Oklahoma Northern District Court
Judge:Sara E Hill
Case #: 4:24-cv-00089
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2024
Terminated:Sep 17, 2024
Case in other court:Rogers Cty Dist Ct, CJ-23-00369
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 28, 2024 5:48 AM CDT
Defendant
Carol Adams
Represented By
Steven Oren Kuperman
Latham Steele Lehman
contact info
Brian Lee Carter
Latham Steele Lehman
contact info
Bobby Leon Latham, Jr
Latham, Steele, Lehman, Keele, Ratcliff, Freije & Carter, PC
contact info
Defendant
Hodges Farms and Dredging, LLC
Represented By
Steven Oren Kuperman
Latham Steele Lehman
contact info
Brian Lee Carter
Latham Steele Lehman
contact info
Bobby Leon Latham, Jr
Latham, Steele, Lehman, Keele, Ratcliff, Freije & Carter, PC
contact info
Defendant
Craig Thomsen
Represented By
Steven Oren Kuperman
Latham Steele Lehman
contact info
Brian Lee Carter
Latham Steele Lehman
contact info
Bobby Leon Latham, Jr
Latham, Steele, Lehman, Keele, Ratcliff, Freije & Carter, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tyler Laird
Represented By
Robert L Rode
Rode Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
28 28 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 09/17 9:59 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal, closing case, by Carol Adams, Hodges Farms and Dredging, LLC, Craig Thomsen (Kuperman, Steven)
Related: [-]
utility Case - Terminate Civil/Miscellaneous Case Wed 09/18 11:37 AM
***Civil Case Terminated (see document number28 ) (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
27 27 order 05 - Scheduling Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Date(s) Wed 05/29 3:35 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Sara E Hill (Initial) , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 11/22/2024, Dispositive Motions due by 12/20/2024, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/24/2025, Pretrial Conference set for 3/20/2025 at 09:15 AM before Judge Sara E Hill, Jury Trial set for 5/5/2025 at 08:45 AM before Judge Sara E Hill) (alg, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
26 26 misc Joint Status Report per LCvR16-1(b)(1) Tue 05/28 4:11 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Carol Adams, Hodges Farms and Dredging, LLC, Craig Thomsen (Kuperman, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
25 25 order 01 - Order Directing - Parties to File Joint Status Report Mon 05/06 11:49 AM
ORDER by Judge Sara E Hill for Joint Status Report , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 5/28/2024) (lmc, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
24 24 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Fri 05/03 9:55 AM
Second DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Hodges Farms and Dredging, LLC for Hodges Farms and Dredging, LLC) by Hodges Farms and Dredging, LLC (Kuperman, Steven)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Removal (Amended) Fri 05/03 9:51 AM
Second AMENDED NOTICE of Removal by Carol Adams, Hodges Farms and Dredging, LLC, Craig Thomsen (With attachments) (Kuperman, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
22 22 order 01 - Order Documents - Link to Document(s) Tue 04/30 1:47 PM
ORDER by Judge Sara E Hill - Defendants to file an amended notice of removal and Defendant Hodges Farms and Dredging, LLC to file a corrected disclosure form within 7 days of the date of this order. Related [+] (lmc, Chambers)
Related: [-] 21 Amended Notice of Removal,17 Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1)
Friday, April 26, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Removal (Amended) Fri 04/26 10:08 AM
AMENDED NOTICE of Removal by Carol Adams, Hodges Farms and Dredging, LLC, Craig Thomsen (With attachments) (Kuperman, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
19 19 order 01 - Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Wed 04/17 1:47 PM
ORDER by Judge Sara E Hill , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 5/1/2024) (lmc, Chambers)
Related: [-]
order 02 - Minute Order Wed 04/17 3:00 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Sara E Hill - Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in issuing a scheduling order in this case as the Court is not yet satisfied that it may exercise subject-matter jurisdiction. The Court will request a joint status report and enter a scheduling order if and when the Court is satisfied it may exercise subject-matter jurisdiction. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
18 18 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Wed 03/06 2:12 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tyler Laird (Rode, Robert)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Wed 03/06 8:40 AM
Amended DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hodges Farms and Dredging, LLC (Kuperman, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
