New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Brian M Cogan
Case #: 1:24-cv-01572
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause12:1819 Default of Promissory Note
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2024
Terminated:Jan 22, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 28, 2024 5:55 AM EDT
Defendant
Signature Bank
Represented By
John Nicholas Orsini
Friedman Kaplan Seiler Adelman & Robbins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Utrecht Plaza, LLC
Represented By
Peter T. Mensching
Eustace, Prezioso & Yapchanyk
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Molinari
Represented By
Angelicque Mary Moreno
Avanzino & Moreno, P.C.
contact info
Brian Christopher Brown
Avanzino And Moreno, PC
contact info
Marc Gertler
Avanzino And Moreno, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Marian-Lyn Riordan
Represented By
Angelicque Mary Moreno
Avanzino & Moreno, P.C.
contact info
Brian Christopher Brown
Avanzino And Moreno, PC
contact info
Marc Gertler
Avanzino And Moreno, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 01/22 3:20 PM
Civil Case Terminated as per stipulation of voluntary dismissal. (RG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 01/21 2:50 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Peter Molinari (Gruber, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
13 13 misc Transcript Fri 08/16 5:05 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/22/2024, for hearing type Oral Argument, before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Andronikh Barna, Telephone number 718-613-2178. Email address: ambarna.crr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 9/6/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/16/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2024. (Barna, Andronikh)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion to Stay ~Util - Case Stayed Fri 03/22 11:05 AM
Minute Entry and Order for hearing on defendants' motion to stay and plaintiffs' motion to remand. Counsel for all parties appeared via Zoom. For the reasons stated on the record, defendants' motion to stay9 is granted and plaintiffs' motion to remand10 is denied. The Clerk is directed to mark the case closed for administrative purposes pending further proceedings. See transcript for details (Court Reporter: Nikki Barna). (PW)
Related: [-]
utility Incomplete ACO Case Termination/Statistical/Non Reportable Closing Fri 03/22 12:09 PM
Administrative Closing. (TLH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
12 12 misc Letter Thu 03/21 10:09 AM
Letter Response in Opposition to Letter-Motion [ECF Dkt. No. 10] by Signature Bank (Orsini, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Transfer Agreement
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/21 9:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter T. Mensching on behalf of Utrecht Plaza, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Mensching, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
10 10 misc Letter Mon 03/18 3:15 PM
Letter Motion in Response by Peter Molinari, Marian-Lyn Riordan (Gertler, Marc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
9 9 misc Letter Fri 03/08 3:27 PM
Letter Requesting Pre-Motion Conference by Signature Bank (Orsini, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Notice to Discovered Claimant to Present Proof of Claim
order Order(Other) Fri 03/08 5:33 PM
ORDER denying as unnecessary9 Letter Requesting Pre-Motion Conference. The premotion conference is waived. This letter is deemed to constitute defendants' motion to stay. Plaintiffs opposition due 3/19/2024. The Court will hear both initial status conference and oral argument on the motion by video on 3/22/2024 at 10:00 am. A ZoomGov link will be emailed to counsel of record. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/8/2024. (PW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
8 8 misc Jury Demand Thu 03/07 2:46 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Peter Molinari, Marian-Lyn Riordan (Gertler, Marc)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/07 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Gertler on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Gertler, Marc)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/07 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Christopher Brown on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Brown, Brian)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/07 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Angelicque Mary Moreno on behalf of All Plaintiffs (notification declined or already on case) (Moreno, Angelicque)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
4 4 motion Adjourn Conference Wed 03/06 9:49 AM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Signature Bank. (Orsini, John)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Wed 03/06 10:42 AM
ORDER granting4 . Initial Status Conference adjourned to 3/22/2024 at 10:00 AM. The parties are directed to call 571-353-2301 and enter Meeting ID 949146687#. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/6/2024. (PW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
3 3 service Certificate of Service Tue 03/05 11:19 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Signature Bank re1 Notice of Removal,, (Orsini, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 03/04 10:26 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/04 10:24 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
Related: [-]
misc ECF Admission and Registration Notification - Removal Mon 03/04 10:26 AM
This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (KD)
Related: [-]
order Scheduling Order Mon 03/04 11:40 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the Honorable Brian M. Cogan for a telephonic Initial Status Conference on 3/20/2024 at 10:30 am.The parties are directed to call 571-353-2301 and enter Meeting ID 949146687#. Principal trial counsel must appear at this and all subsequent conferences. Defendant's counsel is directed to notify all attorneys in this action of the conference schedule in writing. Counsel is directed to review Judge Cogan's Individual Practices, which may be obtained on the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/content/judge-brian-m-cogan. Requests for adjournment of the conference will be considered only if made in writing and otherwise in accordance with Judge Cogan's Rules. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/4/2024. (PW)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 03/01 4:22 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Signature Bank from Supreme Court of the State of New York, Kings County, case number 506546/2017. (Orsini, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Appointment and Acceptance Letters,
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Summons and Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit C: Letter,
Att: 4 Exhibit D: So-ordered Stipulation to Amend Caption,
Att: 5 Exhibit E: Purchase and Assumption Agreement,
Att: 6 Exhibit F: Notice of Substitution,
Att: 7 Exhibit G: Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 8 Exhibit H: State Court Action docket and documents,
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet