Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Patricia M Mayer
Case #: 4:24-bk-10705
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2024

Debtor
LVL Engineering Group, Inc.
Main Street Commons 559 Main Street, Suite 230
Bethlehem, PA 18018
Represented By
JULIE A. CALLSEN
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
LYNN E. FELDMAN
Lynn E. Feldman, Trustee 2310 Walbert Ave Ste 103
Allentown, PA 18104
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of United States Trustee Robert N.C. Nix Federal Building 900 Market Street Suite 320
Philadelphia, PA 19107


Docket last updated: 03/02/2024 12:04 AM EST
Friday, March 01, 2024
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 03/01 12:59 PM
Receipt of Voluntary petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-10705 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A25561380. Fee Amount $ 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Fri 03/01 12:57 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-individual . Fee Amount $338 Filed by LVL Engineering Group, Inc.. Government Proof of Claim Deadline: 08/28/2024. Statement of Corporate Ownership due 03/15/2024. (CALLSEN, JULIE)
Related: [-]
2 2 trustee Notice Appointing Trustee or Subchapter V Trustee Fri 03/01 3:36 PM
Notice of Appointment of LYNN E. FELDMAN as Trustee. Filed by United States Trustee. (MILLER, NANCY) Modified on 3/1/2024 to correct filer (W., Belinda)
Related: [-]