New York Southern District Court
Judge:Colleen Mcmahon
Case #: 1:24-cv-01598
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2024
Terminated:Jun 06, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 5:58 AM EDT
Defendant
A24 Films LLC
Represented By
Carl Mazurek
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
The American Automobile Association, Inc.
Represented By
Neil Kenneth Roman
Covington & Burling, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, June 07, 2024
22 22 2 pgs misc AO 120 Form Trademark - Case Terminated - Submitted Fri 06/07 9:20 AM
AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE TERMINATED - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 6/6/2024 in a court action filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).(km)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 06/06 9:52 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) A24 Films LLC. Document filed by The American Automobile Association, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Roman, Neil)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error Thu 06/06 9:07 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Neil Roman to RE-FILE Document 20 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. Use the event type Other Filings, Notices, Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (km)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
20 20 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 06/05 2:53 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) A24 Films LLC pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by The American Automobile Association, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Roman, Neil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 05/30 6:25 PM
ORDER granting18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. OK. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/30/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 05/30 6:25 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: A24 Films LLC answer due 6/5/2024. (tg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time Wed 05/29 6:32 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and Other Scheduling Order Deadlines addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Carl Mazurek dated May 29, 2024. Document filed by A24 Films LLC..(Mazurek, Carl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order - Proposed Revised Scheduling Order
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 05/14 3:40 PM
ORDER granting16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re16 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint,,,,,, addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Carl Mazurek dated May 13, 2024.,1 Complaint. Ok, extension granted. A24 Films LLC answer due 5/31/2024. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/14/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 05/13 3:01 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint,,,,,, addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Carl Mazurek dated May 13, 2024. Document filed by A24 Films LLC..(Mazurek, Carl)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/13 2:58 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carl Mazurek on behalf of A24 Films LLC..(Mazurek, Carl)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
14 14 order Case Management Plan Fri 04/12 3:56 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: This case is to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 7/17/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 7/10/2024. Expert Discovery due by 9/6/2024. Discovery due by 9/6/2024. Pretrial Order due by 10/21/2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/12/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Fri 04/12 12:09 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by The American Automobile Association, Inc...(Roman, Neil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 04/02 3:13 PM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. OK. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/2/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time Mon 04/01 2:27 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit a Proposed Civil Case Management Plan addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Neil K. Roman dated April 1, 2024. Document filed by The American Automobile Association, Inc...(Roman, Neil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/12 1:36 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. A24 Films LLC waiver sent on 3/11/2024, answer due 5/10/2024. Document filed by The American Automobile Association, Inc...(Roman, Neil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
9 9 6 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Wed 03/06 4:32 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This action having been assigned to me for all purposes it is hereby ORDERED as follows: Counsel receiving this order shall contact all counsel of record (or where a party is not yet represented such party) and if necessary provide them with a copy of this order. If the parties fail to agree upon such a plan or fail to submit the plan to the Court within the time provided (at least two business days before the conference date) the parties must appear at a conference on 4/18/2024 at 11:00 a.m., in courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007. (Initial Conference set for 4/18/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/6/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
8 8 1 pgs misc AO 120 Form Trademark - Case Opening - Submitted Tue 03/05 12:57 PM
AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(jgo)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
7 7 misc AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney Mon 03/04 12:29 PM
AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Roman, Neil)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 03/04 12:27 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Roman, Neil)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 03/04 10:47 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to A24 Films LLC. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Mon 03/04 10:34 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Neil Kenneth Roman to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (sj)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 03/04 10:39 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 03/04 10:41 AM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 03/04 10:41 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit AO 120 Form/AO 121 Form Mon 03/04 10:48 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Neil Kenneth Roman to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 03/01 2:29 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to A24 Films LLC, re:1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by The American Automobile Association, Inc...(Roman, Neil)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/01 2:25 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The American Automobile Association, Inc...(Roman, Neil)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/01 2:23 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Roman, Neil)
Related: [-]
1 1 33 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/01 2:22 PM
COMPLAINT against A24 Films LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29021007)Document filed by The American Automobile Association, Inc...(Roman, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - NBC Los Angeles Article,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Letter to C. Farrelly,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Letter to M. Fretwell,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Letter to A. Nicholson,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - E-mail to A. Nicholson,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Letter to M. Fretwell,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Letter to A. Nicholson,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - E-mail to A. Nicholson,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Letter to M. Fretwell,
Att: 10 Exhibit J - E-mail to M. Fretwell,
Att: 11 Exhibit K - Letter to N. Jampol,
Att: 12 Exhibit L - Filing Receipt for Letter of Protest,
Att: 13 Exhibit M - Letter of Protest Memorandum,
Att: 14 Exhibit N - USPTO Official Notice,
Att: 15 Exhibit O - USPTO Office Action,
Att: 16 Exhibit P - USPTO Request for Express Abandonment,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q - USPTO Notice of Abandonment,
Att: 18 Exhibit R - Image of A24FILMS.COM,
Att: 19 Exhibit S - Image of AAA24.A24FILMS.COM,
Att: 20 Exhibit T - Image of AAA24.A24FILMS.COM,
Att: 21 Exhibit U - Image of AAA24.A24FILMS.COM,
Att: 22 Exhibit V - Image of AAA24.A24FILMS.COM,
Att: 23 Exhibit W - Image of AAA24.A24FILMS.COM,
Att: 24 Exhibit X - Image of AAA24.A24FILMS.COM,
Att: 25 Exhibit Y - Image of AAA24.A24FILMS.COM,
Att: 26 Exhibit Z - A24 Tweet,
Att: 27 Exhibit AA - AAA24 Reddit Post,
Att: 28 Exhibit BB - AAA24 Reddit Post,
Att: 29 Exhibit CC - AAA24 Reddit Post,
Att: 30 Exhibit DD - AAA24 Reddit Post,
Att: 31 Exhibit EE - AAA24 Reddit Post,
Att: 32 Exhibit FF - AAA24 Reddit Post