Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Eleanor L Ross
Referred: Catherine M Salinas
Case #: 1:24-cv-00917
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Feb 29, 2024
Terminated:Oct 16, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 4:42 AM EDT
Defendant
Bull City Financial Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
John H. Bedard, Jr.
Bedard Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Jonathan K. Aust
Bedard Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jerry White
Represented By
Steven Howard Koval
The Koval Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, December 26, 2024
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 12/26 9:05 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Jerry White. (Koval, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order Mon 11/25 8:11 AM
ORDER: The parties are ORDERED to file an appropriate notice or stipulation of dismissal WITHIN THIRTY DAYS after the date of this Order, or else show cause why they are unable to do so. If the parties need additional time to submit dismissal documents, they should file a motion requesting an extension of time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 11/25/2024. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Mon 11/18 2:43 PM
Submission of12 Order to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order Wed 10/16 9:49 AM
ORDER: The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this action. The Court DIRECTS the Parties to file an appropriate notice or stipulation of dismissal within thirty days of this order. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to resubmit this matter after the thirty-day period expires if the Parties do not file an appropriate notice or stipulation of dismissal or request an extension of time to do so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 10/16/2024. (ajw)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 10/16 9:52 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas terminated from case. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 10/14 5:18 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Jerry White (Koval, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order Mon 09/30 12:13 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff and Defendant are hereby ORDERED to file a proposed pretrial order no later than Tuesday, October 15, 2024, or file a notice explaining why they are unable to do so. The parties are notified that failure to comply with this Order may result in sanctions, including a recommendation that this case be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 09/30/2024. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
9 9 order Scheduling Order Thu 04/25 9:17 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER AND CASE MANAGEMENT INSTRUCTIONS: re:6 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan: The discovery period in this action shall conclude on August 5, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 4/25/24. (ces)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Thu 04/25 10:36 AM
Clerk's Notation re7 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jerry White. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
8 8 discov Initial Disclosures Wed 04/24 9:11 PM
Initial Disclosures by Jerry White.(Koval, Steven)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 04/24 9:10 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Jerry White. (Koval, Steven)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Wed 04/24 9:09 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Jerry White. (Koval, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
5 5 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Wed 04/10 9:11 AM
ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to submit their respective portions of the joint preliminary report and discovery plan within FOURTEEN DAYS of the date of this order. Plaintiff is also ORDERED to file his certificate of interested persons and submit his initial disclosures within FOURTEEN DAYS of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 4/10/24. (ces)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 06, 2024
4 4 discov Initial Disclosures Sat 04/06 10:33 AM
Initial Disclosures by Bull City Financial Solutions, Inc..(Aust, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Fri 03/08 1:08 PM
Clerk's Notation re3 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bull City Financial Solutions, Inc. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
3 3 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/07 5:32 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bull City Financial Solutions, Inc.. (Aust, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Thu 03/07 5:31 PM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bull City Financial Solutions, Inc.. Discovery ends on 8/5/2024.(Aust, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 03/01 11:38 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Bull City Financial Solutions, Inc. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-13259404) (pdt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Summons,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet