jamaal) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Affidavit | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice Of Appearance And Request For Notice (For Attorney Filers ONLY)
Mon 03/04 8:47 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jamaal M. Walker on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Walker, Jamaal) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Update Chapter 11 Deficiency Deadlines
Mon 03/04 6:59 AM
Notice of Required Filing Fee and/or Deficient Filing. Deficiency Deadlines Updated to Indicate Incomplete Filings: Attorney Fee Disclosure Statement, List of Equity Security Holders, Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Statement of Financial Affairs and Debtor Declaration, Summary of Assets and Liabilities , Declaration Re: Corporation or Partnership (Form 202), Incomplete Filings Due by 3/18/2024. (ams) |
|
utility
Corrective Entry (RE: New Case Filing Fee)
Mon 03/04 6:50 AM
REQUEST FOR CORRECTION BY FILER : VOLUNTARY PETITION INDICATES FEE PAID. AT THIS TIME, NO FEE HAS BEEN RECEIVED BY THE COURT. FILING FEE MUST BE TENDERED ASAP TO AVOID BEING BLOCKED FROM FILING IN CM/ECF UNTIL FEE IS PAID IN FULL. Filing Fees Due By 3/19/2024 (ams) |
||
Friday, March 01, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
10
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Ch 11 - Atty Case Opening Only)
Fri 03/01 10:03 AM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual with deficiencies,. Filing Fee Due $1738, Filed by New Chicago Community Development Corporation Chapter 11 SubChapter V Plan due by 05/30/2024. (Jones, Ted) |
|
misc
Matrix
Fri 03/01 10:04 AM
Matrix Filed by Ted I. Jones on behalf of Debtor New Chicago Community Development Corporation. (Jones, Ted) |