New York Southern District Court
Judge:Paul A Engelmayer
Case #: 1:24-cv-01591
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 5:57 AM EDT
Defendant
Officer Luis Duman
Defendant
Officer Lejoe J. Endanattu
Defendant
Officer Paris Giddins
Defendant
Sgt. Timothy J. Marx
Defendant
Officer Rafi J. Rodriguez Joaquin
Defendant
City of New York
Represented By
Joseph Makoto Hiraoka, Jr.
New York City Law Department
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Lora Mosquete
Represented By
Sara J Wolkensdorfer
Rickner PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 78 minutes ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
16 16 service Affidavit of Service Other Thu 05/01 9:51 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference served on All Defendants on 4/29/2025. Service was made by Email. Document filed by Richard Lora Mosquete..(Wolkensdorfer, Sara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
15 15 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 04/29 4:31 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This conference will be held telephonically. The parties should call into the Court's dedicated conference line at (855) 244-8681, and enter Access Code 2318-315-0661, followed by the pound (#) key. Counsel are directed to review the Court's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in Light of COVID-19, found at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-paul-engelmayer, for the Court's procedures for telephonic conferences and for instructions for communicating with chambers. Initial Conference set for 6/9/2025 at 03:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/29/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
adr Mediation Conference Not Held Fri 02/28 11:01 AM
MEDIATION CONFERENCE NOT HELD Mediation Conference scheduled for 03/10/2025 will not be held.(sni)
Related: [-]
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Fri 02/28 11:02 AM
SUBSEQUENT MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 4/18/2025 at 09:30 AM in Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007.(sni)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
adr Mediation Conference Not Held Fri 01/24 9:12 AM
MEDIATION CONFERENCE NOT HELD Mediation Conference scheduled for 01/30/2025 will not be held. Mediation Status due by 2/10/2025.(sni)
Related: [-]
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Fri 01/24 9:20 AM
SUBSEQUENT MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 3/10/2025 at 10:00 AM in Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007.(sni)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Tue 12/10 10:32 AM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 1/30/2025 at 09:30 AM in Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007.(sni)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Tue 10/08 10:41 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 12/9/2024.(sge)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
adr Section 1983 Plan 100-Day Review Mon 10/07 12:41 PM
LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (FORMERLY THE SECTION 1983 PLAN) 100-DAY REVIEW: The mediator shall be available to the parties throughout the discovery phase of the Rule and shall schedule and hold the first mediation session in the case within fourteen (14) days of the close of the discovery period. In the event that the mediation cannot begin within the time set forth herein, the assigned mediator shall promptly notify the Mediation Supervisor of the date by which the mediation will begin and the reason for the delay. The mediator shall correspond with the Mediation Office to arrange a mutually convenient date and time to hold the first session. 1983-Plan Review due by 1/15/2025. Mediator to be Assigned by 10/21/2024.(rpr)
Related: [-]
adr Notice of Selection for Mediation Mon 10/07 12:41 PM
NOTICE OF SELECTION FOR MEDIATION: This case has been selected for participation in the Southern District of New York's mediation program.(rpr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 10/03 3:39 PM
ANSWER to6 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by City of New York, Luis Duman, Lejoe J. Endanattu, Paris Giddins, Timothy J. Marx, Rafi J. Rodriguez Joaquin..(Hiraoka, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 08/30 6:05 PM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. City of New York answer due 10/3/2024. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/30/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 08/29 5:53 PM
SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:6 Amended Complaint, addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Joseph M. Hiraoka, Jr. dated August 29, 2024. Document filed by City of New York..(Hiraoka, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 08/02 12:06 PM
ORDER granting9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re6 Amended Complaint,. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (City of New York answer due 9/3/2024; Luis Duman answer due 9/3/2024; Lejoe J. Endanattu answer due 9/3/2024; Paris Giddins answer due 9/3/2024; Timothy J. Marx answer due 9/3/2024; Rafi J. Rodriguez Joaquin answer due 9/3/2024.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/1/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 07/31 5:31 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:6 Amended Complaint, addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Joseph M. Hiraoka, Jr. dated July 31, 2024. Document filed by City of New York..(Hiraoka, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/20 5:59 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Makoto Hiraoka, Jr on behalf of City of New York..(Hiraoka, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 04/22 12:20 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, Amended Complaint, served. City of New York served on 4/22/2024, answer due 5/13/2024; Luis Duman served on 4/16/2024, answer due 5/7/2024; Lejoe J. Endanattu served on 4/16/2024, answer due 5/7/2024; Paris Giddins served on 4/16/2024, answer due 5/7/2024; Timothy J. Marx served on 4/18/2024, answer due 5/9/2024; Rafi J. Rodriguez Joaquin served on 4/16/2024, answer due 5/7/2024. Service was accepted by Sergeant Ferguson, Sergeant Ahmed. Service was made by Email. Document filed by Richard Lora Mosquete..(Wolkensdorfer, Sara)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 04/12 9:25 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint, against City of New York, Luis Duman, Lejoe J. Endanattu, Paris Giddins, Timothy J. Marx, Rafi J. Rodriguez Joaquin with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Richard Lora Mosquete. Related document:1 Complaint,..(Wolkensdorfer, Sara)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
adr Notice of Participation in Section 1983 Plan Mon 03/11 10:31 AM
NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (FORMERLY THE SECTION 1983 PLAN) : Unless otherwise ordered, this case shall participate in the Southern District of New York's Local Civil Rule 83.10. Please reference the Court's website, https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr, to review Local Civil Rule 83.10, updated 4/1/2015, for important information.(rpr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 03/05 2:59 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York, Luis Duman, Lejoe J. Endanattu, Paris Giddins, Timothy J. Marx, Rafi J. Rodriguez Joaquin..(pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 03/04 10:09 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, Luis Duman, Lejoe J. Endanattu, Paris Giddins, Timothy J. Marx, and Rafi J. Rodriguez Joaquin, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Richard Lora Mosquete..(Wolkensdorfer, Sara)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 03/04 9:51 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 03/04 9:51 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 03/04 9:51 AM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 03/04 10:02 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Sara J Wolkensdorfer to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the TO section of the PDF does not match the entire name of the party on the pleading/docket, party missing. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (gp)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 03/01 1:17 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, Luis Duman, Lejoe J. Endanattu, Paris Giddins, Timothy J. Marx, and Rafi J. Rodriguez Joaquin, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Richard Lora Mosquete..(Wolkensdorfer, Sara)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/01 1:15 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wolkensdorfer, Sara)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/01 1:12 PM
COMPLAINT against Luis Duman, Lejoe J. Endanattu, Paris Giddins, Timothy J. Marx, Rafi J. Rodriguez Joaquin, THE CITY OF NEW YORK. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29020533)Document filed by Richard Lora Mosquete..(Wolkensdorfer, Sara)
Related: [-]