Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Case #: 6:24-cv-00116
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2024
Terminated:Nov 07, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 28, 2024 5:34 AM CDT
Defendant
Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc.
Represented By
Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Wilson, Robertson & Vandeventer, P.C.
contact info
Natalie Elaine Bennett Drott
Wilson, Robertson & Vandeventer, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Enterprise Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Wilson, Robertson & Vandeventer, P.C.
contact info
Natalie Elaine Bennett Drott
Wilson, Robertson & Vandeventer, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Fleet Connect Solutions LLC
Represented By
James F. McDonough
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info
Travis E. Lynch
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info
Jonathan R. Miller
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, November 07, 2024
37 37 misc Report on Patent/Trademark (AO-120) Thu 11/07 3:32 PM
Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (r013)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 11/07 2:14 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc., Enterprise Holdings, Inc.. (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
35 35 misc Response Tue 10/29 2:24 PM
RESPONSE to34 Claim Construction Brief,, by Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc., Enterprise Holdings, Inc..(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit AC - RECEPTACLE _ English meaning - Cambridge Dictionary,
Att: 2 Exhibit AD - Preamble_The Authoritative Dictionary of IEEE Standards Terms Seventh Edition,
Att: 3 Exhibit AE - Declaration of Bruce McNair in Support of Enterprise's Reply Claim Const
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
34 34 misc Claim Construction Brief Tue 10/15 4:08 PM
Opening Claim Construction Brief regarding31 Claim Construction Brief,,,,,, by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC.(McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Precision Drilling Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 6,429,810,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 6,633,616,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - U.S. Patent No. 6,647,270,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - U.S. Patent No. 6,941,223,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - U.S. Patent No. 6,961,586,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - U.S. Patent No. 7,463,896,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - U.S. Patent No. 8,005,053,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - U.S. Patent No. 8,862,184,
Att: 10 Exhibit J - Precision Drilling Opening Brief,
Att: 11 Goldberg Declaration
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
33 33 misc Response Tue 09/24 11:23 PM
RESPONSE (to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Information) to30 Notice (Other),17 Opposed MOTION to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Manufacturer's Declaratory Judgment by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC. (McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Supplement to Tue 09/24 4:48 PM
SUPPLEMENT to31 Claim Construction Brief,,,,,, by Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc., Enterprise Holdings, Inc..(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. B - US6,429,810_file-wrapper,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. D, Part 1 - US6,633,616 FH (Part 1 of 2),
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. D, Part 2 - US6,633,616 FH (Part 2 of 2),
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. F - Part 1 - US6,647,270 FH (Part 1 of 2),
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. F - Part 2 - US6,647,270 FH (Part 2 of 2),
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. H - US6,941,223_file_wrapper,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. J - US6,961,586_file_wrapper,
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex. L - US7,463,896_file_wrapper,
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex. N - US8,005,053_file_wrapper,
Att: 10 Exhibit Ex. P - US8,862,184_file_wrapper,
Att: 11 Exhibit Ex. R - Dictionary of Shipping Terms_Shipping Container,
Att: 12 Exhibit Ex. U - Chambers 21st Cent Dict,
Att: 13 Exhibit Ex. V - The American Heritage Dictionary_Preamble_Pilot_Symbol_Filtering,
Att: 14 Exhibit Ex. X - Newton's Telecom Dictionary_Waveform,
Att: 15 Exhibit Ex. Z - Rendering_Microsoft Computer Dictionary
31 31 misc Claim Construction Brief Tue 09/24 3:26 PM
Opening Claim Construction Brief by Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc., Enterprise Holdings, Inc..(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - US6429810,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - US6,429,810_file-wrapper,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - US6633616,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Part 1 - US6,633,616 FH (Part 1 of 2),
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Part 2 - US6,633,616 FH (Part 2 of 2),
Att: 6 Exhibit E - US6647270,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Part 1 - US6,647,270 FH (Part 1 of 2),
Att: 8 Exhibit F - Part 2 - US6,647,270 FH (Part 2 of 2),
Att: 9 Exhibit G - US6941223,
Att: 10 Exhibit H - US6,941,223_file_wrapper,
Att: 11 Exhibit I - US6961586,
Att: 12 Exhibit J - US6,961,586_file_wrapper,
Att: 13 Exhibit K - US7463896,
Att: 14 Exhibit L - US7,463,896_file_wrapper,
Att: 15 Exhibit M - US8005053,
Att: 16 Exhibit N - US8,005,053_file_wrapper,
Att: 17 Exhibit O - US8862184,
Att: 18 Exhibit P - US8,862,184_file_wrapper,
Att: 19 Exhibit Q - Dictionary of Intern Trade_Shipping Cont,
Att: 20 Exhibit R - Dictionary of Shipping Terms_Shipping Cont,
