New York Northern District Court
Judge:Anne M Nardacci
Referred: Mitchell J Katz
Case #: 9:24-cv-00295
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
50 50 motion Letter Request/Motion Fri 05/16 5:01 PM
Letter Motion for Josh Stevens requesting to be terminated as a defendant in this matter submitted to Judge Mitchell J. Katz . (Engelhart, Chi-Hsin)
Related: [-]
49 49 service Acknowledgment of Service (USM 299 Form) Fri 05/16 4:58 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE (USM 299 Form) Executed as to Jesse Stevens served on 3/20/2025, answer due 5/19/2025. Acknowledgment filed by Jesse Stevens. (Engelhart, Chi-Hsin)
Related: [-]
48 48 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/16 4:56 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Chi-Hsin E. Engelhart on behalf of Jesse Stevens(Engelhart, Chi-Hsin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Service on Plaintiff