California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando M Olguin
Referred: Margo A Rocconi
Case #: 2:24-cv-01692
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2024
Terminated:Mar 26, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 28, 2024 2:49 AM PDT
Defendant
Primis Financial Corporation
Represented By
Kevin Michael Hoogstraten
Covington And Burling LLP
contact info
Defendant
Dennis Zember
Represented By
Kevin Michael Hoogstraten
Covington And Burling LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lotfi Mehdian
Represented By
Bahram Niknia
Niknia Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, November 15, 2024
12 12 motion Dismiss Case Fri 11/15 4:19 PM
Joint REQUEST to Dismiss Case with prejudice filed by Plaintiff Lotfi Mehdian. (Niknia, Bahram)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
11 11 order Staying Case Wed 03/27 8:27 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION8 TO ARBITRATE AND STAY ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (iv)
Related: [-]
10 10 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 03/26 11:20 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
9 9 cs_rasgn Reassign Case - Self -Recusal - (CV-52) Mon 03/25 3:33 PM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges.by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. Case transferred from Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani to the calendar of Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:24-cv-01692 FMO(MARx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
8 8 stip Stay Case Thu 03/21 8:51 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Completion of the Arbitration filed by defendant Primis Financial Corporation, Dennis Zember.(Hoogstraten, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Tue 03/19 9:52 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue to Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:24-cv-01692 MRA(MARx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Extending Answer Due Deadline Wed 03/06 3:20 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND MOVE TO REMAND5 by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. The Court, approves and adopts the stipulation and hereby ORDERS that: Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint shall be March 22, 2024, and; Plaintiffs' deadline to move to remand the case to state court shall be April 15, 2024. (es)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
5 5 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Tue 03/05 7:48 PM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendant Dennis Zember, Primis Financial Corporation.(Hoogstraten, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 04, 2024
4 4 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Mon 03/04 5:29 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV11C
Friday, March 01, 2024
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 03/01 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Primis Financial Corporation, Dennis Zember, (Hoogstraten, Kevin)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 03/01 10:59 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Primis Financial Corporation, Dennis Zember. (Hoogstraten, Kevin)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/01 10:54 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 23STCV30899 Receipt No: ACACDC-37013715 - Fee: $405, filed by defendant Dennis Zember, Primis Financial Corporation. (Attorney Kevin Michael Hoogstraten added to party Primis Financial Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Michael Hoogstraten added to party Dennis Zember(pty:dft))(Hoogstraten, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Kevin Hoogstraten,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10