California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:M Elaine Hammond
Case #: 5:24-bk-50304
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Apr 03, 2024
Terminated:Apr 04, 2024

Debtor
R & J Garden Produce Inc
5679 Cahalan Ave
San Jose, CA 95123-3007
Represented By
James S.K. Shulman
Law Offices Of James Shulman
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Doris A. Kaelin
P.O. Box 1582
Santa Cruz, CA 95061
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SJ
U.S. Federal Bldg. 280 S 1st St. #268
San Jose, CA 95113


Docket last updated: 03/01/2024 12:07 PM PST
Friday, March 01, 2024
crditcrd none Fri 03/01 7:50 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-50304 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00). Receipt number A33046483, amount $ 338.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Fri 03/01 7:49 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $338. Filed by R & J Garden Produce Inc. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 03/15/2024. (Shulman, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) Fri 03/01 7:50 AM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/3/2024 at 12:00 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (Shulman, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 03/01 8:02 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement. Filed by Debtor R & J Garden Produce Inc (Shulman, James)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Designate Responsible Individual Fri 03/01 8:03 AM
Application to Designate Robert Nazari as Responsible Individual Filed by Debtor R & J Garden Produce Inc (Shulman, James)
Related: [-]