Att: 21 Exhibit S - ISO_830_1999(en_fr) - container (1),
Att: 22 Exhibit T - IEEE Std. 802.11a-1999,
Att: 23 Exhibit U - Chambers 21st Century Dictionary - Full,
Att: 24 Exhibit V - The American Heritage Dictionary_Preamble_Pilot_Symbol_Filtering,
Att: 25 Exhibit W - Websters (Orthogonal, Phase Error, Pilot, Preamble, Render(ing), Ship(ping), Symbol, Waveform),
Att: 26 Exhibit X - Newton's Telecom Dictionary_Waveform,
Att: 27 Exhibit Y - The Authoritative Dictionary of IEEE Standards Terms, Seventh Edition_Waveform,
Att: 28 Exhibit Z - Rendering_Microsoft Computer Dictionary,
Att: 29 Exhibit AA,
Att: 30 Exhibit AB - Prelim. ICs - Attachment A - '810 Patent
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 09/11 8:29 AM
Text Order MOOTING12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. In light of the filing of the Amended Complaint at ECF No. 16, the Motion is MOOTED. See Good River Farms, LP v. TXI Operations, LP , No. 1:17-cv-1117-RP, 2018 WL 1770494, at *3 (W.D. Tex. Apr. 12, 2018) ("When a plaintiff files an amended complaint while a motion to dismiss is pending, courts often dismiss the motion to dismiss as moot."). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (CClc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
30 30 notice Notice Tue 09/03 4:16 PM
NOTICE of Supplemental Information by Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc., Enterprise Holdings, Inc.(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - D.I. 23 Geotab's Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - D.I. 28 Scheduling Letter Order
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
29 29 order Scheduling Order Thu 08/08 9:00 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Markman Hearing set for 11/26/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright, Joinder of Parties due by 1/7/2025, Amended Pleadings due by 3/18/2025, Dispositive/Daubert Motions due by 9/3/2025, Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 9/3/2025, Pretrial Conference set for 11/5/2025 before Judge Alan D Albright, Jury Selection set for 11/26/2025 before Judge Derek T. Gilliland, Jury Trial set for 11/26/2025 before Judge Alan D Albright,. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 07/18 2:02 PM
ORDER GRANTING27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney NATALIE ELAINE BENNETT DROTT. Attorney added for Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc., Enterprise Holdings, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District . Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
27 27 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 07/17 2:55 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Natalie Elaine Bennett Drott ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-18994655) by on behalf of Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc., Enterprise Holdings, Inc..(Drott, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
26 26 misc Pro Hac Vice Letter Tue 07/16 2:38 PM
Pro Hac Vice Letter to Natalie Elaine Bennet Drott. (lad)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 07/16 2:14 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc., Enterprise Holdings, Inc., re18 MOTION to Dismiss Fleet Connect Solutions LLC's Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Enterprise Holdings, Inc., Defendant Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc. (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
24 24 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Thu 07/11 1:58 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order filed jointly by the Parties by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC. (McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
23 23 respm Surreply to Motion Thu 07/11 9:54 AM
Plaintiff's Sur-Reply to Defendant's Motion to Stay17 (lad)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 07/11 9:17 AM
Text Order GRANTING22 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay (the "Motion"). Having considered its merits and noting that the Motion is unopposed by the Defendants, the Court GRANTS the Motion. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Clerk is to promptly file Exhibit A to the Motion as Plaintiffs Sur-Reply to Defendants Motion to Stay (ECF No. 17). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (CClc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
22 22 motion Leave to File Document Wed 07/10 9:59 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply In Further Opposition To Defendants Motion To Stay Pending Resolution Of Manufacturers Declaratory Judgment Action (Dkt. No. 17) by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC.(Hardt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Proposed Sur-Reply,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
21 21 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 07/09 12:42 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC, re18 MOTION to Dismiss Fleet Connect Solutions LLC's Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Enterprise Holdings, Inc., Defendant Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc. (McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 07/03 3:44 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc., Enterprise Holdings, Inc., re17 Opposed MOTION to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Manufacturer's Declaratory Judgment filed by Defendant Enterprise Holdings, Inc., Defendant Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc.(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Jennifer Ainsworth,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Thursday, June 27, 2024