15 15 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Tue 03/05 4:37 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hodges Farms and Dredging, LLC (Kuperman, Steven)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Tue 03/05 4:36 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Craig Thomsen (Kuperman, Steven)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Tue 03/05 4:35 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carol Adams (Kuperman, Steven)
Related: [-]
11 11 order 01 - Order Directing - Parties to File Joint Status Report Tue 03/05 3:38 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 3/26/2024) (SHJ, Judge)
Related: [-]
order 02 - Minute Order Case - Assigned to District Judge (declination of consent only) Case - Number Changed Tue 03/05 4:12 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , assigning this case to a district judge. Assigning case to District Judge Sara E Hill and Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman, changing case number to 24-cv-89-SEH-SH (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
order 02 - Minute Order Documents - Vacate/Set Aside Order(s) Documents - Link to Document(s) Tue 03/05 4:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman In light of the reassignment , vacating/setting aside order(s) Related [+] (Documents Terminated:11 Order, Directing Parties to File Joint Status Report ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 11 Order, Directing Parties to File Joint Status Report
Monday, March 04, 2024
order 02 - Minute Order Case - Recuse Judge Case - Number Changed Mon 03/04 4:37 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , recusing Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele. Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman reassigned to case., changing case number to 24-cv-00089-SH (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (ll, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
9 9 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Tyler Laird, Carol Adams, Hodges Farms and Dredging, LLC, and Craig Thomsen to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
8 8 order 15 - Notice of Assignment of Case to MJ Fri 03/01 4:20 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. ACTION REQUIRED: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial, final entry of judgment, and direct review by the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge, if the attached form is not signed and returned within the applicable deadline. The plaintiff or removing party must serve a copy of this notice upon all other parties to this action. (lmt, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Appearance - Attorney Fri 03/01 2:01 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bobby Leon Latham, Jr on behalf of Carol Adams, Hodges Farms and Dredging, LLC, Craig Thomsen [Note: Attorney Bobby Leon Latham, Jr added to party Carol Adams(pty:dft), Attorney Bobby Leon Latham, Jr added to party Hodges Farms and Dredging, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Bobby Leon Latham, Jr added to party Craig Thomsen(pty:dft).] (Latham, Bobby)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Appearance - Attorney Fri 03/01 1:59 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brian Lee Carter on behalf of Carol Adams, Hodges Farms and Dredging, LLC, Craig Thomsen [Note: Attorney Brian Lee Carter added to party Carol Adams(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Lee Carter added to party Hodges Farms and Dredging, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Lee Carter added to party Craig Thomsen(pty:dft).] (Carter, Brian)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance - Attorney Fri 03/01 1:56 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Steven Oren Kuperman on behalf of Carol Adams, Hodges Farms and Dredging, LLC, Craig Thomsen (Kuperman, Steven)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Status Report on Removed Action Fri 03/01 1:56 PM
STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Carol Adams, Hodges Farms and Dredging, LLC, Craig Thomsen (Kuperman, Steven)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Jury Demand Fri 03/01 1:54 PM
JURY DEMAND by Carol Adams, Hodges Farms and Dredging, LLC, Craig Thomsen (Kuperman, Steven)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Removal Fri 03/01 1:53 PM
NOTICE of Removal from Rogers, case number CJ-2023-369 (paid $405 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2963472) by Carol Adams, Hodges Farms and Dredging, LLC, Craig Thomsen (With attachments) (Kuperman, Steven)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/01 1:49 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Carol Adams, Hodges Farms and Dredging, LLC, Craig Thomsen (Kuperman, Steven)
Related: [-]
order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement Fri 03/01 4:23 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Tyler Laird, Carol Adams, Hodges Farms and Dredging, LLC, and Craig Thomsen to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants by Tyler Laird (lmt, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]