Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Amos L Mazzant, III
Referred: Aileen Goldman Durrett
Case #: 4:24-cv-00189
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2024
Terminated:Nov 12, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 28, 2024 5:06 AM CDT
Defendant
Alley Brothers LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey Sprigg
Sprigg-Novak Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By
Jason Levi Sanders
Sanders Collins PLLC
contact info
Caroline Elizabeth Allen
Sanders Collins PLLC
contact info
Mediator
Jennifer Calhoun
10440 N. Central Expressway Suite 1040
Dallas, TX 75231
Plaintiff
Jacqueline Ley
Represented By
Chad Aubrey Norcross
Norcross Law
contact info
Lucas Christopher Henry
Abernathy Roeder Boyd & Hullett, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Angel Ribo
Represented By
Chad Aubrey Norcross
Norcross Law
contact info
Lucas Christopher Henry
Abernathy Roeder Boyd & Hullett, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
26 26 order Judgment Tue 11/12 2:12 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/12/2024. (dlw)
Related: [-]
25 25 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 11/12 2:11 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/12/2024. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
24 24 motion Dismiss Pursuant to Settlement Fri 09/27 6:54 PM
JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Settlement with Prejudice by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A..(Sanders, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice,
Att: 2 Proposed Order for Final Judgment
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 08/21 3:00 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiffs shall file closing documents by Friday, September 20, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Aileen Goldman Durrett on 8/21/2024. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Tue 08/20 3:47 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dismissal Documents by Jacqueline Ley, Angel Ribo.(Henry, Lucas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 01, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 08/02 8:38 AM
ORDER. On or before Monday, August 19, 2024, the Parties shall submit to the court all papers necessary for the closing of this case and its removal from the active docket of the court. The trial of this case and all remaining pretrial deadlines and conferences are hereby cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Aileen Goldman Durrett on 8/1/2024. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
20 20 motion Stay Tue 06/18 11:05 AM
JOINT MOTION to Stay or Abate and Notice of Settlement by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A..(Sanders, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order granting Motion to Abate
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
utility Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 05/22 10:05 AM
*** Management Conference Hearing scheduled for June 4, 2024, is cancelled. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
19 19 order Scheduling Order/Docket Control Order Tue 05/21 10:57 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2025 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Amended Pleadings due by 8/27/2024. Discovery due by 11/19/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 7/16/2024. Jury instructions due by 2/20/2025. Mediation Completion due by 11/18/2024. Motions due by 9/10/2024. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/4/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Aileen Goldman Durrett on 5/21/2024. (dlw)
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediator Tue 05/21 10:54 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator, Jennifer Calhoun. The mediation conference shall be conducted on or before November 18, 2024. The mediator shall file a report within five days of the completion of the mediation conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Aileen Goldman Durrett on 5/21/2024. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
17 17 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 05/20 1:27 PM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.(Allen, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order for Scheduling Order Deadlines
Sunday, May 19, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 05/20 8:27 AM
ORDER granting15 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support. Plaintiffs shall file a response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #13) no later than June 19, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Aileen Goldman Durrett on 5/19/2024. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 05/15 2:27 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Jacqueline Ley, Angel Ribo.(Henry, Lucas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, April 29, 2024
14 14 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion) Mon 04/29 12:05 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. . (Allen, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
13 13 motion Dismiss Fri 04/26 4:40 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A..(Allen, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Trustee's Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Final Judgment
Friday, April 19, 2024
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/19 2:44 PM
NOTICE Lucas Henry Vacation Letter by Jacqueline Ley, Angel Ribo (Henry, Lucas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 04/16 12:53 PM
Amended ANSWER to9 Amended Complaint by Alley Brothers LLC.(Sprigg, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
10 10 10 pgs order Order Governing Proceedings Tue 04/16 8:29 AM
ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/20/2024. Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2024 at 01:00 PM in Sherman Courthouse Annex before Magistrate Judge Aileen Goldman Durrett. Signed by Magistrate Judge Aileen Goldman Durrett on 4/15/2024. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 04/08 3:42 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Angel Ribo, Jacqueline Ley.(Henry, Lucas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Friday, March 08, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order Fri 03/08 1:03 PM
ORDER AND ADVISORY. Plaintiffs' amended complaint is due thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Defendants' amended answer is due twenty (20) days from receipt of the amended complaint. Any prior deadline for Defendants' answer shall be extended to the date set by this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Aileen Goldman Durrett on 3/8/2024. (dlw, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 03/06 2:43 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Aileen Goldman Durrett. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/6/2024. (dlw, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/04 10:09 AM
***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to4 Complaint by Alley Brothers LLC.(rpc, )
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/04 10:08 AM
***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to4 Complaint by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.(rpc, )
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Complaint Mon 03/04 10:07 AM
***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against Alley Brothers LLC, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., filed by Angel Ribo, Jacqueline Ley.(rpc, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of ECF Requirement Mon 03/04 10:06 AM
Notified Defendant Alley Brothers LLC's Attorneys, Jeffrey Sprigg and Craig R. Novak, Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. ***ATTORNEY NOT ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN OUR COURT ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER SENT VIA EMAIL*** (rpc, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/01 4:25 PM
NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Persons by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. (Sanders, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Fri 03/01 4:23 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Sanders, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 03/01 4:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. from 199th Judicial District Court of Collin County, case number 199-05915-2023. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10009278), filed by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A..(Sanders, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - List of Parties and Current Status,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Index of Documents Filed in State Court,
Att: 4 Exhibit C-1 - Docket Sheet,
Att: 5 Exhibit C-2 - Plaintiff's Original Petition & Verified Request for TRO,
Att: 6 Exhibit C-3 - Temporary Restraining Order,
Att: 7 Exhibit C-4 - Certificate of Cash in Lieu of Surety Bond,
Att: 8 Exhibit C-5 - Plaintiff's First Amended Petition and Application for Injunctive Relief,
Att: 9 Exhibit C-6 - Plaintiff's Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Designation of Attorney in Charge,
Att: 10 Exhibit C-7 - Citation to Alley Brothers LLC,
Att: 11 Exhibit C-8 - Citation to US Bank Trust, NA,
Att: 12 Exhibit C-9 - Defendant Alley Brothers LLC's Original Answer,
Att: 13 Exhibit C-10 - Notice of Rejected Service of Process from C T Corporation for U.S. Bank Trust National Association,
Att: 14 Exhibit C-11 - Trustee's Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses,
Att: 15 Exhibit C-12 - Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in Charge,
Att: 16 Exhibit C-13 - Order on Motion to Withdraw,
Att: 17 Exhibit D - List of All Counsel of Record,
Att: 18 Exhibit E - Record of Parties Requesting Jury Trial,
Att: 19 Exhibit F - Name and Address of Court from Which Case is Removed,
Att: 20 Exhibit G - Alley Brothers' Consent to Removal
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/04 9:50 AM
Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Mon 03/04 9:59 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (rpc, )
Related: [-]
utility Remark Mon 03/04 10:01 AM
Note: Pursuant to Local Rule CV 7(j), any motions pending in another federal or state court made by any party will be considered moot at the time of transfer or removal unless they are re-urged in this court. (rpc, )
Related: [-]