19 19 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 06/27 6:59 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC, re17 Opposed MOTION to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Manufacturer's Declaratory Judgment filed by Defendant Enterprise Holdings, Inc., Defendant Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc.(McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Preliminary Infringement Contentions Cover Document
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
18 18 motion Dismiss Tue 06/25 3:50 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Fleet Connect Solutions LLC's Amended Complaint by Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc., Enterprise Holdings, Inc..(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 13, 2024
17 17 motion Stay Case Thu 06/13 12:23 PM
Opposed MOTION to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Manufacturer's Declaratory Judgment by Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc., Enterprise Holdings, Inc..(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo in Support by Justin Lisonbee,
Att: 2 Memo in Support by Lars Dahlby,
Att: 3 Memo in Support by Jennifer Ainsworth,
Att: 4 Exhibit A - '810 Patent,
Att: 5 Exhibit B - '053 Patent,
Att: 6 Exhibit C - '184 Patent,
Att: 7 Exhibit D - '223 Patent,
Att: 8 Exhibit E - '586 Patent,
Att: 9 Exhibit F - '616 Patent,
Att: 10 Exhibit G - '896 Patent,
Att: 11 Exhibit H - '270 Patent,
Att: 12 Proposed Order Granting Motion
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 06/11 3:52 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended Complaint) against Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc., Enterprise Holdings, Inc. amending1 Complaint., filed by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC.(McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
15 15 misc Status Report Tue 06/04 8:38 PM
STATUS REPORT by the Parties re: Case Readiness by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC. (McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
14 14 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Tue 05/28 3:04 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Enterprise Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Crawford Group, Inc. for Enterprise Holdings, Inc.. (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Tue 05/28 3:02 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Crawford Group, Inc. for Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc.. (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 05/28 2:57 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc., Enterprise Holdings, Inc.. (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 05/10 5:27 PM
Text Order GRANTING11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion for a Second Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint. Defendants seek an additional 15-day extension to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint, and Plaintiff agrees to this request. For good cause shown and noting that the request is made on behalf of the Defendants, and therefore unopposed, the Motion is GRANTED. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendants have up to and including May 28, 2024 to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (CClc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Mon 05/13 8:58 AM
Reset Deadlines: Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc. answer due 5/28/2024; Enterprise Holdings, Inc. answer due 5/28/2024. (lad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 05/09 12:58 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint (of 15 days; up to May 28, 2024) by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC.(McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 notice Deficiency Notice Thu 05/09 11:58 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 9 Notice (Other) (lad)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice Thu 05/09 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Second Agreed Extension of Time For Defendants To Respond (of 18 days; up to May 28, 2024) by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC re1 Complaint (McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
8 8 notice Notice Mon 03/25 1:00 PM
NOTICE Of Agreed Extension Of Time For Defendants To Respond (of 30 days; up to May 10, 2024) by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC re1 Complaint (McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Mon 03/25 1:43 PM
Reset Deadlines: Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc. and Enterprise Holdings, Inc. answer due 5/10/2024. (zv)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/22 6:31 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC. Enterprise Holdings, Inc. served on 3/5/2024, answer due 3/26/2024. (McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 03/04 9:14 AM
Summons Issued as to Enterprise Fleet Management, Inc. and Enterprise Holdings, Inc. (zv)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Fri 03/01 4:21 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC. (McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 03/01 4:17 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC. (McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Fri 03/01 4:01 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice Fri 03/01 3:51 PM
NOTICE Of Related Cases by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC (McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/01 3:41 PM
COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18482917), filed by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC.(McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Remark (No Doc#) Mon 03/04 9:09 AM
Please remember to comply with the standing orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (zv)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/04 9:10 AM
Case directly assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (zv)
Related: [-]