Kentucky Western District Court
Judge:David J Hale
Referred: Colin H Lindsay
Case #: 3:24-cv-00157
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause28:1441cra Removal - Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2024
Terminated:Apr 03, 2025
Case in other court:Larue District Court, 24-C-00026
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 28, 2024 6:02 AM EDT
Defendant
Heights Finance Corp.
Represented By
Reid S. Manley
Burr & Forman Llp - Birmingham
contact info
Defendant
Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC
Represented By
Danielle J. Lewis
Reminger Co., Lpa - Louisville
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles Jewell
Represented By
James H. Lawson
Lawson At Law, PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Bridgecrest Credit Company, LLC
Terminated: 04/26/2024
Represented By
Neal F. Bailen
Stites And Harbison PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Terminated: 04/11/2024
Represented By
John Michael Williams
Williams Kilpatrick, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Exeter Finance, LLC
Terminated: 03/08/2024
Represented By
Reid S. Manley
Burr & Forman Llp - Birmingham
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, April 03, 2025
47 47 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Thu 04/03 4:48 PM
ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 4/3/2025: Jewell's claims against Heights Finance and Jefferson Capital Systems are DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate Heights Finance Corporation and Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC as defendants in the record of this matter. All claims having been resolved, this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice, STRICKEN from the Court's docket, and CLOSED. Any pending motions are DENIED as moot. cc: Counsel (DLW)
Related: [-]
46 46 motion Proposed Agreed Order Thu 04/03 2:05 PM
Proposed Agreed Order of Dismissal with prejudice by Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC. (Lewis, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
45 45 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 04/02 4:21 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Heights Finance by Charles Jewell. (Lawson, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
44 44 misc Status Report Thu 01/23 2:16 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding the Status of Arbitration by Heights Finance Corp.. (Manley, Reid)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
43 43 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Thu 12/19 1:45 PM
ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 12/18/2024: Jewell's claims against Jefferson Capital Systems are DISMISSED without prejudice. Jewell and Jefferson Capital Systems shall tender an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice within forty-five (45) days of entry of this Order. cc: Counsel (DLW)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
42 42 order Order - TEXT ONLY Mon 12/16 10:12 AM
TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 12/16/2024. Per38 and41 , the 12/17/2024 telephonic scheduling conference is REMANDED from the docket. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (TLB)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
41 41 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 12/13 11:32 AM
NOTICE of Settlement as to JCAP by Charles Jewell (Lawson, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
40 40 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan) Thu 12/12 9:51 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Charles Jewell. (Lawson, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
39 39 4 pgs order Order Wed 11/06 11:03 AM
ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 11/5/2024. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2024 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Counsel for the Parties shall connect to the conference by dialing 1-650-479-3207 and entering access code 2319 759 1660. Attendees should press # to skip entry of an attendee or host code. Counsel who will try the case shall participate in the conference. See Order for specific details. cc: counsel (DeW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
38 38 1 pgs order Order on Proposed Agreed Order Order on Motion to Compel Wed 10/23 3:29 PM
ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 10/23/2024. The motion to compel arbitration (D.N.18 ) is GRANTED. Jewell's claims against Heights Finance are REFERRED to arbitration in accordance with the parties' arbitration agreement. Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. § 3, Jewell's claims against Heights Finance are STAYED pending conclusion of the parties' arbitration, at which time the Court will decide whether to enter judgment approving any arbitral award. Jewell and Heights Finance shall submit a joint status report every ninety (90) days from the date of entry of this Order until the conclusion of the arbitration and shall promptly report on the resolution of the arbitration or of any settlement. cc: Counsel (JM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
37 37 motion Proposed Agreed Order Wed 09/18 2:25 PM
Proposed Agreed Order Granting Motion to Compel Arbitration and Staying Claims Against Heights Finance Corporation by Heights Finance Corp.. (Manley, Reid)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
36 36 1 pgs order Order Fri 08/23 2:04 PM
ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 8/22/2024: The automatic stay is LIFTED. The Clerk of Court SHALL RESTORE Heights Finance Corp.'s18 motion to compel arbitration to the Court's active docket. cc: Counsel (DLW)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
35 35 notice Notice (Other) Mon 08/19 1:57 PM
NOTICE of Emergence from Bankruptcy by Heights Finance Corp. re33 Order, (Manley, Reid)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A - Final Decree Closing Certain of the Chapter 11 Cases
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Wed 06/26 12:54 PM
ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 6/25/2024: Heights Finance Corp.'s18 motion to compel arbitration is ADMINISTRATIVELY REMANDED pending the conclusion of the bankruptcy proceedings. cc: Counsel (DLW)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
33 33 1 pgs order Order Mon 06/17 3:12 PM
ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 6/17/2024: All claims against Defendant Heights Finance Corp. stand as automatically STAYED. Heights Finance SHALL FILE status reports on the bankruptcy proceedings every ninety (90) days for as long as the stay is in effect. At the conclusion of the bankruptcy proceedings, Heights Finance shall immediately notify the Court of the results. cc: Counsel (DLW)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
32 32 misc Suggestion of Bankruptcy Fri 06/14 3:04 PM
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY and Automatic Stay (Manley, Reid)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Petition
31 31 1 pgs order Order Fri 06/14 10:04 AM
ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 6/13/2024: Jewell's claims against Equifax are DISMISSED with prejudice. cc: Counsel (DLW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
30 30 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 06/11 2:40 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Equifax only by Charles Jewell. (Lawson, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Proposed Agreed Order Mon 06/10 3:49 PM
ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 6/10/2024 granting28 Proposed Agreed Order. Jewell's claims against Bridgecrest are DISMISSED with prejudice. cc: Counsel (DLW)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
28 28 motion Proposed Agreed Order Fri 06/07 10:00 AM
Proposed Agreed Order by Bridgecrest Credit Company, LLC. (Bailen, Neal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
27 27 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/23 1:22 PM
NOTICE of Non-Receipt of Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration by Heights Finance Corp. re18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Supporting Memorandum of Law (Manley, Reid)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 16, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Proposed Agreed Order Thu 05/16 11:35 AM
ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 5/16/2024 granting25 Proposed Agreed Order. Jewell's claims against Exeter are DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate Exeter Finance, LLC as a defendant in the record of this matter. This Order does not affect Jewell's claims against any other defendant. cc: Counsel (DeW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
25 25 motion Proposed Agreed Order Wed 05/15 11:37 AM
Proposed Agreed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice by Exeter Finance, LLC. (Manley, Reid)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Fri 04/26 11:22 AM
ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 4/25/2024: Jewell's claims against Bridgecrest are DISMISSED without prejudice. Jewell and Bridgecrest SHALL tender an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice within thirty (30) days of entry of this Order. cc: Counsel (DLW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 04/24 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Bridgecrest Credit Company, LLC (Bailen, Neal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
22 22 2 pgs order Order on Proposed Agreed Order Thu 04/11 12:40 PM
ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 4/10/2024 granting17 Proposed Agreed Order. Bridgecrest Credit Company, LLC shall have until 4/22/2024, to respond to the complaint. cc: Counsel (DLW)
Related: [-]
21 21 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Thu 04/11 11:27 AM
ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 4/10/2024: Jewell's claims against Equifax are DISMISSED without prejudice. Jewell and Equifax shall tender an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice within forty-five (45) days of entry of this Order. cc: Counsel (DLW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 04/09 10:48 AM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax only by Charles Jewell (Lawson, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/08 9:55 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Williams, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
18 18 motion Compel Wed 04/03 5:22 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Defendant Heights Finance Corp. (Manley, Reid)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A, Declaration of Joe Deelo,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, March 29, 2024
17 17 motion Proposed Agreed Order Fri 03/29 11:53 AM
Proposed Agreed Order by Bridgecrest Credit Company, LLC. (Bailen, Neal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Proposed Agreed Order Thu 03/14 12:27 PM
ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 3/13/2024 granting13 Proposed Agreed Order. Bridgecrest Credit Company, LLC shall have until 4/1/2024, to respond to the complaint. cc: Counsel (DLW)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 03/14 12:25 PM
ORDER ON UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 3/13/2024 granting11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Equifax's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 4/8/2024. cc: Counsel (DLW)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Fri 03/08 3:23 PM
ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 3/8/2024: Jewell's claims against Exeter are DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate Exeter Finance, LLC as a defendant in the record of this matter. cc: Counsel (DLW)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Proposed Agreed Order Fri 03/08 2:44 PM
Proposed Agreed Order by Bridgecrest Credit Company, LLC. (Bailen, Neal)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) Fri 03/08 10:47 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Williams, John)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 03/08 10:46 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Williams, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion
Thursday, March 07, 2024
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/07 5:21 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses Without Waiver of the Right to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff's Claims by Heights Finance Corp.. (Manley, Reid)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 03/07 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Charles Jewell (Lawson, James)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) Thu 03/07 2:14 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Corporate Parent CL Holdings, LLC for Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC. by Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC. (Lewis, Danielle)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/07 2:10 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC. (Lewis, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
6 6 order Order - TEXT ONLY Mon 03/04 11:36 AM
TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 3/4/2024; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) Fri 03/01 4:24 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Corporate Parent Heights Finance Holding Co., Corporate Parent SouthernCo, Inc., Corporate Parent CURO Intermediate Holdings Corp., Corporate Parent CURO Financial Technologies Corp., Corporate Parent CURO Group Holdings Corp. for Heights Finance Corp.. by Heights Finance Corp.. (Manley, Reid)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/01 4:10 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re1 Notice of Removal. (HMC)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Deficiency Fri 03/01 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency re1 Notice of Removal. Reason for Deficiency: No Rule 7.1(a)(1) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/15/2024. (HMC)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assignment Fri 03/01 3:59 PM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (HMC)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 03/01 3:58 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Heights Finance Corp. from Larue District Court, case number 24-C-00026. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AKYWDC-3987535)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Record,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Consent to Removal (Bridgecrest Credit,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Consent to Removal (Equifax),
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Consent to Removal (Exeter Finance),
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Consent to Removal (Jefferson Capital),
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet) (HMC