California Central District Court
Judge:John A Kronstadt
Referred: Margo A Rocconi
Case #: 2:24-cv-01708
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2024
Terminated:May 09, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 28, 2024 2:54 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Shosho LLC
Defendant
Valley Holistic Caregivers Inc.
Plaintiff
Larry Dunn
Represented By
Jason T. Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J. Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Kevin Hyunjong Hong
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, June 07, 2024
17 17 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 06/07 11:00 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Larry Dunn. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
16 16 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 05/09 10:27 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Dkt.15 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction to vacate this Order and to reopen the action within 30 days from the date of this Order; provided, however, any request by any party(ies) that the Court do so, shall make a showing of good cause as to why the settlement has not been completed within the 30-day period, what further settlement processes are necessary, and when the party(ies) making such a request reasonably expect the process to be concluded. This Order does not preclude the filing of a stipulation of dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41, which does not require the approval of the Court. Such a stipulation shall be filed within the aforementioned 30-day period, or by such later date ordered by the Court pursuant to a stipulation by the parties that conforms the requirements of a showing of good cause stated above. All dates and deadlines are vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (yl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
15 15 notice Settlement Wed 05/08 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Larry Dunn. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
14 14 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 05/01 9:23 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION AS TO VALLEY HOLISTIC CAREGIVERS INC. AND SHOSHO LLC by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than May 8, 2024 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution regarding overdue responses as to Valley Holistic Caregivers Inc. and Shosho LLC. Pursuant to Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff shall file an application requesting the entry of default. Plaintiff is advised that the Court will consider the filing of an amended application, which complies with the federal rules, on or before the date upon which the response is due, as a satisfactory response to the Order to Show Cause. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of an appropriate response. No oral argument will be heard unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Failure to respond will result in the dismissal of this matter. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 05/01 8:51 AM
STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
12 12 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 04/30 1:02 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Tue 04/30 1:01 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:24-cv-01708-JAK (MARx). (et)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 04/05 2:55 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Larry Dunn, upon Defendant Shosho LLC served on 4/3/2024, answer due 4/24/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon NejatRostami - Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
9 9 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-14) Reminder re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project-optional html form Mon 04/01 11:19 AM
REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (et)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
8 8 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 03/19 2:52 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Larry Dunn, upon Defendant Valley Holistic Caregivers Inc. served on 3/15/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Katchko, Vitiello & Karikomi, PC - Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
7 7 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Thu 03/07 5:07 PM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. See document for further information. (es)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1 of 2,
Att: 2 Attachment 2 of 2
Monday, March 04, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/04 1:06 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Shosho LLC, Valley Holistic Caregivers Inc.. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Mon 03/04 1:03 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-11C
Friday, March 01, 2024
4 4 notice Summons Request Fri 03/01 2:22 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Larry Dunn. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 03/01 2:21 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 03/01 2:21 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Larry Dunn. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/01 2:20 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37016522 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J. Kim added to party Larry Dunn(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]